Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05168 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/29/2022

                     
Researcher: JS 	Page 1 	3/29/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5168  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTIONS FOR 
PROPERTY USED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill: 
1. expands the type of housing owned by federally tax-exempt, 
charitable organizations that is exempt from state property tax (§ 
1); 
2. specifies that government payments for the treatment, support, 
or care of individuals housed in a property are not government 
housing subsidies that disqualify a property for a tax exemption 
(§ 1); 
3. requires assessors to record their reasons for denying property 
tax exemptions for certain nonprofit organizations (§ 2);  
4. standardizes the form that organizations must file every four 
years to claim a property tax exemption (i.e., tax-exempt filings) 
and requires assessors to post the form on their website (§§ 1 & 
2); and 
5. specifies that certain denials of tax exemptions for charitable 
properties can be appealed directly to the Superior Court, like 
other eligible appeals, and authorizes the court to award 
attorney’s fees, in addition to other relief, in these actions (§ 3). 
It also makes technical and conforming changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2022, and applicable to assessment 
years starting on and after that date, except the provisions requiring a 
standard exemption form and assessors to record their rationale for 
exemption denials are effective July 1, 2022.  2022HB-05168-R000177-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JS 	Page 2 	3/29/22 
 
§ 1 — TAX-EXEMPT CHARITABLE HOUSING 
Temporary Housing  
Current law exempts from property tax certain housing owned by, or 
held in trust for, organizations that are exempt from federal income 
taxes and organized exclusively for charitable purposes. The exemption 
is for structures used mainly for one or more of these temporary housing 
purposes: 
1. an orphanage; 
2. a drug or alcohol treatment or rehabilitation facility;  
3. to house people who are homeless, have a mental health disorder 
or an intellectual or physical disability, or are domestic violence 
victims; 
4. to house ex-offenders or participants in judicial branch- or 
Department of Corrections- sponsored programs; or 
5. as short-term housing where the average stay is less than six 
months.   
The bill eliminates the provision restricting the exemption to just 
temporary housing for these purposes, expanding the exemption to the 
first four types of housing above regardless of how long people stay in 
them.   
Subsidized Housing  
Under existing law, housing that is partially or entirely funded by 
government subsidies is not a charitable purpose and is ineligible for 
the property tax exemption. The bill specifies government payments for 
the treatment, support, or care of individuals housed in a property 
described above (e.g., a drug treatment facility or housing for 
individuals with a physical disability) are not subsidies. So, these 
payments do not, by themselves, make a property ineligible for the 
property tax exemption under the bill.  
§§ 1 & 2 — EXEMPTION FILINGS AND DENIALS  2022HB-05168-R000177-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JS 	Page 3 	3/29/22 
 
Existing law requires boards of assessors (i.e., assessors) to determine 
what portion of a property, if any, owned by scientific, educational, 
literary, historical, charitable, agricultural, and cemetery organizations 
(i.e., charitable property) is exempt and assess any property they 
determine is taxable. They must do so by inspecting the tax-exempt 
filing these organizations must file to claim their property tax 
exemptions. If an assessor determines that property claimed to be 
exempt is taxable, the bill requires them to state their rationale in the 
records.  
The bill also shifts responsibility for providing the tax-exempt filing 
form from each assessor to the Office of Policy and Management (OPM). 
Under the bill, OPM must develop the form by September 1, 2022, for 
use beginning in the next assessment year (i.e., October 1, 2022), in 
consultation with the Connecticut Community Nonprofit Alliance and 
Connecticut Association of Assessing Officers. The form must have 
instructions on how assessors determine whether a property is tax 
exempt and assessors must post the form on their websites.  
§ 3 — ASSESSORS’ DENIAL OF EXEMPTIONS   
The bill specifies that a charitable property’s owner can appeal a tax 
exemption denial directly to Superior Court, without first appealing to 
the board of assessment appeals, on the basis that the assessor’s reasons 
for denying the exemption conflict with exemption eligibility laws.  
Existing law allows taxpayers to bring certain property tax claims 
directly to Superior Court, including claims that taxes were wrongfully 
laid on property that is not taxable. As with these other claims, the bill 
authorizes the court to award relief in the form and manner justice and 
equity requires, including court costs at its discretion. However, for 
charitable property exemption denials, the court can also award 
attorney’s fees under the bill. 
Under both existing law and the bill: 
1. appeals must be filed within one year from the town’s last denial 
or determination,   2022HB-05168-R000177-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JS 	Page 4 	3/29/22 
 
2. service and returns must be done in the same manner as civil 
action summons,  
3. appeals do not suspend any town action to collect the tax, and 
4. towns must refund the taxpayer for any overpayments the court 
finds.   
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Planning and Development Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 26 Nay 0 (03/11/2022)