Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05203 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2022

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2022HB-05203-R01-
HB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 5203  
February Session, 2022 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE PUBLIC UTILITIES REGULATORY 
AUTHORITY'S POWERS, UTILITY ADVERTISING DISCLOSURES, 
AND ELECTRIC BILL COMPONENTS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (b) of section 16-19tt of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 2 
1, 2022): 3 
(b) [In any rate case initiated on or after July 8, 2013, or in a pending 4 
rate case for which a final decision has not been issued prior to July 8, 5 
2013, the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority shall order the state's gas 6 
and electric distribution companies to decouple distribution revenues 7 
from the volume of natural gas and electricity sales. For electric 8 
distribution companies, the decoupling mechanism shall be the 9 
adjustment of actual distribution revenues to allowed distribution 10 
revenues. For gas distribution companies, the decoupling mechanism 11 
shall be a mechanism that does not remove the incentive to support the 12 
expansion of natural gas use pursuant to the 2013 Comprehensive 13 
Energy Strategy, such as a mechanism that decouples distribution 14 
revenue based on a use-per-customer basis. In making its determination 15 
on this matter, the authority shall consider the impact of decoupling on 16 
the gas or electric distribution company's return on equity and make any 17  Substitute Bill No. 5203 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2022HB-05203-
R01-HB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
necessary adjustments thereto.] In any rate case initiated on or after 18 
October 1, 2022, or in a pending rate case for which a final decision has 19 
not been issued prior to October 1, 2022, the Public Utilities Regulatory 20 
Authority may order the state's gas and electric distribution companies 21 
to decouple distribution revenues from the volume of natural gas and 22 
electricity sales. The authority shall have the discretion to determine the 23 
decoupling mechanism and methodology used in decoupling orders 24 
made pursuant to this subsection. 25 
Sec. 2. Section 16-19jj of the general statutes is repealed and the 26 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2022): 27 
The Public Utilities Regulatory Authority shall, whenever it deems 28 
appropriate, [encourage] permit the use of proposed settlements 29 
produced by alternative dispute resolution mechanisms to resolve 30 
contested cases and proceedings. In order to approve a settlement of a 31 
proceeding to amend rates under section 16-19, the authority shall 32 
determine that the resulting rates and other terms of such settlement 33 
conform to the principles and guidelines set forth in section 16-19e. The 34 
term of any provision in a settlement of a proceeding to amend rates 35 
under section 16-19 shall not extend more than three years from its 36 
approval by the authority. Any settlement of a proceeding to amend 37 
rates under section 16-19 subsequent to an approved settlement of a 38 
proceeding to amend rates shall not constitute a general rate hearing for 39 
purposes of section 16-19a. 40 
Sec. 3. Section 16-19bb of the general statutes is repealed and the 41 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2022): 42 
The Public Utilities Regulatory Authority shall require that any funds 43 
held by an electric distribution company in excess of the company's 44 
authorized return on equity, which funds are intended by the authority 45 
to offset future rate increases in lieu of a present rate decrease, shall be 46 
applied to such rate increases or shall be refunded to the company's 47 
customers, [within one year of receipt] in a manner determined by the 48 
authority, not later than the conclusion of the company's next 49  Substitute Bill No. 5203 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2022HB-05203-
R01-HB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
proceeding conducted pursuant to section 16-19a. 50 
Sec. 4. Subsection (c) of section 16-19d of the general statutes is 51 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 52 
1, 2022): 53 
(c) [A public service company shall make application to the authority 54 
for determination that equipment meets the requirements of 55 
subdivision (4) of subsection (b) of this section. The authority shall, to 56 
the extent practicable, make such determination within one hundred 57 
twenty days of such filing. All reasonable and proper expenses, required 58 
by the authority and the Office of Consumer Counsel, including, but not 59 
limited to, the costs associated with analysis, testing, evaluation and 60 
testimony at a public hearing or other proceeding, shall be borne by the 61 
company and shall be paid by the company at such times and in such 62 
manner as the authority directs.] On or before February first each year, 63 
any gas company or electric distribution company that recovered 64 
advertising costs against ratepayers during the previous year shall file a 65 
public disclosure report with the authority. For each advertisement, the 66 
report shall delineate the dollar amount, source of funding, primary 67 
purpose of the advertisement, communications medium or platform 68 
and approximate dates during which the advertisement was displayed 69 
or transmitted to the public, broken down by type of advertising, by 70 
month and by year, and by advertising campaign. Failure to provide 71 
complete and accurate data in the report shall constitute a violation for 72 
which the authority may levy civil penalties against such company 73 
pursuant to section 16-41. 74 
Sec. 5. (Effective July 1, 2022) The chairperson of the Public Utilities 75 
Regulatory Authority shall prepare a report that outlines and analyzes 76 
the public policy components of the delivery side of the electric bill for 77 
customers of each electric distribution company. The chairperson shall 78 
submit such report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a 79 
of the general statutes, to the joint standing committee of the General 80 
Assembly having cognizance of matters related to energy on or before 81 
January 15, 2023. 82  Substitute Bill No. 5203 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2022HB-05203-
R01-HB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2022 16-19tt(b) 
Sec. 2 October 1, 2022 16-19jj 
Sec. 3 October 1, 2022 16-19bb 
Sec. 4 October 1, 2022 16-19d(c) 
Sec. 5 July 1, 2022 New section 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
The title was changed for accuracy. 
 
ET Joint Favorable Subst.