Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05203 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/06/2022

                     
Researcher: LRH 	Page 1 	4/6/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5203  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE PUBLIC UTILITIES REGULATORY 
AUTHORITY'S POWERS, UTILITY ADVERTISING DISCLOSURES, 
AND ELECTRIC BILL COMPONENTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes various changes in laws related to how the Public 
Utilities Regulatory Authority (PURA) sets rates for utility companies. 
Among other things, it: 
1. allows, rather than requires, PURA to decouple the distribution 
revenues of the state’s gas companies and electric distribution 
companies (EDCs, i.e., Eversource and United Illuminating) from 
their volumetric sales, meaning their revenue is not strictly tied 
to the amount of gas or electricity they sell, and gives PURA 
greater discretion in how to do so; 
2. limits the extent to which utility companies can use settlement 
agreements to resolve PURA rate cases by (a) requiring that an 
agreement’s terms and resulting rates meet certain principles and 
guidelines and (b) limiting the extent to which an agreement can 
be used to avoid future rate cases or general rate hearings for gas 
companies and EDCs; 
3. changes the deadline by which PURA must decide whether to 
refund an EDC’s overearnings to ratepayers or apply them to 
offset future rate increases; and 
4. requires gas companies and EDCs to file public disclosure reports 
with PURA that detail advertisement costs and funding sources, 
among other information. 
Lastly, the bill requires the PURA chairperson to prepare a report that 
outlines and analyzes the delivery-side public policy components on  2022HB-05203-R000325-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 2 	4/6/22 
 
each EDC’s customer electric bills. She must submit the report to the 
Energy and Technology Committee by January 15, 2023. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2022, except the requirement for 
PURA to prepare a report on electric bills is effective July 1, 2022. 
§ 1 — GAS AND EDC RATE DECOUPLING 
Current law requires that PURA’s rate case decisions order the state’s 
gas and electric distribution companies to decouple their distribution 
revenues from their volumetric sales. For the EDCs, the decoupling 
mechanism must be an adjustment of actual distribution revenues to 
allowed distribution revenues. For the gas companies, the decoupling 
mechanism must not remove the incentive to support the expansion of 
natural gas use recommended in the 2013 Comprehensive Energy 
Strategy. Current law also requires that PURA, when making these 
determinations, consider decoupling’s impact on the EDC’s or gas 
company’s return on equity and make any needed adjustments to it. 
The bill removes these provisions and instead allows, but does not 
require, PURA to order the EDCs and gas companies to decouple their 
distribution revenues from their volumetric sales in any rate case begun 
on or after October 1, 2022, or in any rate that has a final decision 
pending on that date. The bill gives PURA discretion to determine the 
coupling mechanism and methodology used in the decoupling orders.  
§ 2 — SETTLEMENTS 
Current law requires PURA, when it finds it appropriate, to 
encourage using proposed settlements produced by alternative dispute 
resolution mechanisms to resolve contested cases and proceedings. The 
bill requires PURA to permit, rather than encourage, these settlements. 
It also requires PURA, before approving a settlement for a rate case, 
to determine that the resulting rates and other settlement terms conform 
to certain existing statutory principles and guidelines for internal utility 
management and rate structures. Among other things, these include 
that the level and structure of rates: 
1. is sufficient, but no more than sufficient, to (a) allow the company  2022HB-05203-R000325-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 3 	4/6/22 
 
to cover its operating costs, (b) attract needed capital and to 
maintain its financial integrity, and (c) provide appropriate 
protection to the relevant public interests; and 
2. reflects prudent and efficient management of the company. 
The bill limits the term of any provision in a rate case settlement to 
no more than three years after its approval by PURA. It also specifies 
that a rate case settlement that follows a PURA-approved rate case 
settlement is not a general rate hearing that the law requires for gas 
companies and EDCs. In effect, this prevents these companies from 
using multiple rate case settlements to satisfy the requirement for a 
general rate case hearing before PURA at least once every four years 
(CGS § 16-19a). 
§ 3 — DEADLINE FOR APPLYING UTILITY COMPANY 
OVEREARNINGS 
Under current law, when an EDC exceeds its authorized return on 
equity (i.e., earns more than what PURA authorized in a rate case), if 
PURA intends to use the excess funds to offset a future rate increase 
instead of decreasing present rates, it must either do so or refund the 
funds to the company’s ratepayers within one year. The bill removes the 
one-year deadline and instead requires that the offset or refund be done, 
in a manner determined by PURA, by the end of the company’s next 
general rate hearing.  
§ 4 — UTILITY COMPANY ADVERTISING 
The law generally prohibits the gas companies and EDCs from 
recovering their political, institutional, or promotional advertising costs 
as operating expenses in a rate case. However, it makes exceptions for 
promoting or marketing efficient gas and electric equipment that PURA 
determines meets certain criteria. The bill removes provisions in current 
law that require (1) the companies to apply to PURA for a determination 
about the equipment; (2) PURA to make the determination within 120 
days, if practicable; and (3) the companies to pay the reasonable and 
proper expenses required by PURA and the Office of Consumer 
Counsel.   2022HB-05203-R000325-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 4 	4/6/22 
 
The bill instead requires each gas company or EDC that recovered 
advertising costs from ratepayers during the previous year to file a 
public disclosure report with PURA by each February 1. For each 
advertisement, the report must delineate the cost, funding source, 
primary purpose, communications medium or platform, and 
approximate dates of display transmittal to the public. The information 
must also be broken down by type of advertising, month and year, and 
advertising campaign. 
Under the bill, a company’s failure to provide complete and accurate 
data in the report is a violation for which PURA may levy civil penalties 
of up $10,000 for each offense. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Energy and Technology Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 26 Nay 0 (03/22/2022)