Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05204 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/04/2022

                     
Researcher: SM 	Page 1 	4/4/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 5204  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING A NEEDS ASSESSMENT AND FAIR SHARE 
PLANS FOR MUNICIPALITIES TO INCREASE AFFORDABLE 
HOUSING.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Office of Policy and Management (OPM) 
secretary and the Department of Housing (DOH) commissioner to 
assess the affordable housing need in each of the state’s planning 
regions, allocate this need to municipalities, and require that 
municipalities plan to meet the affordable housing need allocated to 
them. In carrying out certain requirements under the bill, the OPM 
secretary must consult with experts, advocates, and organizations with 
expertise in affordable housing, fair housing, and planning and zoning, 
as determined by the secretary (hereafter, “housing experts”).  
Specifically, the bill requires the OPM secretary, in consultation with 
the DOH commissioner and housing experts, to do the following by July 
1, 2024:  
1. establish a fair share methodology for (a) determining the 
minimum need for affordable housing units in each of the state’s 
planning regions and (b) fairly allocating a portion of this need 
to the municipalities within each planning region to ensure 
adequate housing choice (i.e., setting municipal fair share goals); 
2. establish a process requiring municipalities to develop, adopt, 
and submit to the secretary and commissioner plans to meet their 
municipal fair share goals (i.e., municipal fair share plans); and 
3. (a) publish and disseminate technical assistance materials and 
arrange for related briefings, trainings, and webinars to assist 
municipalities in complying with the bill’s requirements and (b) 
provide this technical assistance and training every ten years  2022HB-05204-R000286-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 2 	4/4/22 
 
thereafter.  
The bill requires the OPM secretary, in consultation with the DOH 
commissioner, to determine by July 1, 2024, the minimum need for 
affordable housing units in each planning region and corresponding 
municipal fair share goals using the fair share methodology. The 
number of affordable housing units set by these goals cannot exceed 
20% of a municipality’s occupied dwelling units and must be 
recalculated every ten years. Under the bill, an “affordable housing 
unit” is a dwelling unit conveyed by an instrument containing a 
covenant or restriction (i.e., restrictive deed) that requires that the unit 
be sold or rented at or below a price intended to preserve the unit for a 
low-income household. 
Additionally, the bill requires each municipality, by January 1, 2025, 
and every ten years thereafter, to prepare and adopt a municipal fair 
share plan that creates a realistic opportunity for achieving the 
municipality’s fair share goal.  
Finally, the bill requires the OPM secretary, in consultation with the 
DOH commissioner and housing experts, to report to the Housing and 
Planning and Development committees by January 1, 2026, on (1) the 
implementation of the bill’s requirements; (2) the status of 
municipalities’ compliance; and (3) recommendations for 
implementation, compliance, and enforcement, including approaches 
used in other states where municipalities have similar obligations.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2022 
FAIR SHARE METHODOLOGY 
Development 
In developing the fair share methodology, the bill requires the OPM 
secretary, in consultation with the DOH commissioner, to consider the 
following:   
1. appropriate metrics of the minimum need for affordable housing 
units in a planning region, including the number of extremely 
low-income households in the region, to ensure adequate  2022HB-05204-R000286-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 3 	4/4/22 
 
housing choice and  
2. appropriate factors for fairly allocating this need among the 
municipalities within each planning region to set municipal fair 
share goals, including a municipality’s compliance with statutes 
requiring its zoning regulations and plan of conservation and 
development to promote economic housing diversity and 
provide for the development of multifamily housing 
opportunities. 
Under the bill, “low-,” “very low-,” and “extremely low-income 
households” mean those with an income at or below 80%, 50%, or 30%, 
respectively, of the state median income or the U.S. Department of 
Housing and Urban Development’s (HUD) area median income, 
whichever is less. 
Required Components  
The bill requires that under the fair share methodology, a municipal 
fair share goal generally be increased, relative to other municipalities in 
the planning region, based on the following factors:  
1. higher equalized net grand list (i.e., an estimate of the market 
value of all taxable property in a municipality);  
2. higher median income;  
3. lower federal poverty rate; and  
4. lower population share residing in multifamily housing (i.e., 
residential buildings with at least three dwelling units).  
These data must come from the most recent U.S. decennial census or 
a similar source, except for the equalized net grand list data, which must 
be based on OPM’s calculations of these figures for the purpose of 
educational equalization grants.  
The fair share methodology must generally rely on figures from 
HUD’s Comprehensive Housing Affordability Strategy data set or a 
similar source as determined by the OPM secretary.   2022HB-05204-R000286-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 4 	4/4/22 
 
MUNICIPAL FAIR SHARE PLANS 
Required Components  
The bill requires the OPM secretary, in consultation with the DOH 
commissioner and housing experts, to establish the following by July 1, 
2024:  
1. a process requiring municipalities to develop and adopt 
municipal fair share plans and submit them to the secretary and 
commissioner;  
2. requirements for the content and submission of these plans;  
3. requirements ensuring that each plan provides for the creation of 
enough affordable housing for the municipality to meet its 
municipal fair share goal, including (a) rental units; (b) units 
available to families, including those with two, three, or more 
bedrooms; (c) units affordable to very low- and extremely low-
income households; and (d) affordable housing units available to 
individuals or families with special needs or that are homeless or 
at risk of homelessness (i.e., supportive housing); and  
4. policies ensuring that no municipal fair share plan creates undue 
concentrations of households living in poverty within a planning 
region as determined by the OPM secretary.  
BACKGROUND 
Planning Regions  
In practice, the boundaries of the state’s nine planning regions are the 
same as those of its regional councils of government, which serve as the 
formal governance structures of the planning regions.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Housing Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 10 Nay 5 (03/15/2022)