Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05234 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/04/2022

                     
Researcher: SM 	Page 1 	4/4/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5234  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE RIGHTS AND RESPONSIBILITIES OF 
LANDLORDS AND TENANTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes a number of changes in laws about landlords and 
tenants.  
The bill allows landlords to accept certain bonds and commercial 
insurance coverage (i.e., "damage insurance coverage") in place of 
traditional security deposits. The bill establishes limits to the amount of 
damage insurance coverage landlords may demand that align with 
existing caps on security deposits. Among other things, the bill also 
establishes criteria for these policies and the companies that offer them.   
Beginning January 1, 2023, the bill requires landlords to give tenants 
the opportunity to request and complete a pre-occupancy "walk-
through" of a dwelling unit after or at the time of entering into a rental 
agreement. The bill prohibits a landlord from keeping any portion of a 
tenant's security deposit or seeking payment for conditions specifically 
identified during the walk-through. Rental agreements entered into 
before January 1, 2023, are exempt from the bill's walk-through 
requirements.  
The bill limits rental application-related fees that landlords may 
demand from prospective tenants to reimbursements for tenant 
screening reports that cannot exceed $20. It requires landlords to (1) 
provide tenants with these reports and a receipt or invoice and (2) waive 
the fee if the prospective tenant provides a recent tenant screening 
report that is satisfactory to the landlord.   
Beginning January 1, 2023, the bill requires landlords or their agents 
to provide certain "protected tenants" with a written Department of 
Housing (DOH) notice summarizing applicable protections when a unit  2022HB-05234-R000273-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 2 	4/4/22 
 
is rented to, or a rental agreement is entered into or renewed with, them. 
The bill also requires landlords who own the dwelling unit to provide 
all tenants who are eligible to apply for admission as an elector with a 
voter registration application when the tenant executes a residential 
rental agreement.  
Finally, the bill makes technical and conforming changes.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2022 
§ 1 — DAMAGE INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR RENTERS  
The bill allows landlords to accept "damage insurance coverage" in 
place of security deposits and designate certain insurance companies 
from which he or she will accept policies. It requires lease agreements 
between landlords and tenants to identify these accepted insurance 
companies.   
Under the bill, damage insurance means a bond or commercial 
insurance coverage, in an amount specified in the rental agreement and 
not to exceed the existing caps on security deposits, to secure the 
tenant's performance of the rental agreement's terms and conditions. By 
law, landlords cannot demand a security deposit that exceeds (1) two 
months' rent for tenants under age 62 or (2) one month's rent for tenants 
age 62 or older. The bill applies these caps to damage insurance 
coverage.  
The bill requires a landlord, after previously accepting a tenant's 
damage insurance coverage exceeding one month's rent in place of a 
security deposit, to later accept replacement damage insurance from the 
tenant in amount up to one month's rent if the tenant subsequently 
turned 62-years-old during his or her lease agreement.  
Under the bill, damage insurance coverage policies must meet the 
following criteria:  
1. be provided by an insurance company that (a) is licensed or 
authorized to do business in the state and (b) agrees to approve  2022HB-05234-R000273-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 3 	4/4/22 
 
or deny claim payments in accordance with the Insurance 
Department's regulations;   
2. permit monthly payment of premiums unless the tenant selects a 
different payment schedule;  
3. take effect when a tenant makes the first premium payment and 
remain effective for the entire lease time with certain exceptions; 
and 
4. provide per claim coverage not less than the amount the landlord 
would have required for the security deposit.   
Additionally, the bill requires insurance companies that provide 
damage insurance coverage to provide landlords with written notice 
within 10 days after a tenant cancels a policy or allows it to lapse.  
Finally, the bill allows tenants that have opted to use a damage 
insurance coverage policy to cancel it at any time and instead pay the 
full security deposit their landlord requires. In such a case, the bill 
prohibits a landlord from altering the lease terms. (Presumably, this 
means altering the terms other than the security deposit provision.)  
§ 2 — PRE-OCCUPANCY WALK -THROUGHS  
Beginning January 1, 2023, the bill requires landlords to give tenants 
the opportunity to request and complete a pre-occupancy "walk-
through" of a dwelling unit after or at the time of entering into a rental 
agreement. 
Under the bill, a "walk-through" means a joint, in-person inspection 
of a dwelling unit by the landlord and tenant or their designees to note 
and list the unit's existing conditions, defects, or damages using a DOH 
checklist. The bill requires the DOH commissioner to prepare this 
standardized, pre-occupancy walk-through checklist and make it 
available on DOH's website by December 1, 2023. Following a 
walkthrough, landlords and tenants or their designees must each sign 
and receive duplicate copies of the checklist.  2022HB-05234-R000273-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 4 	4/4/22 
 
When a tenant vacates the dwelling unit, the bill prohibits a landlord 
from keeping any portion of a tenant's security deposit or seeking 
payment for a condition, defect, or damage noted in the preoccupancy 
walk-through checklist. In administrative or judicial proceedings, this 
checklist is admissible, but not conclusive, as evidence of the unit’s 
condition at the beginning of a tenant's occupancy. 
§ 3 — LIMITS ON APPLICATION FEES FOR PROSPECTIVE 
TENANTS 
The bill prohibits landlords from requiring prospective tenants to pay 
rental application-related fees or make any other payments before or at 
the start of tenancy unless the fee is for a tenant screening report. Under 
the bill, a "tenant screening report" means a credit report, a criminal 
background report, an employment history report, a rental history 
report, or any combination of these that a landlord uses to determine a 
prospective tenant’s suitability.  
The bill allows landlords to charge prospective tenants a fee or fees 
to reimburse costs associated with conducting a tenant screening report. 
The cumulative fee cannot exceed $20 or the actual cost of the report, 
whichever is less. Additionally, the bill requires landlords to waive the 
tenant screening report fee if a prospective tenant provides a copy of a 
tenant screening report that (1) is satisfactory to the landlord and (2) was 
conducted within 30 days of the tenant's rental application.  
§ 4 — REQUIRED NOTICE FOR PROTECTED TENANTS 
By law, "protected tenants" are generally those residing in certain 
buildings or mobile manufactured home parks who are (1) at least age 
62 or (2) individuals with disabilities. Existing law prohibits protected 
tenants from being evicted solely for their lease expiring (i.e., lapse of 
time). It also requires that their rent only be increased by an amount that 
is fair and equitable and allows those aggrieved by a rent increase, and 
residing in a municipality without a fair rent commission, to bring 
action to contest the increase in Superior Court. Beginning January 1, 
2023, the bill requires landlords or their agents to provide protected 
tenants with a written DOH notice summarizing these provisions when 
a unit is rented to, or a rental agreement is entered into or renewed with,  2022HB-05234-R000273-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 5 	4/4/22 
 
them.   
Under the bill, the DOH commissioner must create a one-page, plain-
language summary of protected tenants' rights and post it on the 
department website by January 1, 2023. The bill requires that the notice 
be available in other languages in addition to English, as determined by 
the commissioner.  
BACKGROUND 
Related Bill 
HB 5233 (File 107), favorably reported by the Housing Committee, 
extends protections available to “protected tenants” to all tenants in 
those buildings.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Housing Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 15 Nay 0 (03/15/2022)