Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05234 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/22/2022

                     
Researcher: SM 	Page 1 	4/22/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5234 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE RIGHTS AND RESPONSIBILITIES OF 
LANDLORDS AND TENANTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes a number of changes in laws about landlords and 
tenants.  
Beginning January 1, 2023, the bill requires landlords to give tenants 
the opportunity to request and complete a pre-occupancy “walk-
through” of a dwelling unit after or at the time of entering into a rental 
agreement. The bill prohibits a landlord from keeping any portion of a 
tenant’s security deposit or seeking payment for conditions specifically 
identified during the walk-through. Rental agreements entered into 
before January 1, 2023, are exempt from the bill’s walk-through 
requirements.  
The bill limits rental application-related fees that landlords may 
demand from prospective tenants to reimbursements for tenant 
screening reports. It requires landlords to (1) provide tenants with these 
reports and a receipt or invoice and (2) waive the fee if the prospective 
tenant provides a recent tenant screening report that is satisfactory to 
the landlord.   
Beginning January 1, 2023, the bill requires landlords to provide 
tenants with a written Department of Housing (DOH) notice 
summarizing the rights of protected tenants (i.e., certain tenants at least 
age 62 or with a disability) whenever they rent, or enter or renew an 
agreement to rent, certain dwelling units. 
Finally, the bill makes technical and conforming changes.  
*House Amendment “A” (1) eliminates provisions (a) allowing 
landlords to accept damage insurance coverage in place of traditional  2022HB-05234-R010591-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 2 	4/22/22 
 
security deposits and (b) requiring landlords to provide eligible tenants 
with voter registration applications; (2) advances the deadline by which 
DOH must prepare a pre-occupancy walk-through checklist; (3) 
eliminates the $20 cap on screening report reimbursement fees; (4)  
expressly exempts security deposits from the underlying bill’s 
limitations on rental application-related fees; and (5)  requires landlords 
of certain dwelling units to provide information about protected 
tenants’ rights to all tenants, rather than only protected tenants. 
  EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2022 
§ 1 — PRE-OCCUPANCY WALK -THROUGHS  
Beginning January 1, 2023, the bill requires landlords to give tenants 
the opportunity to request and complete a pre-occupancy “walk-
through” of a dwelling unit after or at the time of entering into a rental 
agreement. 
Under the bill, a “walk-through” means a joint, in-person inspection 
of a dwelling unit by the landlord and tenant or their designees to note 
and list the unit’s existing conditions, defects, or damages using a DOH 
checklist. The bill requires the DOH commissioner to prepare this 
standardized, pre-occupancy walk-through checklist and make it 
available on DOH’s website by December 1, 2022. Following a 
walkthrough, landlords and tenants or their designees must each sign 
and receive duplicate copies of the checklist. 
When a tenant vacates the dwelling unit, the bill prohibits a landlord 
from keeping any portion of a tenant’s security deposit or seeking 
payment for a condition, defect, or damage noted in the preoccupancy 
walk-through checklist. In administrative or judicial proceedings, this 
checklist is admissible, subject to the rules of evidence, but not 
conclusive, as evidence of the unit’s condition at the beginning of a 
tenant’s occupancy. 
§ 2 — LIMITS ON APPLICATION FEES FOR PROSPECTIVE 
TENANTS 
The bill prohibits landlords from requiring prospective tenants to pay 
rental application-related fees or make any other payments before or at  2022HB-05234-R010591-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 3 	4/22/22 
 
the start of tenancy unless the fee is for a tenant screening report (or 
security deposit). Under the bill, a “tenant screening report” means a 
credit report, a criminal background report, an employment history 
report, a rental history report, or any combination of these that a 
landlord uses to determine a prospective tenant’s suitability.  
The bill allows landlords to charge prospective tenants a fee or fees 
to reimburse costs associated with conducting a tenant screening report, 
if the cumulative fee does not exceed the actual cost of the report. 
Additionally, the bill requires landlords to waive the tenant screening 
report fee if a prospective tenant provides a copy of a tenant screening 
report that (1) is satisfactory to the landlord and (2) was conducted 
within 30 days of the tenant’s rental application.  
§ 3 — REQUIRED NOTICE OF PROTECTED TENANT STATUS  
By law, certain tenants have additional protections against evictions 
and rent increases (see below). These “protected tenants” generally 
include those residing in dwelling units in buildings or complexes 
consisting of five or more separate units or mobile manufactured home 
parks who are (1) at least age 62 or (2) individuals with disabilities. 
Beginning January 1, 2023, the bill requires landlords or their agents to 
provide a written DOH notice summarizing these protections to any 
tenant that rents, or enters or renews an agreement to rent, one of the 
units described above.   
Existing law, unchanged by the bill, prohibits protected tenants from 
being evicted solely for their lease expiring (i.e., lapse of time). It also 
requires that their rent only be increased by an amount that is fair and 
equitable and allows those aggrieved by a rent increase, and residing in 
a municipality without a fair rent commission, to bring action to contest 
the increase in Superior Court.  
Under the bill, the DOH commissioner must create the one-page, 
plain-language summary of protected tenants’ rights and post it on the 
department’s website by January 1, 2023. The bill requires that the notice 
be available in other languages in addition to English, as determined by 
the commissioner.   2022HB-05234-R010591-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 4 	4/22/22 
 
BACKGROUND 
Related Bill 
HB 5233 (File 107), favorably reported by the Housing Committee, 
extends protections available to “protected tenants” to all tenants in 
those buildings.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Housing Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 15 Nay 0 (03/15/2022)