Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05282 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/26/2022

                     
Researcher: JM 	Page 1 	4/26/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5282  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE INCLUSION OF ASIAN AMERICAN 
AND PACIFIC ISLANDER STUDIES IN THE PUBLIC SCHOOL 
CURRICULUM.  
 
SUMMARY 
Beginning with the 2025-26 school year, this bill (1) requires all local 
and regional boards of education to include Asian American and Pacific 
Islander (AAPI) studies in their social studies curriculum and (2) adds 
AAPI studies to the state’s existing required program of instruction for 
public schools as part of the social studies curriculum. As with other 
required subject matter areas under existing law, the bill requires the 
State Board of Education (SBE) to make AAPI curriculum materials 
available to help boards develop their instructional programs. 
The bill requires boards of education, in their AAPI curriculum, to at 
least include a focus on the history of Asian American and Pacific 
Islanders in the state, region, and United States, and their contributions 
(1) towards advancing civil rights from the 19th century to the present 
day; (2) as individuals, in government, the arts, humanities, and 
sciences; and (3) as communities, to the economic, cultural, social, and 
political development of the United States. 
In developing and implementing the new AAPI curriculum, the bill 
allows boards to (1) use existing and appropriate public or private 
materials, personnel, and resources, including curriculum materials that 
SBE must make available under the bill and (2) accept gifts, grants, and 
donations, including in-kind donations. The curriculum must also meet 
SBE’s statewide subject matter content standards.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2022, for the new curriculum requirement 
for boards of education; July 1, 2025 for the addition of AAPI studies to 
the required program of instruction.  2022HB-05282-R000632-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 2 	4/26/22 
 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Education Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference - APP 
Yea 36 Nay 3 (03/11/2022) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 50 Nay 0 (04/07/2022)