Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05372 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/03/2022

                     
Researcher: DC 	Page 1 	5/3/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5372 (as amended by House “A”)*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING PERIODIC BEHAVIORAL HEALTH 
ASSESSMENTS, POLICE OFFICER RECRUITMENT, SCHOOL 
RESOURCE OFFICERS, REPORTING OF VIOLATIONS TO THE 
POLICE OFFICER STANDARDS AND TRAINING COUNCIL, 
INVESTIGATIONS BY THE INSPECTOR GENERAL AND MINIMUM 
STANDARDS AND PRACTICES FOR THE ADMINISTRATION, 
MANAGEMENT AND OPERATION OF LAW ENFORCEMENT UNITS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes various changes in the laws governing law 
enforcement units. Specifically, it does the following: 
1. allows licensed clinical social workers, in addition to 
psychiatrists and psychologists, to conduct the behavioral health 
assessments of police officers required under existing law (§ 1); 
2. expands the requirements for law enforcement unit guidelines on 
minority police officer recruitment, retention, and promotion to 
include, among other things, the goal of achieving ideological 
diversity, in addition to racial, gender, and ethnic diversity, 
within law enforcement units and community involvement (§ 2); 
3. requires the Board of Regents for Higher Education (BOR) to 
select an institute of higher learning to (a) study school resources 
officers’ role and impact on students with disabilities and (b) 
report its findings to the Judiciary Committee by December 1, 
2022 (§ 3); 
4. requires (a) law enforcement units to report to the Police Officer 
Standards and Training Council (POST) instances where police 
officers commit certain prohibited actions (e.g., excessive force or 
failure to intervene) and (b) the Office of the Inspector General 
(OIG) to investigate law enforcement units who fail to report and 
submit its findings to the governor and Judiciary Committee (§§  2022HB-05372-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 2 	5/3/22 
 
4 & 5); and 
5. adds two members to the Correction Advisory Committee 
established in sSB 459, as amended by Senate “A”, and passed by 
both chambers. 
*House Amendment “A” (1) requires  a BOR-selected institution to 
study, rather than study and evaluate as in the underlying bill, school 
resource officers’ role and impact on students with disabilities; (2) 
eliminates the provision on police accreditation, and (3) adds the 
provision on the Correction Advisory Committee membership. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2022, except the provisions on the (1) 
school resource officer study and Correction Advisory Committee 
membership take effect upon passage and (2) social worker behavioral 
health assessment take effect July 1, 2022. 
§ 1 — SOCIAL WORKER BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ASSESSMENT 
Existing law generally requires police officers to submit to a periodic 
behavioral health assessment at least once every five years as a 
condition of continued employment. (Officers may also be required to 
submit to an additional assessment for good cause shown.)  
The bill allows licensed clinical social workers to conduct the 
assessments, in addition to board-certified psychiatrists and licensed 
psychologists as under current law.   
As under current law, behavioral health assessments conducted by 
clinical social workers are not subject to disclosure under the Freedom 
of Information Act.  
§ 2 — MINORITY POLICE OFFICER GUIDELINES 
By law, each law enforcement unit (see BACKGROUND) must 
develop and implement guidelines for recruiting, retaining, and 
promoting minority police officers.  
The bill requires the guidelines to promote the goal of achieving 
ideological diversity within law enforcement units, in addition to racial,  2022HB-05372-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 3 	5/3/22 
 
gender, and ethnic diversity as under current law. It also requires the 
guidelines to promote achieving these diversity goals within 
community involvement.  
§ 3 — SCHOOL RESOURCE OFFICER STUDY 
The bill requires, within 30 days after its passage, BOR to select a 
public higher education institution to study the role and impact of 
school resource officers on students with disabilities.  
Under the bill, the selected institution must do the following: 
1. determine the number of school resource officers employed in 
the state and located in each school district; 
2. detail the funding mechanisms each district uses to employ these 
officers; 
3. develop metrics for assessing the officers’ efficacy, particularly in 
the context of interacting with students with disabilities; 
4. determine the chain of command structure when students with 
disabilities experience crises in school, including who responds 
and when; 
5. determine the process for entering into memoranda of 
understanding between school districts, boards of education, and 
school resource officers, and the public’s accessibility to this 
process; and 
6. explore other issues the institution deems relevant. 
The bill requires the selected institution to report its findings to the 
Judiciary Committee by December 1, 2022. 
§§ 4 & 5 — USE OF EXCESSIVE FORCE REPORT 
The bill requires each law enforcement unit’s chief law enforcement 
officer to report to POST anytime the unit found, based on its 
established procedures, that a police officer did the following:  2022HB-05372-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 4 	5/3/22 
 
1. used unreasonable, excessive, or illegal force that (a) caused 
serious physical injury to or death of another person or (b) was 
likely to cause serious physical injury or death to another person;  
2. while acting in a law enforcement capacity, failed to (a) intervene 
or stop the use of unreasonable, excessive, or illegal force by 
another police officer that caused or was likely to cause serious 
physical injury or death to another person or (b) notify a 
supervisor and submit a written report of these acts when the 
police officer has personal knowledge of these acts and the ability 
to prevent them;  
3. intentionally intimidated or harassed another person based on 
actual or perceived protected class membership, identity, or 
expression and in doing so threatened to commit or caused 
physical injury to another person; and  
4. has been terminated, dismissed, resigned, or retired due to the 
state law prohibiting the hiring of certain officers who 
committed, or were investigated for, prior malfeasance.  
The bill requires POST to notify OIG if the municipal chief law 
enforcement officer or Department of Emergency Services and Public 
Protection (DESPP) fails to make this required report. OIG must then 
investigate the failure and submit its findings to the governor and 
Judiciary Committee.  
§ 6 — CRIMINAL ADVISORY COMMITTEE 
sHB 459, as amended by Senate “A” and passed by both chambers, 
establishes a Correction Advisory Committee to, among other things, 
submit a list of correction ombuds candidates to the governor and meet 
quarterly with the ombuds. The bill increases the committee 
membership, from nine to 11, by adding the following appointments: 
1. a member who is a victim of violent crime, a person who 
advocates for victims’ rights, or an attorney who represented a 
victim of a violent crime, appointed by the Judiciary Committee 
House ranking member and   2022HB-05372-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 5 	5/3/22 
 
2. a member who has expertise in corrections, appointed by the 
Judiciary Committee Senate ranking member. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Judiciary Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 39 Nay 0 (03/29/2022) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 49 Nay 1 (04/22/2022)