Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00003 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/02/2022

                     
 
 
 
LCO No. 2549   	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 3  
February Session, 2022  
LCO No. 2549 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND 
EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HED)  
 
 
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE BOARD OF REGENTS FOR HIGHER 
EDUCATION TO DEVELOP SEMINAR PROGRAMS FOR SMALL 
BUSINESSES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2022) (a) For the purposes of this 1 
section, "small business" means a business located in the state with 2 
twenty-five employees or less. 3 
(b) Not later than September 1, 2022, the Board of Regents for Higher 4 
Education shall, within available funds, develop seminar programs to 5 
assist small businesses with adapting to a changing business 6 
environment through courses in subject areas, including, but not limited 7 
to, electronic commerce, social media and virtual currency, as defined 8 
in subsection (18) of section 36a-596 of the general statutes. Said board 9 
shall prescribe forms and procedures by which not more than two 10 
employees of any small business may enroll in not more than five 11 
seminar programs or courses within such seminar programs at the 12 
Northwestern Connecticut Community College Entrepreneurial Center 13 
or the Werth Innovation and Entrepreneurial Center at Housatonic 14    
Committee Bill No.  3 
 
 
LCO No. 2549   	2 of 2 
 
Community College at no cost to such small business. 15 
Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2022) For the fiscal years ending June 30, 2023, 16 
and June 30, 2024, the Board of Regents for Higher Education may 17 
expend funds received by the state pursuant to the American Rescue 18 
Plan Act of 2021, P.L. 117-2, as amended from time to time, for the 19 
purpose of developing seminar programs for small businesses pursuant 20 
to section 1 of this act. 21 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2022 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2022 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To require the Board of Regents for Higher Education to develop 
seminar programs for small businesses to enroll employees in courses 
relating to online commerce at regional community-technical colleges. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  SEN. LOONEY, 11th Dist.; SEN. DUFF, 25th Dist. 
SEN. ANWAR, 3rd Dist.; SEN. CABRERA, 17th Dist. 
SEN. CASSANO, 4th Dist.; SEN. COHEN, 12th Dist. 
SEN. DAUGHERTY ABRAMS, 13th Dist.; SEN. FLEXER, 29th Dist. 
SEN. FONFARA, 1st Dist.; SEN. HASKELL, 26th Dist. 
SEN. KUSHNER, 24th Dist.; SEN. LOPES, 6th Dist. 
SEN. MILLER P., 27th Dist.; SEN. MOORE, 22nd Dist. 
SEN. SLAP, 5th Dist.; SEN. WINFIELD, 10th Dist. 
REP. THOMAS, 143rd Dist.  
 
S.B. 3