Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00010 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/05/2022

                     
Researcher: MF 	Page 1 	4/5/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 10  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CLIMATE CHANGE MITIGATION.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the state to eliminate greenhouse gas emissions 
from electricity supplied to electric customers in the state by January 1, 
2040. The bill establishes this requirement as an emissions reduction 
goal under the state’s Global Warming Solutions Act (see 
BACKGROUND).  
By law and under the bill, the Global Warming Solutions Act requires 
the state to reduce greenhouse gas emissions from all sources to a level 
at least (1) 10% below the level emitted in 1990 by January 1, 2020; (2) 
45% below the level emitted in 2001 by January 1, 2030; and (3) 80% 
below the level emitted in 2001 by January 1, 2050. The bill additionally 
requires the state to reduce greenhouse gas emissions from electricity 
supplied to electric customers in the state to zero percent by January 1, 
2040.  
By law, the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection 
(DEEP) commissioner determines emission levels. Greenhouse gas 
includes any chemical or physical substance emitted into the air that the 
DEEP commissioner reasonably anticipates will cause or contribute to 
climate change (e.g., carbon dioxide, methane, nitrous oxide, 
hydrofluorocarbons, perfluorocarbons, and sulfur hexafluoride).  
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2022 
BACKGROUND 
Global Warming Solutions Act Reporting Requirements 
By law, state agencies on the governor’s Steering Committee on 
Climate Change must report biannually to the Office of Policy and 
Management (OPM) secretary and the DEEP commissioner on, among  2022SB-00010-R000305-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 2 	4/5/22 
 
other things, policies and regulations that the agencies can adopt in the 
near future to reduce greenhouse gas emissions in accordance with the 
Global Warming Solutions Act.  
By law, every three years, the DEEP commissioner, in consultation 
with OPM and the governor’s Steering Committee on Climate Change 
must report to the Energy and Technology, Environment, and 
Transportation committees on quantifiable emissions reductions 
achieved under these provisions. Among other things, the report must 
include a schedule of proposed regulations, policies, and strategies 
designed to achieve the act’s emissions reduction requirements.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Energy and Technology Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 21 Nay 5 (03/22/2022)