Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00089 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/14/2022

                        
 
 
LCO No. 1115  	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 89  
February Session, 2022 
LCO No. 1115 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PH)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING SURGICAL SMOKE. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2022) (a) As used in this section:  1 
(1) "Hospital" means an establishment licensed pursuant to chapter 2 
368v of the general statutes for the lodging, care and treatment of 3 
persons suffering from disease or other abnormal physical or mental 4 
conditions;  5 
(2) "Outpatient surgical facility" means any entity, individual, firm, 6 
partnership, corporation, limited liability company or association, other 7 
than a hospital, licensed pursuant to chapter 368v of the general statutes 8 
to engage in providing surgical services or diagnostic procedures for 9 
human health conditions that include the use of moderate or deep 10 
sedation, moderate or deep analgesia or general anesthesia, as such 11 
levels of anesthesia are defined from time to time by the American 12 
Society of Anesthesiologists, or by such other professional or accrediting 13 
entity recognized by the Department of Public Health;  14 
(3) "Surgical smoke" means the by-product of the use of an energy-15  Raised Bill No.  89 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1115   	2 of 3 
 
generating device during surgery, including, but not limited to, surgical 16 
plume, smoke plume, bioaerosols, laser -generated airborne 17 
contaminants and lung-damaging dust; and  18 
(4) "Surgical smoke evacuation system" means a system, including, 19 
but not limited to, a smoke evacuator, laser plume evacuator or local 20 
exhaust ventilator that captures and neutralizes surgical smoke (A) at 21 
the site of origin of such surgical smoke, and (B) before the surgical 22 
smoke makes contact with the eyes or respiratory tract of any person in 23 
an operating room during surgery.  24 
(b) Not later than January 1, 2023, each hospital and outpatient 25 
surgical facility shall develop a policy for the use of a surgical smoke 26 
evacuation system to prevent a person's exposure to surgical smoke. 27 
Not later than October 1, 2023, each hospital and outpatient facility shall 28 
implement such policy and report to the Department of Public Health 29 
regarding the implementation of such policy.  30 
(c) Not later than January 1, 2024, the Commissioner of Public Health 31 
shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the 32 
general statutes, to the joint standing committee of the General 33 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health 34 
regarding each hospital's and outpatient surgical facility's policy 35 
regarding the use of a surgical smoke evacuation system and the 36 
implementation by each hospital and outpatient surgical facility of such 37 
policy. 38 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2022 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To require hospitals and outpatient surgical facilities to adopt and 
implement a policy to prevent human exposure to surgical smoke 
through the use of a surgical smoke evacuation system.  Raised Bill No.  89 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1115   	3 of 3 
 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]