Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00106 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/13/2022

                    Analyst: PM  	Page 1 	4/12/22 
 
 
 
 
OFA Bill Analysis 
SB 106 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING LEGISLATIVE OVERSIGHT AND 
APPROVAL FOR THE EXPENDITURE OF FEDERAL 
TRANSPORTATION INFRASTRUCTURE FUNDING. 
 
SUMMARY: 
The bill establishes the Connecticut Infrastructure Strategy Board to 
report to the legislature on strategy and recommendations regarding the 
use of federal funding received by the state pursuant to the 
Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act (IIJA), P.L. 117-58. The bill 
outlines the membership and responsibilities of the board, requires 
various state agencies to provide staff assistance to the board, sets 
deadlines for its activities, and outlines legislative approval 
responsibilities.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon Passage 
Establishment of the Connecticut Infrastructure Strategy Board 
The bill establishes a 19-member Connecticut Infrastructure Strategy 
Board. It allows the board to establish organizational guidelines, hire 
consultants subject to the approval of the Office of Policy and 
Management (OPM), and requires various state agencies to provide 
staff assistance to the board. 
Board membership consists of one gubernatorial appointment who 
shall serve as the chair, nine legislative appointments, and nine 
executive branch officials serving ex-officio. Board members serve 
without compensation, and initial board terms expire on a staggered 
basis with subsequent appointments lasting four years. Members are 
appointed as follows:  
• Five members from the private sector, each having specified areas  2022SB-00106-R000435-BA.DOCX 
Analyst: PM 	Page 2 	4/12/22 
of expertise, including one by the Governor (chair) and one by 
each of the following: president pro tempore of the Senate, 
speaker of the House, and minority leaders of the Senate and 
House.  
• One member from each of the five transportation investment 
areas (TIAs) defined in CGS. Sec. 13b-57d. The chairs of the board 
of the local planning agencies in each TIA must nominate three 
individuals, at least one of whom must be a chief elected official 
in a municipality in such TIA, for consideration by the respective 
appointing authorities, which are as follows: Transportation 
Committee chairs for the southeast corridor TIA; Senate president 
pro tempore for the I-91 TIA; speaker of the House for the coastal 
corridor TIA; Senate majority leader for the I-395 TIA; and House 
majority leader for the I-84 TIA.  
• Nine executive branch officials serving ex-officio, including: the 
Commissioners of Administrative Services, Transportation, 
Energy and Environmental Protection, Economic and 
Community Development, Revenue Services, Public Health, 
Emergency Services and Public Protection, the Secretary of OPM, 
and the Consumer Counsel. 
 Duties of the Board 
The board is required, no later than January 1, 2023, to report to the 
Transportation and Appropriation Committees (the committees) on a 
strategy and recommended allocations for the use of funding received 
by the state pursuant to IIJA. The board must update the strategy, if 
necessary, by December 15, 2024, and every two years thereafter. The 
strategy, including all such updates and revisions, is subject to the 
approval of the committees and must be posted on the public websites 
of the board, the Department of Transportation (DOT) and OPM.  
In developing the strategy, the board is required to consider DOT's 
long-range plans and to include criteria for prioritizing infrastructure 
projects. Additionally, the board may conduct public hearings, consult 
with stakeholders and other relevant documentation, and request  2022SB-00106-R000435-BA.DOCX 
Analyst: PM 	Page 3 	4/12/22 
information from any public entity in the state.   
Legislative Approval 
Within 15 days of receipt of the board's initial report, the committees 
must meet to either approve or modify the board's recommended 
allocations. If the committees do not act within 15 days, the board's 
recommendations shall be deemed approved.   
On and after July 1, 2024, within 15 days of receipt of any IIJA funds, 
the board must again submit recommended allocations to the 
committees, who must either approve or modify such recommendations 
within 15 days. 
OPM must report any proposed changes to both the board and the 
committees. The committees must either approve or modify the 
proposed changes within 15 days.  
Disbursement and Accounting of Funds 
Disbursement of IIJA funds by OPM must be in accordance with the 
board's recommendations, as modified or approved by the committees. 
If allocations are not found to be allowable under federal rules, OPM 
must immediately notify the committees regarding the amounts, 
intended recipients, and reasons that such allocations are not allowed.  
The bill further requires the board and OPM, not later than January 
1, 2024 and annually thereafter, to jointly report to the committees on: 
(1) a full accounting of funds received and disbursed, (2) a plan for the 
disbursement of any remaining funds, (3) a description of any projects 
wholly or partially funded via IIJA, and (4) the status of each such 
project and timeline for completion.  
DOT Reporting Requirements 
The bill requires DOT, on or before February 1, 2023, and annually 
thereafter, to report to the committees on: (1) the department's capital 
plan, (2) the condition of the state's transportation infrastructure, and (3) 
DOT's long-range transportation plan. The committees must hold a 
public hearing on the report within 30 days, at which time DOT must  2022SB-00106-R000435-BA.DOCX 
Analyst: PM 	Page 4 	4/12/22 
provide a detailed summary and fiscal analysis of the report.  
The bill also requires DOT to establish a separate internet page 
dedicated to the status of the department's various capital projects, as 
outlined in the bill.   
BACKGROUND 
Federal Transportation Funding 
Federal transportation funds are provided to states on a reimbursable 
basis through dozens of programs and funding categories. In general, 
federal funds are not received by state DOTs until after projects have 
been authorized by the relevant federal agency, states have made 
payments for actual costs incurred, and states have submitted bills to 
the federal agency for reimbursement of such costs. Given that DOT 
typically has hundreds of federal-aid projects ongoing at any given time, 
the actual number of individual disbursements to the department is 
high.  
Additionally, federal programs typically include established funding 
ratios that define the federal and state cost share responsibilities. For 
transportation formula funding, the federal share is 80%-90%, though it 
could be higher for certain projects including eligible safety or 
innovation projects. For competitive grant programs, the federal share 
can vary widely but is typically below 50% of total project costs. In 
Connecticut, the state share for federal transportation projects is 
normally provided through bond funds.  
Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act 
In November 2021, IIJA was signed into law, directing $1.2 trillion in 
funding nationwide for roads, bridges, ports, and airports as well as 
expanded clean water, broadband, and climate initiatives. Under the 
law, Connecticut is expected to receive approximately $5.38 billion in 
transportation formula funding over five years, which is 43% higher 
than the previous federal authorization for Connecticut's ongoing 
transportation capital programs. The law also includes over $100 billion 
in competitive grant programs, as well as an additional $30 billion 
specific to the Northeast Corridor, for which Connecticut may be  2022SB-00106-R000435-BA.DOCX 
Analyst: PM 	Page 5 	4/12/22 
eligible to apply, among other provisions. It should be noted that IIJA 
funds largely represent a continuation and expansion of existing federal 
programs.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Appropriations 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 49 Nay 0