Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00120 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/22/2022

                     
Researcher: KLM 	Page 1 	3/22/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 120  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE USE OF CHLORPYRIFOS ON GOLF 
COURSES AND NEONICOTINOIDS FOR NONAGRICULTURAL USE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill prohibits: 
1. using or applying chlorpyrifos (a) on golf courses or (b) for 
cosmetic or nonagricultural uses and 
2. beginning January 1, 2023, selling, possessing, or using pesticides 
containing any neonicotinoid except for use on an agricultural 
plant or in pet care, veterinary, personal care, or indoor pest 
control pesticide products (see BACKGROUND). 
Under the bill, for purposes of the neonicotinoid ban, an “agricultural 
plant” is a plant, or plant part, that is grown, maintained, or produced 
for commercial purposes, such as for sale or trade, research or 
experiments, or use (in whole or part) in another location (e.g., grain, 
fruit, vegetable, wood fiber or timber product, flowering or foliage plant 
or tree, seedling, transplant, or turf grass for sod). It excludes pasture or 
rangeland for grazing. 
The bill enables the Department of Energy and Environmental 
Protection (DEEP) commissioner to enforce both bans in accordance 
with her existing authority under the state’s pesticide control law (CGS 
§ 22a-46 et seq.). By law, DEEP regulates pesticide registration, sale, and 
application, and the certification of pesticide applicators. Among other 
things, the DEEP commissioner has the authority to do inspections, 
revoke or suspend certifications, and take court action through the 
Attorney General. Existing law, unchanged by the bill, subjects those 
who knowingly violate the pesticide laws to criminal fines of up to 
$5,000, up to one year in jail, or both. Violators may also be subject to 
civil penalties of up to $2,500 per day that violations continue (CGS §  2022SB-00120-R000068-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 2 	3/22/22 
 
22a-63). 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2022 
BACKGROUND 
AGRICULTURE UNDER § 1-1(q) 
The state’s general definitions of agriculture and farming include, 
among other things, soil cultivation, dairying, forestry, raising or 
harvesting an agricultural commodity, including raising, shearing, 
feeding, caring for, training, and managing livestock, including horses, 
bees (honey production), poultry, fur-bearing animals, and wildlife. The 
terms also include such things as aquaculture; operating or maintaining 
a farm and its equipment (as part of farming operations); harvesting or 
producing maple syrup or lumber (as part of farming operations); 
harvesting mushrooms; hatching poultry; making or maintaining 
ditches or waterways for farming; and certain actions to market or sell 
farm products. 
CHLORPYRIFOS  
Chlorpyrifos is a “restricted use” organophosphate pesticide used 
mainly to control foliage and soil-borne insect pests. By law, because 
chlorpyrifos is a restricted use pesticide, it may only be applied by 
someone certified under state law to do so, or by someone directly 
supervised by a certified individual. Restricted use pesticides are those 
classified by the federal Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) or 
DEEP as they may cause unreasonable adverse health or environmental 
effects.  
There is an ongoing review and assessment of the pesticide’s 
registration. In 2021, EPA issued a final rule revoking the tolerances of 
chlorpyrifos (i.e., the maximum amount of a pesticide that may remain 
in or on a food), as of February 28, 2022. The tolerance revocation applies 
to land and greenhouse food crops and certain commercial livestock 
uses.  
NEONICOTINOID 
By law, a neonicotinoid is a pesticide that selectively acts on an  2022SB-00120-R000068-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 3 	3/22/22 
 
organism’s nicotinic acetylcholine receptors (i.e., impacts the nervous 
system), including clothianidin, dinotefuran, imidacloprid, 
thiamethoxam, and any other pesticide that the DEEP commissioner, 
after consulting with the Connecticut Agricultural Experiment Station, 
determines will kill at least 50% of a bee population when up to two 
micrograms of it is applied to each bee (CGS § 22-61k).  
Neonicotinoids that are labeled for treating plants are “restricted 
use,” meaning that they may only be applied by someone certified 
under state law to do so, or by someone directly supervised by a 
certified person (see Chlorpyrifos, above). Neonicotinoids are also under 
EPA review. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 21 Nay 10 (03/04/2022)