Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00120 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/21/2022

                     
Researcher: KLM 	Page 1 	4/21/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 120 (File 68, as amended by Senate “A”)*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE USE OF CHLORPYRIFOS ON GOLF 
COURSES AND NEONICOTINOIDS FOR NONAGRICULTURAL USE.  
 
SUMMARY 
Beginning January 1, 2023, this bill prohibits using or applying 
chlorpyrifos (1) on golf courses or (2) for cosmetic or nonagricultural 
uses (see BACKGROUND). The bill allows the Department of Energy 
and Environmental Protection (DEEP) commissioner to assess a civil 
penalty of up to $2,500 to violators of the ban. 
The bill also requires the DEEP commissioner to establish a working 
group to determine (1) if additional statutory restrictions or prohibitions 
on using neonicotinoids are needed (see BACKGROUND) and (2) the 
agricultural plants and pet care and personal products that should be 
exempt from them. The commissioner must submit a report to the 
Environment Committee by January 1, 2023, on the working group’s 
recommendations. 
Under the bill, the DEEP commissioner selects the working group’s 
members. Members must be from DEEP, the Connecticut Agricultural 
Experiment Station, the Connecticut Grounds Keepers Association, the 
Connecticut Pest Control Association, the Connecticut Association of 
Golf Course Superintendents, Friends of the Earth, Pollinators Pathway, 
and the Connecticut Beekeeper’s Association.  
*Senate Amendment “A” (1) replaces the underlying bill’s general 
ban on using pesticides with neonicotinoids with the neonicotinoid 
working group; (2) establishes the specific civil penalty for a 
chlorpyrifos ban violation, instead of allowing DEEP to enforce the ban 
within its existing pesticide enforcement authority; and (3) delays the 
chlorpyrifos ban by three months (from October 1, 2022, to January 1, 
2023).  2022SB-00120-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 2 	4/21/22 
 
EFFECTIVE DATE: January 1, 2023, except the working group 
provision takes effect upon passage. 
BACKGROUND 
Agriculture Under § 1-1(q) 
The state’s general definitions of agriculture and farming include, 
among other things, (1) soil cultivation; (2) dairying; (3) forestry;  and 
(4) raising or harvesting an agricultural commodity, including raising, 
shearing, feeding, caring for, training, and managing livestock, 
including horses, bees (honey production), poultry, fur-bearing 
animals, and wildlife. The terms also include such things as aquaculture; 
operating or maintaining a farm and its equipment (as part of farming 
operations); harvesting or producing maple syrup or lumber (as part of 
farming operations); harvesting mushrooms; hatching poultry; making 
or maintaining ditches or waterways for farming; and certain actions to 
market or sell farm products. 
Chlorpyrifos  
Chlorpyrifos is a “restricted use” organophosphate pesticide used 
mainly to control foliage and soil-borne insect pests. By law, because 
chlorpyrifos is a restricted use pesticide, it may only be applied by 
someone (1) certified under state law to do so or  (2) directly supervised 
by a certified individual. Restricted use pesticides are those classified by 
the federal Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) or DEEP as they 
may cause unreasonable adverse health or environmental effects.  
There is an ongoing review and assessment of the pesticide’s 
registration. In 2021, EPA issued a final rule revoking the tolerances of 
chlorpyrifos (i.e., the maximum amount of a pesticide that may remain 
in or on a food) as of February 28, 2022. The tolerance revocation applies 
to land and greenhouse food crops and certain commercial livestock 
uses.  
Neonicotinoid 
By law, a neonicotinoid is a pesticide that selectively acts on an 
organism’s nicotinic acetylcholine receptors (i.e., impacts the nervous 
system), including clothianidin, dinotefuran, imidacloprid,  2022SB-00120-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 3 	4/21/22 
 
thiamethoxam, and any other pesticide that the DEEP commissioner, 
after consulting with the Connecticut Agricultural Experiment Station, 
determines will kill at least 50% of a bee population when up to two 
micrograms of it is applied to each bee (CGS § 22-61k). Neonicotinoids 
that are labeled for treating plants are “restricted use,” meaning that 
they may only be applied by someone (1) certified under state law to do 
so or  (2) directly supervised by a certified person (see Chlorpyrifos, 
above). Neonicotinoids are also under EPA review. 
Existing law prohibits applying (1) an insecticide that is a 
neonicotinoid to linden or basswood trees in the state (CGS § 22a-61a) 
and (2) a neonicotinoid that is labeled for treating plants to a blossoming 
plant unless it, among other things, is in a greenhouse that is inaccessible 
to pollinators (CGS § 22a-61b). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 21 Nay 10 (03/04/2022) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 36 Nay 12 (04/18/2022)