Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00127 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/16/2022

                     
Researcher: JSB 	Page 1 	3/16/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 127  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING COMMUNITY INVESTMENT BOARDS AND 
NEIGHBORHOOD ASSISTANCE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the chief executive officers (CEO) of certain large 
municipalities to establish neighborhood community investment 
boards to identify funding priorities for municipal revenue sharing 
grants. The CEOs must establish a board for each neighborhood in the 
municipality and appoint the board members, who may include 
residents, business owners, and civic leaders. The bill authorizes these 
municipalities to spend part of their municipal revenue sharing grants 
on the identified priorities. 
By January 1, 2024, the bill requires the Office of Policy and 
Management (OPM), within available appropriations, to create and 
maintain a website that lets residents and organizations submit 
proposed solutions to problems in urban areas (§ 3). If the OPM 
secretary or his designee decides a proposal is viable, he must identify 
a municipality or neighborhood in which to implement the proposal as 
a pilot program, monitor its implementation, and assess its results. OPM 
must give a financial award, within available appropriations, to each 
resident or organization whose proposal becomes the basis of a pilot 
program that the secretary or his designee deems successful. 
The bill also establishes a task force to study (1) programs for which 
nonprofit providers use state funding and (2) state agency requirements 
for nonprofit providers and compliance with those requirements. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2022, except the OPM website and task 
force provisions are effective July 1, 2022. 
 §§ 1-2 — COMMUNITY INVESTMENT BOARDS 
The bill’s requirement to establish community investment boards in  2022SB-00127-R000021-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 2 	3/16/22 
 
each neighborhood applies to any municipality with a population over 
60,000 according to the 2020 Census, but an area of no more than 30 
square miles (i.e., Bridgeport, Bristol, Hamden, Hartford, Meriden, New 
Britain, New Haven, Norwalk, Waterbury, and West Hartford). The 
municipality’s CEO must select the board members, who may include 
residents, business owners, religious leaders, community development 
corporation representatives, and community group representatives. If a 
neighborhood revitalization zone (NRZ) has been established in a 
neighborhood, the CEO must designate the associated NRZ committee 
to serve as the neighborhood’s community investment board (see 
BACKGROUND).   
The bill requires the community investment boards to identify 
priorities for spending municipal revenue sharing grants.  
Municipalities with community investment boards may choose to 
spend these grants so that: 
1. 35% is spent on priorities identified by the community 
investment boards, 
2. 35% is spent on priorities identified by the municipality’s 
legislative body, and 
3. 30% is spent on priorities jointly agreed upon by the boards and 
legislative body. 
§ 4 — TASK FORCE ON STATE -FUNDED NONPROFIT P ROVIDERS  
Under the bill, the task force consists of 12 members, two each 
appointed by the six legislative leaders. Their appointments may be 
legislators and must be made by July 31, 2022. The appointing authority 
fills any vacancy. 
The bill requires the Senate president pro tempore and House 
speaker to select the task force's chairpersons from among its members. 
The chairpersons must schedule and hold the first meeting by August 
30, 2022. The Planning and Development Committee's administrative 
staff must serve as the task force's staff.  2022SB-00127-R000021-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 3 	3/16/22 
 
The task force must report its findings and recommendations to the 
Planning and Development Committee by January 1, 2023. The task 
force terminates on that date or when it submits its report, whichever is 
later. 
BACKGROUND 
Municipal Revenue Sharing Grants 
By law, municipal revenue sharing grants are funded through the 
municipal revenue sharing account by a sales tax revenue diversion.  
The statutory formula for calculating the grant amounts is based on each 
municipality's real and personal property mill rate (other than its motor 
vehicle mill rate). Grant amounts are reduced for municipalities whose 
spending exceeds a specified municipal spending cap. 
NRZs 
The state's NRZ program helps neighborhood residents and 
businesses develop and implement plans to revitalize economically- 
and socially-distressed neighborhoods. NRZs are municipally 
designated.   
NRZ committees are established after a municipality adopts the NRZ 
planning committee's strategic plan in order to implement it (CGS § 7-
602). NRZ committees must reflect the neighborhood’s composition and 
include tenants and property owners, community organizations, and 
representatives of neighborhood businesses or businesses that own 
property in the neighborhood. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Planning and Development Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 19 Nay 7 (03/04/2022)