Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00135 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/16/2022

                     
Researcher: GM 	Page 1 	3/16/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 135  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ACCREDITATION STANDARDS FOR LAW 
ENFORCEMENT UNITS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes several changes to the minimum standards and 
practices for administering and managing law enforcement units (see 
BACKGROUND) , including eliminating a requirement that units obtain 
and maintain accreditation from the Commission on Accreditation for 
Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. (CALEA) by 2025. Instead, by 2026, 
units must either (1) be certified as meeting the requirements for three 
state-accreditation tiers developed by the Police Officer Standards and 
Training Council (POST) or (2) meet a higher level of accreditation 
standards developed by CALEA.  
The bill also requires that the minimum standards and practices 
include compliance with specific POST guidance on reporting 
procedures for police officer certificate suspension, cancellation, or 
revocation (i.e., POST General Notice 20-09). Under the bill, if a law 
enforcement unit fails to comply with the guidance, then POST may 
revoke the unit’s certificate of compliance with the appropriate state-
accreditation tier or tiers. 
Lastly, the bill makes several conforming changes, including to the 
law on POST’s authority and a prohibition on civil actions against a law 
enforcement unit for damages from failing to obtain and maintain the 
required certification or accreditation. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage  
ADJUSTED MINIMUM STANDARDS AND PRACTICES 
Until December 31, 2024, current law requires POST and the 
Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection (DESPP) to 
jointly develop, adopt, and revise, as necessary, minimum standards  2022SB-00135-R000022-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 2 	3/16/22 
 
and practices for administering and managing law enforcement units, 
based in part on CALEA standards. Additionally, law enforcement units 
must: 
1. from January 1, 2019, until December 31, 2024, adopt and 
maintain (a) POST-DESPP’s minimum standards and practices or 
(b) a higher level of accreditation standards developed by POST 
or CALEA; and  
2. starting in 2025, obtain and maintain CALEA accreditation.  
The bill eliminates the sunset date on POST-DESPP developing, 
adopting, and revising their minimum standards and practices and 
requires POST to, within available appropriations, divide the current 
minimum standards and practices into three state-accreditation tiers by 
January 1, 2023, thereby codifying POST’s existing three-tiered 
accreditation structure. Across a prescribed period of more than three 
years, the bill requires units to (1) be certified as meeting the acceptable 
standards for each tier or (2) meet higher accreditation standards 
developed by CALEA that are otherwise acceptable for each tier. 
Table 1 below describes the minimum standards and practices of each 
state-accreditation tier and the dates by which units must have 
certification. 
Table 1: Minimum Standards & Practices Tiers Schedule 
 	Tier I Tier II Tier III 
Minimum 
Standards & 
Practices 
Description 
Minimum standards 
and practices 
designed to protect 
law enforcement 
units from liability, 
enhance service 
delivery, and 
improve public 
confidence in units 
Minimum standards 
and practices for unit 
administration, 
management, and 
operation 
Higher minimum 
standards and 
practices for unit 
administration, 
management, and 
operation 
Required 
Certification 
Dates 
By January 1, 2023, 
and until December 
31, 2023 
By January 1, 2024, 
and until December 
31, 2025 
By January 1, 2026, 
and after 
  2022SB-00135-R000022-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 3 	3/16/22 
 
The bill makes conforming changes to extend to each tier the current 
requirements for POST to (1) publish and distribute the standards and 
practices, (2) jointly review and certify unit compliance with DESPP, 
and (3) work with units to obtain the required certification or 
accreditation if they fail to do so. 
BACKGROUND 
Current Minimum Standards and Practices 
The current version of the DESPP-POST minimum standards and 
practices is published within POST General Notice 20-04. By law, they 
must include standards and practices regarding: 
1. bias-based policing, 
2. use of force, 
3. response to family violence crimes, 
4. body camera use, 
5. police misconduct complaints, 
6. electronic defense weapons use, 
7. eyewitness identification procedures, 
8. notifications of death and related events, and 
9. police pursuits. 
Law Enforcement Units 
By law, a “law enforcement unit” is any state or municipal agency or 
department (or tribal agency or department created and governed 
under a memorandum of agreement) whose primary functions include 
enforcing criminal or traffic laws; preserving public order; protecting 
life and property; or preventing, detecting, or investigating crime (CGS 
§ 7-294a). 
COMMITTEE ACTION  2022SB-00135-R000022-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 4 	3/16/22 
 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 23 Nay 1 (03/03/2022)