Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00215 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/11/2022

                     
Researcher: HP 	Page 1 	4/11/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 215  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ENGINEERING AND MAINTAINER 
POSITIONS AT THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Administrative Services (DAS) 
commissioner and the Department of Transportation (DOT) 
commissioner to take certain actions related to recruiting engineers, 
engineer interns, and maintainers.  
The bill requires the DAS commissioner, in consultation with the 
DOT commissioner, to recruit interns, as needed, for the state’s engineer 
intern job classification for selection and appointment to DOT. Both 
commissioners must promote recruitment at public and independent 
institutions of higher education. Starting July 1, 2023, the bill also 
requires the DAS commissioner to annually increase the pay rate for this 
job classification by any percent increase in the national consumer price 
index for urban wage earners and clerical workers for the previous 12-
month period.  
From July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2025, the bill requires the DAS 
commissioner to place entry-level engineering and maintainer positions 
and level two maintainer positions on continuous recruitment. It also 
requires that DOT either make an employment offer or reject a 
candidate within 60 days after receiving a candidate’s application for 
these positions.  
Lastly, the bill appropriates $100,000 to DAS from the General Fund 
in FY 23 for recruiting entry-level engineers for DOT.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2022 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Transportation Committee  2022SB-00215-R000398-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: HP 	Page 2 	4/11/22 
 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 35 Nay 0 (03/24/2022)