Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00333 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/11/2022

                     
Researcher: JP 	Page 1 	4/11/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 333  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING RECOMMENDATIONS BY THE 
DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes numerous unrelated changes in motor vehicle laws. 
Among other things, the bill:  
1. increases surety bond requirements for dealer and repairer 
licenses and requires applicants to be fingerprinted (§§ 2 & 3); 
2. strengthens licensing and enforcement requirements related to 
driving schools and their instructors (§§ 4-7); 
3. gives the DMV commissioner discretion in staffing and 
coordinating weigh station coverage and hours of operation (§ 9); 
4. eliminates a redundant safety inspection requirement for retired 
school buses (§ 10); and 
5. requires that off-site road skills testing at licensed driving schools 
be available to all the school’s students who are otherwise eligible 
(§ 12). 
The bill also makes changes related to license restoration after 
medical withdrawal, snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles under the 
administrative per se law, and weigh stations.  
Lastly, the bill makes numerous technical and conforming changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2021, unless otherwise noted below. 
§ 1 — LICENSE RESTORATION AFTER MEDICAL WITHD RAWAL  
Under current law, the DMV commissioner may allow a person 
whose license was medically withdrawn to drive on a limited basis (i.e.,  2022SB-00333-R000401-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JP 	Page 2 	4/11/22 
 
with a licensed driving instructor or testing agent) if she (1) determines, 
after a hearing, that the driver does not have a health problem affecting 
his or her ability to drive safely and (2) requires the driver to pass a road 
skills test for license reinstatement.  
The bill requires the commissioner to make her determination after 
consulting with the Motor Vehicle Operator’s License Medical Advisory 
Board, rather than through a hearing. It provides a person aggrieved by 
the commissioner’s denial of limited driving access under these conditions 
with an opportunity for an administrative hearing under the Uniform 
Administrative Procedure Act (UAPA). 
Under existing law, unchanged by the bill, a person whose driver’s 
license has been suspended, restricted, or revoked, or whose license 
application has been denied due to health problems, has the right to 
appeal under the UAPA (CGS § 14-46g). 
§§ 2 & 3 — DEALER & REPAIRER SURETY BONDS & 
BACKGROUND CHECKS 
Surety Bonds (§ 2) 
The bill increases the surety bond amounts for applicants of certain 
business licenses as follows:  
1. repairer’s licenses from $5,000 to $50,000; 
2. limited repairer’s licenses from $5,000 to $10,000;  
3. new or used car dealer’s licenses from $50,000 to $60,000; and  
4. leasing or rental licenses from $10,000 to $15,000.  
Background Checks (§ 3) 
Under current law, applicants for a dealer or repairer license must 
submit to state and national criminal history records checks based on 
the applicant’s name and date of birth. The bill instead requires that 
these background checks be based upon fingerprint data that the 
applicant must provide. 
§§ 4-7 — DRIVING INSTRUCTION   2022SB-00333-R000401-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JP 	Page 3 	4/11/22 
 
The bill makes several changes in the statutes governing driving 
schools. The bill specifically prohibits driving schools with expired 
licenses from conducting business until a license renewal is granted by 
the DMV commissioner. However, it also prohibits the commissioner 
from renewing a driving school license that has been expired for more 
than 60 days.   
Under current law, the commissioner generally may suspend or 
revoke a school’s license only after she has provided the licensee with 
notice and an opportunity for a hearing, in accordance with the UAPA. 
Under the bill, if she determines there is an imminent threat to public 
safety or welfare, the commissioner may suspend, revoke, or withdraw 
the license and then schedule a hearing, which must be within 20 days 
after the date he takes this action. 
The bill also allows the DMV commissioner to order restitution to 
aggrieved customers if a driving school violates any statute and 
regulation governing them, in addition to, or instead of, a civil penalty. 
Driving Instructor and Master Driving Instructor Licenses 
The bill increases, from four to five years, the driving history review 
period for instructor and master instructor licenses. It also specifies that 
applicants must provide a physical examination that has been 
performed within 90 days from the application date, rather than a recent 
exam as current law requires. The bill also prohibits the commissioner 
from renewing an instructor or master instructor’s license that has been 
expired for more than 60 days.   
The bill authorizes the DMV commissioner to summarily suspend an 
instructor’s or master instructor’s license if she determines that 
continued possession of the license poses an imminent threat to public 
safety or welfare. 
Minor and Technical Changes 
The bill specifies that boards of education, public, private, and 
parochial schools (which do not need to be licensed as driving schools) 
are not required to provide a surety bond to provide a driver’s  2022SB-00333-R000401-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JP 	Page 4 	4/11/22 
 
education course. 
It also adds references to master driving instructors to license 
requirements for driving instructors, which already apply under current 
law and regulations.  
§§ 8 & 11 — ADMINISTRATIVE PER SE STATUTES 
By law, motorists implicitly consent to be tested for drugs or alcohol 
and submit to the nontestimonial portion of a drug influence evaluation 
when they drive a vehicle. The law establishes administrative license 
suspension procedures, including a hearing, for drivers who refuse to 
submit to a test or evaluation or whose test results indicate an elevated 
blood alcohol content. 
The bill expands the types of “motor vehicles” covered by the 
administrative per se statute to include a snowmobile or all-terrain 
vehicle, consistent with the criminal laws governing driving under the 
influence. It also allows DMV to send, with the driver’s written consent, 
notice of an administrative hearing decision by personal delivery (e.g., 
e-mail) rather than by certified mail.  
§ 9 — WEIGH STATIONS’ OPERATION 
Under current law, the DMV commissioner must staff and coordinate 
the official weigh stations’ (Greenwich, Danbury, and Union) coverage 
and hours of operation as outlined in statute. She must also adjust the 
required work shifts daily to produce an unpredictable schedule. 
Under the bill, the commissioner may, in her discretion, staff and 
coordinate the stations’ coverage and hours of operation according to 
statute. It authorizes, rather than requires, her to adjust work shifts daily 
for unpredictability. 
§§ 12-13 — DMV ROAD TESTING 
Driving School Testing  
Beginning October 1, 2022, the bill requires DMV-administered off-
site road skills test appointments at a licensed driving school to be made 
available to all of the school’s students who are otherwise eligible to take  2022SB-00333-R000401-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JP 	Page 5 	4/11/22 
 
the test. Under current agency practice, these road test appointments are 
only available to students under age 22.  
By January 1, 2023, it requires DMV to develop and submit to the 
Transportation Committee a plan to increase road skills test availability, 
including the feasibility of partnering with other public entities or 
independent contractors.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage, except the provision on off-site 
test appointments is effective October 1, 2022. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Transportation Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 35 Nay 0 (03/24/2022)