Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00449 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/12/2022

                     
Researcher: JO 	Page 1 	4/12/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 449  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE RECRUITMENT AND RETENTION OF 
PHYSICIANS IN THE STATE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Office of Higher Education (OHE) to administer 
a physician student loan reimbursement grant program starting in FY 
23. OHE must do so in collaboration with the Department of Public 
Health (DPH) and within available appropriations. 
The program must be open to state-licensed physicians employed 
here who (1) graduated from an in-state medical school or (2) completed 
their residency at a DPH-licensed hospital. It must provide 
reimbursement grants of 20% of the physician’s federal and state 
student loan balance per year. 
Under the bill, physicians may apply to OHE for grants in the time 
and manner the executive director prescribes and must only be 
reimbursed for loan payments made while they are employed as a 
physician in the state. Any unspent funds appropriated for the program 
carry forward, rather than lapse, to the next fiscal year.  
The bill also requires the DPH commissioner, by January 1, 2023, to 
convene a working group to advise her on ways to enhance physician 
recruitment in the state. The group must report its findings to the 
commissioner and the Public Health Committee by January 1, 2024. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2022 
PHYSICIAN RECRUITMENT WORKING GROUP 
Under the bill, the physician recruitment working group must 
examine at least the following issues: 
1. recruiting, retaining, and compensating primary care,  2022SB-00449-R000434-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JO 	Page 2 	4/12/22 
 
psychiatric, and behavioral health care providers; 
2. the potential effectiveness of student loan forgiveness;  
3. barriers to recruiting and retaining physicians due to non-
compete clauses; 
4. access to health care providers and any effect of the health 
insurance landscape on limiting health care access;  
5. barriers to physicians participating in health care networks; and  
6. assistance for graduate medical education training. 
The group must include at least the following 14 members, as shown 
in Table 1 below.  
Table 1: Physician Recruitment Working Group Required Membership 
One representative each from an-state hospital association, in-state medical society, and a 
regional physician recruiter association 
Two state-licensed physicians:   
• one from a small group practice (i.e., less than eight full-time equivalent physicians) 
• one from a multisite group practice (i.e., a group with over 100 full-time equivalent 
physicians practicing across the state) 
One representative each from at least three different medical schools 
The human resources director of at least one in-state hospital 
A member of a patient advocacy group 
Four public members 
 
The bill requires the group to elect chairpersons from among its 
members. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 29 Nay 0 (03/25/2022)