Researcher: TA Page 1 4/12/23 OLR Bill Analysis sHB 6077 AN ACT ESTABLISHING A PROCESS FOR THE ADDITION OF DIVERSE STATUES TO THE STATE CAPITOL BUILDING, A PLAN FOR SIGNAGE AROUND SAID BUILDING AND A STATE HISTORICAL COMMISSION. SUMMARY This bill expands the State Capitol Preservation and Restoration Commission’s duties by requiring it to develop a process for identifying and commissioning additional statues to be added to the State Capitol building exterior to reflect the state’s diversity. It allows the Legislative Management Committee to use capital funds to implement this process. The bill also requires the commission, by February 1, 2024, to (1) develop a plan for installing exterior placards or other signs around the State Capitol Building’s exterior to give the public a written historical explanation of the various statues and other markers on the building exterior, and (2) submit the plan to the Legislative Management Committee. Additionally, the bill creates a 12-member State Historical Commission to examine and make recommendations to the legislative, executive, and judicial branches on questions of memorialization and commemoration related to Connecticut and U.S. history. The commission’s members must be scholars in history, law, literature, or philosophy and affiliated with an in-state higher education institution. EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2023, except the provision requiring a plan for exterior signage is effective upon passage. IDENTIFYING AND COMM ISSIONING ADDITIONAL STATUES Existing law requires the State Capitol Preservation and Restoration Commission to continually review and study the State Capitol building 2023HB-06077-R000527-BA.DOCX Researcher: TA Page 2 4/12/23 and grounds with a view to developing a master plan for preserving and restoring the Capitol consistent with the building’s original historical character. The bill requires the commission, as part of this master plan, to develop a process for identifying and commissioning additional statues to be added to the State Capitol building exterior to reflect the state’s diversity. It allows the commission to consult with state, federal, or private agencies in developing the process. The bill allows the Legislative Management Committee to undertake capital expenditure programs to implement this process. As under existing law, the committee may do so using capital funds and following (1) plans and specifications approved by the commission and (2) state bidding laws. STATE HISTORICAL COM MISSION Membership The bill establishes the commission as an independent body within the legislative branch for administrative purposes only. Under the bill, the commission consists of 12 members appointed as follows: (1) two each by the governor, House speaker, and Senate president pro tempore and (2) one each by the House and Senate minority leaders and the Government Administration and Elections (GAE) Committee chairpersons and ranking members. Commission members may be legislators. The bill requires that (1) initial appointments be made by September 1, 2023, and (2) the first meeting be held by September 15, 2023. Members serve three-year terms from the date of appointment and continue to serve until their successors are appointed. The appointing authority must fill any vacancy, and any vacancy occurring during a term must be filled for the rest of the unexpired term. The House speaker and Senate president pro tempore must select the chairperson, who must schedule the first meeting. A majority of the membership constitutes a quorum to transact business. 2023HB-06077-R000527-BA.DOCX Researcher: TA Page 3 4/12/23 The bill requires that commission members serve without compensation but allows them to be reimbursed for necessary expenses within available funds. It requires the GAE Committee’s administrative staff to serve as the commission’s administrative staff. Powers and Duties Under the bill, the commission has the following powers and duties: 1. issue reports and recommendations to all three branches of government on historical questions of memorialization and commemoration related to Connecticut and U.S. history, on its own initiative or upon request of an agency, department, board, or commission in any of the three branches; 2. obtain assistance and data from any executive, legislative, or judicial department, board, commission, or other state agency as necessary and available to carry out the commission’s purposes; 3. accept any gift, donation, or bequest to perform its duties; and 4. perform other acts as may be necessary and appropriate to carry out its duties. The bill requires the commission, starting by February 1, 2024, to report annually to the governor and GAE Committee. The report must include a summary of the commission’s activities during the previous year and any policy or legislative changes needed to implement its recommendations. COMMITTEE ACTION Government Administration and Elections Committee Joint Favorable Substitute Yea 14 Nay 5 (03/24/2023)