Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06077 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/18/2023

                     
Researcher: TA 	Page 1 	5/18/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6077 (as amended by House "A")* 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A PROCESS FOR THE ADDITION OF 
DIVERSE STATUES TO THE STATE CAPITOL BUILDING, A PLAN 
FOR SIGNAGE AROUND SAID BUILDING AND A STATE 
HISTORICAL COMMISSION.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill expands the State Capitol Preservation and Restoration 
Commission’s duties by requiring it to develop a process for identifying 
and commissioning additional statues to be added to the State Capitol 
building exterior to reflect the state’s diversity, character, and 
accomplishments. It allows the Legislative Management Committee to 
use capital funds to implement this process. 
The bill also requires the commission, by February 1, 2024, to (1) 
develop a plan for installing placards or other signs around the State 
Capitol Building’s exterior to give the public a written historical 
explanation of the various statues and other markers on the building 
exterior and (2) submit the plan to the Legislative Management 
Committee. 
Additionally, the bill creates a 12-member State Historical 
Commission to examine and make recommendations to the legislative, 
executive, and judicial branches on questions of memorialization and 
commemoration related to Connecticut and U.S. history. The 
commission’s members must be scholars in history, law, literature, or 
philosophy and affiliated with an in-state higher education institution. 
*House Amendment “A” (1) requires that the additional statues 
reflect the state’s character and accomplishments, in addition to its 
diversity as required in the original bill, and (2) redistributes the 
appointments to the State Historical Commission by giving the House 
and Senate majority leaders one appointment each while reducing the 
number of appointments by the House speaker and president pro  2023HB-06077-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: TA 	Page 2 	5/18/23 
 
tempore from two to one. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2023, except the provision requiring a plan 
for exterior signage is effective upon passage. 
IDENTIFYING AND COMM ISSIONING ADDITIONAL STATUES 
Existing law requires the State Capitol Preservation and Restoration 
Commission to continually review and study the State Capitol building 
and grounds with a view to developing a master plan for preserving 
and restoring the Capitol consistent with the building’s original 
historical character. 
The bill requires the commission, as part of this master plan, to 
develop a process for identifying and commissioning additional statues 
to be added to the State Capitol building exterior to reflect the state’s 
diversity, character, and accomplishments. It allows the commission to 
consult with state, federal, or private agencies in developing the process. 
The bill allows the Legislative Management Committee to undertake 
capital expenditure programs to implement this process. As under 
existing law, the committee may do so using capital funds and following 
(1) plans and specifications approved by the commission and (2) state 
bidding laws. 
STATE HISTORICAL COM MISSION 
Membership 
The bill establishes the commission as an independent body within 
the legislative branch for administrative purposes only. Under the bill, 
the commission consists of 12 members appointed as follows: (1) two by 
the governor and (2) one each by the six legislative leaders and the 
Government Administration and Elections (GAE) Committee 
chairpersons and ranking members. Commission members may be 
legislators. 
The bill requires that (1) initial appointments be made by September 
1, 2023, and (2) the first meeting be held by September 15, 2023. 
Members serve three-year terms from their date of appointment and 
continue to serve until their successors are appointed. The appointing 
authority must fill any vacancy, and any vacancy occurring during a  2023HB-06077-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: TA 	Page 3 	5/18/23 
 
term must be filled for the rest of the unexpired term. The House 
speaker and Senate president pro tempore must select the chairperson, 
who must schedule the first meeting. A majority of the membership 
constitutes a quorum to transact business. 
The bill requires that commission members serve without 
compensation but allows them to be reimbursed for necessary expenses 
within available funds. It requires the GAE Committee’s administrative 
staff to serve as the commission’s administrative staff. 
Powers and Duties 
Under the bill, the commission has the following powers and duties: 
1. issue reports and recommendations to all three branches of 
government on historical questions of memorialization and 
commemoration related to Connecticut and U.S. history, on its 
own initiative or upon request of an agency, department, board, 
or commission in any of the three branches; 
2. obtain assistance and data from any executive, legislative, or 
judicial department, board, commission, or other state agency as 
necessary and available to carry out the commission’s purposes; 
3. accept any gift, donation, or bequest to perform its duties; and 
4. perform other acts as may be necessary and appropriate to carry 
out its duties. 
The bill requires the commission, starting by February 1, 2024, to 
report annually to the governor and GAE Committee. The report must 
include a summary of the commission’s activities during the previous 
year and any policy or legislative changes needed to implement its 
recommendations. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Government Administration and Elections Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 14 Nay 5 (03/24/2023)