Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06563 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/18/2023

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	4/18/23 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6563  
 
AN ACT INCREASING THE AGE OF ELIGIBILITY FOR THE 
POSTSECONDARY EDUCATION FUNDING PROGRAM OFFERED 
BY THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES AND 
ESTABLISHING A PILOT PROGRAM TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL 
ASSISTANCE FOR THE POSTSECONDARY EDUCATION OF 
ADOPTED YOUTH.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill (1) increases the age of eligibility for the Department of 
Children and Families’ (DCF) postsecondary education funding 
program for youth who are committed to DCF and (2) requires the 
department to amend its rules and regulations to reflect these increases.   
Additionally, the bill requires DCF, by January 1, 2024, to establish a 
pilot program to provide financial assistance for the postsecondary 
education funding of any youth adopted in Connecticut through an out-
of-state foster care program. It appropriates $150,000 to DCF from the 
General Fund in FY 24 to administer the program. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2023 
DCF POSTSECONDARY ED UCATION FUNDING PROGRAM 
Under the bill, the “postsecondary education funding program” is 
DCF’s program that provides funding to youths who remain committed 
to DCF at age 18 and meet the requirements in the department’s policies 
and regulations (DCF policy 28-1).  
The bill increases, from 21 to 26, the age until which a youth can 
qualify for postsecondary education funding. It also increases, from 23 
to 28, the age until which a youth enrolled in a postsecondary education 
program (i.e., any program that leads to an academic degree or 
certification in a vocation or employment training) is eligible for funding 
to complete the postsecondary education program, so long as he or she  2023HB-06563-R010649-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 2 	4/18/23 
 
continues to meet DCF-established requirements. 
The bill also requires any youth eligible to receive postsecondary 
education funding under the program to complete, as a condition of 
receiving the funding, the Free Application for Federal Student Aid 
(FAFSA) and applications for any appropriate scholarships and grants, 
including those on the DCF scholarship application portal. 
The bill specifies that its provisions should not be construed to 
require DCF to continue to provide case management services for any 
youth over age 21 who begins to receive funding under the 
postsecondary education funding program. 
DCF POSTSECONDARY EDUCAT ION FUNDING PILOT PROGRAM  
Eligibility 
The bill requires DCF, by January 1, 2024, to establish a pilot program 
to provide financial assistance for the postsecondary education funding 
of any youth who meets the following requirements: 
1. is adopted by a Connecticut resident through another state’s 
foster care program on or after January 1, 2005; 
2. completes the FAFSA for each year they are enrolled in the DCF 
postsecondary education program; and 
3. meets and continues to meet the postsecondary education 
assistance program requirements set forth in current DCF policy, 
except the requirement that the youth must be adopted through 
the department’s foster care program (DCF policy 25-2). 
Under the bill, a youth who qualifies for this financial assistance may 
apply to the department in a form and manner the DCF commissioner 
chooses, and the commissioner must approve applications until the 
youth completes the postsecondary education program. The program’s 
benefits are available to eligible youth within available funds and on a 
first-come, first-served basis. 
 Financial Assistance  2023HB-06563-R010649-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 3 	4/18/23 
 
The bill requires the financial assistance to include the cost of tuition, 
fees, room and board, and books but to not exceed the maximum cost of 
attendance at a state university within the Connecticut State University 
System for an in-state, full-time residential student. The financial 
assistance may be paid to the postsecondary education program on a 
semester, trimester, or quarterly basis as required. 
Reporting 
By January 1, 2025, the bill requires DCF to submit a report to the 
Appropriations, Children’s, and Higher Education and Employment 
Advancement committees on the pilot program and include the (1) 
number of youths who received financial assistance, (2) amount of 
financial assistance, and (3) feasibility of making the pilot program 
permanent. 
BACKGROUND 
Legislative History 
The House referred the bill (File 85) to the Committee on Children, 
which reported a substitute (1) requiring that the youth in the 
postsecondary funding program remain committed to DCF at age 18, (2) 
adding the FAFSA requirement, and (3) adding the pilot program and 
its funding.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 18 Nay 4 (02/28/2023) 
 
Committee on Children 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 12 Nay 5 (04/04/2023)