Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06580 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/03/2023

                     
Researcher: GM 	Page 1 	4/3/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6580  
 
AN ACT REVISING CERTAIN CERTIFICATION REQUIREMENTS 
RELATED TO SMOKE AND CARBON MONOXIDE DETECTORS IN 
RESIDENTIAL BUILDINGS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes several changes to a smoke and carbon monoxide 
detector disclosure law. Under current law, before transferring title to a 
one- or two-family residence, the transferor (e.g., seller), with some 
exceptions, must either give the transferee (e.g., buyer) an affidavit 
certifying certain conditions or credit the transferee with $250 at the 
closing. The affidavit must certify that the residence has: 
1. smoke detection and warning equipment (i.e., smoke detectors) 
that satisfy specified conditions in the law (see BACKGROUND), 
the Fire Safety Code, the State Fire Prevention Code, and the State 
Building Code; and 
2. either (a) carbon monoxide detection and warning equipment 
(i.e., carbon monoxide detectors) that satisfy the law’s conditions 
(see BACKGROUND) or (b) does not pose a risk of carbon 
monoxide poisoning because it does not have a fuel-burning 
appliance, fireplace, or attached garage. 
The bill instead requires, at the time of the transaction’s closing, the 
transferor to present a compliance form, signed and dated by the 
transferor, rather than an affidavit. The transferor must make the same 
certifications as under current law, except the bill eliminates the 
requirement that the transferor certify that the smoke detectors satisfy 
the above fire and building codes. Under the bill, as is the case under 
current law with the affidavit, nothing in the compliance form may 
constitute a warranty beyond the transfer of title.  2023HB-06580-R000354-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 2 	4/3/23 
 
The bill also eliminates the $250 credit option. Instead, if the 
transferee notifies the transferor by certified mail, within 10 days after 
the closing date, that the residence lacks any of the required smoke or 
carbon monoxide detectors or that the detectors are inoperable, the bill 
requires the transferor, within 10 days after receiving the notice, to 
comply with the law as amended by the bill (see COMMENT). 
The bill also specifies that a violation of this law will not create a 
defect in title. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023  
BACKGROUND 
Smoke Detector Conditions 
By law, the residence’s smoke detectors must be: 
1. able to sense visible or invisible smoke particles, 
2. installed following the manufacturer’s instructions and in the 
immediate vicinity of each bedroom, and 
3. capable of giving an alarm suitable to warn occupants when 
activated. 
The law also requires: 
1. the smoke detectors to be powered by the household electrical 
service, but allows residences issued a new occupancy building 
permit before October 1, 1976, to have battery-operated detectors;  
2. for residences issued a new occupancy building permit on or 
after October 16, 1989, that their smoke detectors be 
interconnected so that the activation of one smoke detector alarm 
in the residence causes all the alarms for all its smoke detectors 
to activate; and  
3. for residences issued a new occupancy building permit on or 
after May 1, 1999, that smoke detectors be in all sleeping areas.  2023HB-06580-R000354-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 3 	4/3/23 
 
Carbon Monoxide Detector Conditions 
By law the carbon monoxide detectors must be able to (1) sense the 
amount of carbon monoxide present in parts per million and (2) give an 
alarm suitable to warn occupants when activated. The law also requires 
them to be installed according to the manufacturer’s instructions and 
allows them to be battery-operated. 
COMMENT 
Incomplete Information and Internal Conflict 
It is unclear how a transferor must “comply” with this law if the 
residence he or she transferred lacks the satisfactory smoke or carbon 
monoxide detectors or has detectors that are inoperable. The statute 
currently, and as amended by the bill, does not explicitly require 
transferors to correct or install satisfactory equipment before 
transferring a residence. Even if the provision were read to require the 
transferor to install new or repair old equipment, doing so would create 
a warranty that would conflict internally with the provision stating that 
nothing in the compliance form may constitute a warranty beyond the 
transfer of title. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 25 Nay 0 (03/16/2023)