Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06622 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/28/2023

                     
 
LCO 3946  \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2023HB-06622-R01-
HB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6622  
January Session, 2023 
LCO No. 3946 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC SAFETY AND 
SECURITY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PS)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CERTIFICATION OR ACCREDITATION 
REQUIREMENT DEADLINES FOR A LAW ENFORCEMENT UNIT THAT 
SERVES A MUNICIPALITY AND CONSISTS SOLELY OF 
CONSTABLES OR RESIDENT STATE TROOPERS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 7-294ee of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 2 
(a) The Police Officer Standards and Training Council, established 3 
under section 7-294b, and the Commissioner of Emergency Services 4 
and Public Protection or the commissioner's designee, shall jointly 5 
develop, adopt and revise, as necessary, minimum standards and 6 
practices for the administration, management and operation of law 7 
enforcement units, as defined in section 7-294a. Such minimum 8 
standards and practices shall be based upon standards established by 9 
the International Association of Chiefs of Police and the Commission 10 
on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., and shall 11 
include, but need not be limited to, standards and practices regarding 12 
bias-based policing, use of force, response to crimes of family violence, 13  Bill No. 6622 
 
 
LCO 3946  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2023HB-06622-
R01-HB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
use of body-worn recording equipment, complaints that allege 14 
misconduct by police officers, use of electronic defense weapons, 15 
eyewitness identification procedures, notifications in death and related 16 
events and pursuits by police officers and compliance with the 17 
guidance issued by the council pursuant to subdivision (1) of 18 
subsection (g) of section 7-294d regarding reporting procedures to be 19 
followed by chief law enforcement officers for certificate suspension, 20 
cancellation or revocation. Not later than January 1, 2023, the council 21 
shall, within available appropriations, divide the minimum standards 22 
and practices into three state-accreditation tiers, to be known as tier 23 
one, tier two and tier three. Tier one shall consist of minimum 24 
standards and practices designed to protect law enforcement units 25 
from liability, enhance the delivery of services and improve public 26 
confidence in law enforcement units. Tier two shall consist of 27 
minimum standards and practices for the administration, management 28 
and operation of law enforcement units. Tier three shall consist of 29 
higher minimum standards and practices for the administration, 30 
management and operation of law enforcement units. The council shall 31 
post the minimum standards and practices of each tier on the council's 32 
Internet web site and disseminate the minimum standards and 33 
practices of each tier to law enforcement units. The council and 34 
commissioner or the commissioner's designee shall jointly develop a 35 
process to review a law enforcement unit's compliance with the 36 
minimum standards and practices of each tier and issue a certificate of 37 
compliance with the minimum standards and practices of tier one, tier 38 
two or tier three, as the case may be, to a law enforcement unit that 39 
meets or exceeds the minimum standards and practices of such tier. 40 
(b) On and after January 1, 2019, and until December 31, 2022, each 41 
law enforcement unit shall adopt and maintain (1) the minimum 42 
standards and practices developed by the council pursuant to 43 
subsection (a) of this section, or (2) a higher level of accreditation 44 
standards developed by the council or the Commission on 45 
Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., except a law 46 
enforcement unit that serves a municipality and consists solely of 47  Bill No. 6622 
 
 
LCO 3946  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2023HB-06622-
R01-HB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
constables or resident state troopers shall adopt and maintain such 48 
standards and practices or accreditation on and after January 1, 2019, 49 
and until December 31, 2023. 50 
(c) On and after January 1, 2023, and until December 31, 2023, each 51 
law enforcement unit shall (1) be certified, at a minimum, as meeting 52 
the requirements for state-accreditation tier one developed by the 53 
council pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, or (2) meet a higher 54 
level of accreditation standards developed by the Commission on 55 
Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., except a law 56 
enforcement unit that serves a municipality and consists solely of 57 
constables or resident state troopers shall be so certified or meet such 58 
accreditation standards on and after January 1, 2024, and until 59 
December 31, 2024. 60 
(d) On and after January 1, 2024, and until December 31, 2025, each 61 
law enforcement unit shall (1) be certified, at a minimum, as meeting 62 
the requirements for state-accreditation tiers one and two developed 63 
by the council pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, or (2) meet a 64 
higher level of accreditation standards developed by the Commission 65 
on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., except a law 66 
enforcement unit that serves a municipality and consists solely of 67 
constables or resident state troopers shall be so certified or meet such 68 
accreditation standards on and after January 1, 2025, and until 69 
December 31, 2026. 70 
(e) On and after January 1, 2026, each law enforcement unit shall (1) 71 
be certified as meeting the requirements for state-accreditation tiers 72 
one, two and three developed by the council pursuant to subsection (a) 73 
of this section, or (2) meet a higher level of accreditation standards 74 
developed by the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement 75 
Agencies, Inc., except a law enforcement unit that serves a 76 
municipality and consists solely of constables or resident state troopers 77 
shall be so certified or meet such accreditation standards on and after 78 
January 1, 2027. 79  Bill No. 6622 
 
 
LCO 3946  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2023HB-06622-
R01-HB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
(f) If a law enforcement unit fails to obtain or maintain the 80 
appropriate certification for a state-accreditation tier or tiers or the 81 
higher level of accreditation standards developed by the Commission 82 
on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., as required by 83 
the provisions of subsections (b) to (e), inclusive, of this section, the 84 
council shall work with the law enforcement unit to obtain and 85 
maintain such certification or accreditation standards. 86 
(g) If a law enforcement unit fails to comply with the guidance 87 
issued by the council pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (g) of 88 
section 7-294d regarding reporting procedures to be followed by chief 89 
law enforcement officers for certificate suspension, cancellation or 90 
revocation, the council may revoke the certificate of compliance with 91 
the appropriate state-accreditation tier or tiers, as the case may be, 92 
issued pursuant to this section. 93 
(h) No civil action may be brought against a law enforcement unit 94 
for damages arising from the failure of the law enforcement unit to (1) 95 
adopt and maintain such minimum standards and practices or a higher 96 
level of accreditation standards pursuant to subsection (b) of this 97 
section, or (2) obtain and maintain the appropriate certificate of 98 
compliance with the appropriate state-accreditation tier or tiers or 99 
accreditation by the Commission on Accreditation for Law 100 
Enforcement Agencies, Inc., as required by subsections (c) to (e), 101 
inclusive, of this section. 102 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage 7-294ee 
 
PS Joint Favorable