Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06642 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 06/12/2023

                     
 
 
Substitute House Bill No. 6642 
 
Public Act No. 23-66 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING A TITLE IX COMPLIANCE TOOLKIT FOR 
SCHOOL DISTRICTS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2023) (a) The Commission on 
Women, Children, Seniors, Equity and Opportunity shall convene and 
lead a working group to identify or develop a Title IX compliance toolkit 
for use by local and regional boards of education, students and parents 
and guardians of students. For purposes of this section and sections 2 to 
4, inclusive, of this act, "Title IX" means the provisions of Title IX of the 
Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1972, 20 USC 1681 et seq., 
as amended from time to time. 
(b) The Title IX compliance toolkit shall include: 
(1) Training for school administrators, Title IX coordinators, school 
personnel, students and parents and guardians of students that includes 
(A) information regarding the prevention, identification and response 
to adult sexual misconduct in schools, as described in the United States 
Department of Education's "Training Guide for Administrators and 
Educators on Addressing Adult Sexual Misconduct in the School 
Setting", and (B) research and data regarding the prevalence of child 
sexual abuse, adult sexual misconduct and the unique risk to sexual  Substitute House Bill No. 6642 
 
Public Act No. 23-66 	2 of 5 
 
abuse for students with disabilities or who are lesbian, gay, bisexual, 
transgender, queer or another sexual orientation or gender identity; 
(2) A model antidiscrimination and abuse prevention policy and 
procedures that include but are not limited to, policies addressing the 
needs of students with disabilities or who are lesbian, gay, bisexual, 
transgender, queer or another sexual orientation or gender identity; 
(3) A summary of applicable state and federal statutory and 
regulatory requirements and how such requirements affect the rights of 
students, including students with disabilities or who are lesbian, gay, 
bisexual, transgender, queer or another sexual orientation or gender 
identity, to be free from discrimination, harassment and abuse; 
(4) Provisions relating to the process for reporting an incident of adult 
sexual misconduct, including documents accessible to parents and 
guardians of students, students, school personnel and administrators; 
(5) Requirements for investigating reports of adult sexual 
misconduct, including information regarding the need to offer safety 
planning and services to the complainant or victim; 
(6) An explanation of the Title IX complaint procedures, including, 
but not limited to, the various methods accessible to parents and 
guardians of students, students, school personnel and administrators of 
submitting complaints; 
(7) Information explaining the right of an individual to seek redress 
from the Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities and the 
United States Department of Health and Human Services' Office for 
Civil Rights that is accessible to parents and guardians of students, 
students, school personnel and administrators; 
(8) Procedures for publishing and disseminating information to 
parents and guardians of students, students, school personnel and  Substitute House Bill No. 6642 
 
Public Act No. 23-66 	3 of 5 
 
administrators from the Connecticut School Health Survey, 
administered pursuant to section 10-217h of the general statutes, and 
school climate assessment instruments, completed pursuant to section 
10-222d of the general statutes; 
(9) Information relating to personnel and resources at the state and 
federal level that are available to provide ongoing technical assistance 
and support to local and regional boards of education with regard to 
such boards' compliance with Title IX requirements; and 
(10) Information relating to resources that are available to provide 
support to students, educators and parents and guardians regarding 
prevention, identification and response to child sexual harassment, 
discrimination and abuse. 
(c) The working group shall consist of: (1) The executive director of 
the Commission on Women, Children, Seniors, Equity and 
Opportunity, or the executive director's designee, (2) the Commissioner 
of Education, or the commissioner's designee, (3) the Commissioner of 
Children and Families, or the commissioner's designee, (4) the 
Commissioner of Public Health, or the commissioner's designee, (5) the 
executive director of the Commission on Human Rights and 
Opportunities, or the executive director's designee, (6) the Child 
Advocate, or the Child Advocate's designee, (7) a representative from 
each of the following organizations, designated by each such 
organization: (A) The Connecticut Alliance to End Sexual Violence, (B) 
the Connecticut Children's Alliance, (C) Disability Rights of 
Connecticut, (D) the Connecticut Association of Public School 
Superintendents, and (E) the Connecticut Association of Boards of 
Education, and (8) any additional members who have expertise in 
human resources and Internet technology, designated by the executive 
director of the Commission on Women, Children, Seniors, Equity and 
Opportunity.  Substitute House Bill No. 6642 
 
Public Act No. 23-66 	4 of 5 
 
(d) Not later than July 1, 2024, the working group shall submit the 
Title IX compliance toolkit to the joint standing committee of the 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children, in 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. 
The working group shall terminate on the date that it submits such 
toolkit or July 1, 2024, whichever is later. 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2023) (a) Not later than October 1, 2024, 
the Department of Education shall distribute the Title IX compliance 
toolkit, identified or developed pursuant to section 1 of this act, to local 
and regional boards of education and provide technical assistance to 
such boards in the implementation of such toolkit. 
(b) The department shall post the Title IX compliance toolkit on the 
department's Internet web site. 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2023) For the school year commencing 
July 1, 2025, and each school year thereafter, each local and regional 
board of education shall implement the Title IX compliance toolkit, 
identified or developed pursuant to section 1 of this act, in such board's 
efforts to prevent, identify and respond to reports of child sexual abuse, 
harassment and discrimination. 
Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2023) (a) For the school year 
commencing July 1, 2026, and each school year thereafter, each local and 
regional board of education shall submit a Title IX compliance report to 
the Department of Education, in such form and manner as prescribed 
by the department. Such report shall include (1) the name and contact 
information of the individual, if any, designated by the board to serve 
as the Title IX coordinator for the school district, including the dates on 
which such individual has served as the Title IX coordinator, (2) the 
training, if any, offered or provided by the board to school personnel 
regarding the laws and implementation of Title IX, including the content 
and frequency of such training, (3) the Title IX policy and any  Substitute House Bill No. 6642 
 
Public Act No. 23-66 	5 of 5 
 
supplemental misconduct policy, if any, for the school district, including 
a description of where such policies are available to students, parents 
and guardians and school personnel, and (4) guidelines or resources, if 
any, used or provided by the board in the implementation to any 
student, parent or guardian who makes a complaint concerning a 
violation of Title IX. 
(b) The department shall annually review the Title IX compliance 
reports submitted pursuant to subsection (a) of this section and develop 
a report based on its findings of such review. The department shall make 
such report available on its Internet web site and submit such report to 
the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 
cognizance of matters relating to children, in accordance with the 
provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes.