Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06642 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/16/2023

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	3/16/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6642  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING A TITLE IX COMPLIANCE TOOLKIT FOR 
SCHOOL DISTRICTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the State Department of Education (SDE) to convene 
a working group to identify or develop a Title IX compliance toolkit for 
use by local and regional boards of education, students, and their 
parents and guardians. (Title IX of the Education Amendments of 
1972 prohibits sex-based discrimination in education programs and 
activities that receive federal financial assistance.) 
Under the bill, each local and regional board of education must 
annually (1) submit a report to SDE on their Title IX compliance 
beginning January 1, 2024, and (2) beginning with the 2024-2025 school 
year, implement the toolkit in their efforts to prevent, identify, and 
respond to reports of child sexual abuse, harassment, and 
discrimination. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2023 
ANNUAL REPORT ON TIT LE IX COMPLIANCE  
Under the bill, by January 1, 2024, each local and regional board of 
education must submit a Title IX compliance report to SDE as the 
department determines. The report must include the following: 
1. the name and contact information of any person the board 
designated to serve as the school district’s Title IX coordinator, 
including the dates they served; 
2. any training the board offered or provided to school personnel 
on Title IX laws and implementation, including its content and 
frequency;  2023HB-06642-R000089-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 2 	3/16/23 
 
3. the Title IX policy and any supplemental misconduct policy for 
the school district, including a description of where the policies 
are available to students, parents and guardians, and school 
personnel; and  
4. guidelines or resources, if any, the board used or provided in the 
implementation to any student, parent, or guardian who makes 
a complaint concerning a Title IX violation. 
The bill requires SDE to review the compliance reports by July 1, 
2024, and develop a report based on its findings. SDE must make the 
report available on its website and submit it to the Children’s 
Committee. 
TITLE IX COMPLIANCE TOOLKIT 
Contents 
The Title IX compliance toolkit must include training for school 
administrators, Title IX coordinators, school personnel, students, and 
their parents and guardians that includes: 
1. information on the prevention, identification, and response to 
adult sexual misconduct in schools, as described in the U.S. 
Department of Education’s “Training Guide for Administrators 
and Educators on Addressing Adult Sexual Misconduct in the 
School Setting”; and  
2. research and data on the prevalence of child sexual abuse, adult 
sexual misconduct, and the unique risk to sexual abuse for 
students with disabilities or who are lesbian, gay, bisexual, 
transgender, queer (LGBTQ), or another sexual orientation or 
identity. 
The toolkit must also include the following: 
1. a model antidiscrimination and abuse prevention policy and 
procedures that include policies addressing the needs of students 
who are disabled, LGBTQ, or another sexual orientation or 
gender identity;   2023HB-06642-R000089-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 3 	3/16/23 
 
2. a summary of applicable state and federal statutory and 
regulatory requirements and how they affect the rights of 
students, including students who are disabled, LGBTQ, or 
another sexual orientation or gender identity, to be free from 
discrimination, harassment, and abuse; 
3. the process for reporting an incident of adult sexual misconduct, 
including documents accessible to students, their parents and 
guardians, school personnel, and administrators; 
4. requirements for investigating reports of adult sexual 
misconduct, including information on the need to offer safety 
planning and services to the complainant or victim; 
5. an explanation of the Title IX complaint procedures, including 
the various methods accessible to students, their parents and 
guardians, school personnel and administrators for submitting 
complaints; 
6. information explaining a person’s right to seek redress from the 
Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities (CHRO) and 
the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services’ Office for 
Civil Rights that is accessible to students, their parents and 
guardians, school personnel, and administrators; 
7. procedures for publishing and spreading information to 
students, their parents and guardians, school personnel, and 
administrators from the Connecticut School Health Survey and 
school climate assessment instruments (see BACKGROUND); 
8. available personnel and resources at the state and federal level to 
give ongoing technical assistance and support to local and 
regional boards of education on their Title IX compliance; and 
9. available resources to support students, educators, and parents 
and guardians on preventing, identifying, and responding to 
child sexual harassment, discrimination, and abuse. 
Working Group Membership and Report  2023HB-06642-R000089-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 4 	3/16/23 
 
Under the bill, the working group’s members include th e 
commissioners of Children and Families, Education, and Public Health 
or their designees; the Child Advocate or her designee, and the CHRO 
executive director or his designee. It also includes representatives from 
the following organizations, designated by each: 
1. the Connecticut Alliance to End Sexual Violence, 
2. the Connecticut Children’s Alliance, 
3. Disability Rights of Connecticut, 
4. the Connecticut Association of Public School Superintendents, 
and 
5. the Connecticut Association of Boards of Education. 
The SDE commissioner may also designate more members who have 
expertise in human resources and internet technology. 
By July 1, 2024, the bill requires (1) SDE to distribute the toolkit to 
local and regional boards of education and give technical assistance to 
them in implementing it, and (2) the working group to submit a report 
on the toolkit to the Children’s Committee.  
The working group sunsets on the date they submit their report or 
July 1, 2024, whichever is later. SDE must also post the toolkit on its 
website.  
BACKGROUND 
Connecticut School Health Survey 
Existing law requires the Department of Public Health, when 
receiving funding from the federal Centers for Disease Control (CDC), 
to biennially conduct the Connecticut School Health Survey, an 
anonymous school-based survey of a representative sample of public 
high school students, based on the CDC’s Youth Risk Behavior Survey. 
As part of the survey process, parents and guardians are given 
advanced notice and the option to opt their student out from 
participating (CGS § 10-217h et seq.).  2023HB-06642-R000089-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 5 	3/16/23 
 
School Climate Assessment Instruments 
By law, schools must conduct school climate assessments, which 
include surveys to gauge the perspectives and opinions of students. The 
surveys must allow students to complete them anonymously. SDE must 
(1) use the information collected from the surveys as part of an annual 
analysis that includes the number of verified acts of bullying in the state, 
the school districts’ responses, and any other recommendations to 
improve school climate and (2) submit the analysis to legislative leaders 
and the Education and Children’s committees (CGS §§ 10-222h & 222-
k). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Committee on Children 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 19 Nay 0 (02/28/2023)