Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06642 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/10/2023

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	5/10/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6642 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING A TITLE IX COMPLIANCE TOOLKIT FOR 
SCHOOL DISTRICTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Commission on Women, Children, Seniors, 
Equity and Opportunity (CWCSEO) to convene and lead a working 
group to identify or develop a Title IX compliance toolkit for use by local 
and regional boards of education, students, and their parents and 
guardians. (Title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972 prohibits sex-
based discrimination in education programs and activities that receive 
federal financial assistance.) 
Under the bill, each local and regional board of education must 
annually (1) beginning with the 2025-2026 school year, implement the 
toolkit in their efforts to prevent, identify, and respond to reports of 
child sexual abuse, harassment, and discrimination, and (2) beginning 
with the 2026-2027 school year, submit a report to the State Department 
of Education (SDE) on their Title IX compliance. 
*House Amendment “A” (1) requires CWCSEO, rather than SDE, to 
convene a Title IX working group, requires the commission to lead the 
group, and adds the CWCSEO executive director to the group’s 
members; (2) delays, from January 1, 2024, to the school year beginning 
July 1, 2026, the reporting requirement for local and regional boards of 
education to report to SDE on their Title IX compliance and requires 
them to do so annually; (3) delays the implementation of the Title IX 
toolkit by one year; (4) delays, from July 1, 2024, to October 1, 2024, the 
date by which SDE is required to distribute the toolkit to local and 
regional boards of education; and (5) requires SDE to annually review 
submitted Title IX compliance reports, rather than once by July 1, 2024.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2023  2023HB-06642-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 2 	5/10/23 
 
ANNUAL REPORT ON TIT LE IX COMPLIANCE  
Under the bill, beginning with the 2026-2027 school year, each local 
and regional board of education must annually submit a Title IX 
compliance report to SDE as the department determines. The report 
must include the following: 
1. the name and contact information of any person the board 
designated to serve as the school district’s Title IX coordinator, 
including the dates they served; 
2. any training the board offered or provided to school personnel 
on Title IX laws and implementation, including its content and 
frequency; 
3. the Title IX policy and any supplemental misconduct policy for 
the school district, including a description of where the policies 
are available to students, parents and guardians, and school 
personnel; and  
4. guidelines or resources, if any, the board used or provided in the 
implementation to any student, parent, or guardian who makes 
a complaint concerning a Title IX violation. 
The bill requires SDE to annually review the compliance reports and 
develop a report based on its findings. SDE must make the report 
available on its website and submit it to the Children’s Committee. 
TITLE IX COMPLIANCE TOOLKIT 
Contents 
The Title IX compliance toolkit must include training for school 
administrators, Title IX coordinators, school personnel, students, and 
their parents and guardians that includes: 
1. information on the prevention, identification, and response to 
adult sexual misconduct in schools, as described in the U.S. 
Department of Education’s “Training Guide for Administrators 
and Educators on Addressing Adult Sexual Misconduct in the 
School Setting”; and   2023HB-06642-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 3 	5/10/23 
 
2. research and data on the prevalence of child sexual abuse, adult 
sexual misconduct, and the unique risk to sexual abuse for 
students with disabilities or who are lesbian, gay, bisexual, 
transgender, queer (LGBTQ), or another sexual orientation or 
identity. 
The toolkit must also include the following: 
1. a model antidiscrimination and abuse prevention policy and 
procedures that include policies addressing the needs of students 
who are disabled, LGBTQ, or another sexual orientation or 
gender identity;  
2. a summary of applicable state and federal statutory and 
regulatory requirements and how they affect the rights of 
students, including students who are disabled, LGBTQ, or 
another sexual orientation or gender identity, to be free from 
discrimination, harassment, and abuse; 
3. the process for reporting an incident of adult sexual misconduct, 
including documents accessible to students, their parents and 
guardians, school personnel, and administrators; 
4. requirements for investigating reports of adult sexual 
misconduct, including information on the need to offer safety 
planning and services to the complainant or victim; 
5. an explanation of the Title IX complaint procedures, including 
the various methods accessible to students, their parents and 
guardians, school personnel and administrators for submitting 
complaints; 
6. information explaining a person’s right to seek redress from the 
Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities (CHRO) and 
the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services’ Office for 
Civil Rights that is accessible to students, their parents and 
guardians, school personnel, and administrators; 
7. procedures for publishing and spreading information to  2023HB-06642-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 4 	5/10/23 
 
students, their parents and guardians, school personnel, and 
administrators from the Connecticut School Health Survey and 
school climate assessment instruments (see BACKGROUND); 
8. available personnel and resources at the state and federal level to 
give ongoing technical assistance and support to local and 
regional boards of education on their Title IX compliance; and 
9. available resources to support students, educators, and parents 
and guardians on preventing, identifying, and responding to 
child sexual harassment, discrimination, and abuse. 
Working Group Membership and Report 
Under the bill, the working group’s members include the CWCSEO 
and CHRO executive directors or their designees; the commissioners of 
Children and Families, Education, and Public Health or their designees; 
and the Child Advocate or her designee. It also includes representatives 
from the following organizations, designated by each: 
1. the Connecticut Alliance to End Sexual Violence, 
2. the Connecticut Children’s Alliance, 
3. Disability Rights of Connecticut, 
4. the Connecticut Association of Public School Superintendents, 
and 
5. the Connecticut Association of Boards of Education. 
The CWCSEO executive director may also designate more members 
who have expertise in human resources and internet technology. 
The working group must submit the toolkit to the Children’s 
Committee by July 1, 2024. The group sunsets on the date they submit 
their toolkit or July 1, 2024, whichever is later.   
By October 1, 2024, the bill requires SDE to distribute the toolkit to 
local and regional boards of education and give technical assistance to  2023HB-06642-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 5 	5/10/23 
 
them in implementing it. SDE must also post the toolkit on its website. 
BACKGROUND 
Connecticut School Health Survey 
Existing law requires the Department of Public Health, when 
receiving funding from the federal Centers for Disease Control (CDC), 
to biennially conduct the Connecticut School Health Survey, an 
anonymous school-based survey of a representative sample of public 
high school students, based on the CDC’s Youth Risk Behavior Survey. 
As part of the survey process, parents and guardians are given 
advanced notice and the option to opt their student out from 
participating (CGS § 10-217h et seq.). 
School Climate Assessment Instruments 
By law, schools must conduct school climate assessments, which 
include surveys to gauge the perspectives and opinions of students. The 
surveys must allow students to complete them anonymously. SDE must 
(1) use the information collected from the surveys as part of an annual 
analysis that includes the number of verified acts of bullying in the state, 
the school districts’ responses, and any other recommendations to 
improve school climate and (2) submit the analysis to legislative leaders 
and the Education and Children’s committees (CGS §§ 10-222h & 222-
k). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Committee on Children 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 19 Nay 0 (02/28/2023)