Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06686 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/04/2023

                     
Researcher: JM 	Page 1 	4/4/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6686  
 
AN ACT IMPLEMENTING THE RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE 
OFFICE OF EARLY CHILDHOOD.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill lowers the eligibility age of children for the Office of Early 
Childhood’s (OEC) School Readiness preschool program. Under current 
law, eligible children are those ages three or four, and children age five 
who are not eligible to enroll in school (by law a child must reach age 
five before January of the school year to attend school that year). The bill 
lowers entry age to birth (§ 1). It also modifies the current requirements 
for a school-eligible five-year-old to stay in a school readiness program 
(§ 3). 
By law, School Readiness is a nonreligious, state-funded program 
that (1) meets state standards, (2) provides at least 450 hours and 180 
days of developmentally appropriate learning per year, and (3) is open 
to age-eligible children.  
The bill also does the following:  
1. (a) removes a requirement that School Readiness and other child 
care program grants that exceed a per-child threshold be used for 
teacher salaries, and (b) changes the grant frequency from annual 
to biennial (§§ 2 & 4-5); 
2. removes the sunset date for the smart start competitive grant and 
changes the requirements for grant applications to receive 
priority consideration (§ 6); 
3. requires OEC to create a parent advisory cabinet (§ 7); 
4. changes the name of early childhood “councils” to  2023HB-06686-R000404-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 2 	4/4/23 
 
“collaboratives” (§ 8); 
5. requires OEC to disclose the complainant’s name and 
investigation records related to child care facility licensure 
complaints, upon request, to state and federal law enforcement 
(§§ 9 & 11); and  
6. requires OEC to develop best practices for when OEC can order 
a medical exam related to a license matter or complaint 
investigation (§ 12). 
It also makes technical and conforming changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2023 
§§ 2 & 5 — SCHOOL READINESS AND CHILD CARE GRANTS 
Excess Grant Award Flexibility 
Under current law, state-licensed school readiness programs that 
operate full-day, year-round programs and receive school readiness 
per-pupil state grants must use any grant amount exceeding $8,927 per 
child exclusively to increase the salary of individuals directly 
responsible for teaching or caring for children in school readiness 
program classrooms.   
Current law also has a similar excess-funds salary provision for state-
contracted child care facilities that was set to begin with FY 24. This 
applies to child care facilities’ contracts with the state for a grant for (1) 
an amount at least equal to the per-child cost set in state law for each 
child ages three to five, and not yet eligible to enroll in school, and (2) a 
$13,500 per-child grant for children ages three and younger who are in 
toddler or infant care and not in a preschool program. The amount per 
child that is over the amount of the per-child cost stated in the FY 23 
contract must be used exclusively to increase salaries of early childhood 
educators employed at these child care facilities. 
The bill repeals both of these excess-funds salary provisions. 
Biennial Grant Award  2023HB-06686-R000404-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 3 	4/4/23 
 
The bill also changes school readiness grants for priority school 
districts from an annual to a biennial award beginning in FY 23. As 
under current law, awards depend on available funding and a 
satisfactory annual evaluation. 
§ 3 — SCHOOL READINESS AND FIVE-YEAR-OLDS 
Current law allows a five-year-old to stay in a school readiness 
program if the child has been in the program for at least one year and 
the parent or guardian, the school board of the district where the child 
would be attending school, and the school readiness provider agree the 
child is not ready for kindergarten. The bill additionally requires that 
the parent or guardian sign a written authorization stating that the child 
will not attend kindergarten until the following year, and file it with the 
school district. The bill also replaces “not ready for kindergarten” with 
“would benefit from another year in the program,” presumably 
expanding eligibility. 
§ 6 — SMART START COMPETIT IVE GRANT PROGRAM 
The bill removes the FY 24 sunset date (i.e., June 30, 2014) for the 
smart start competitive grant to provide funds for capital and operating 
expenses for school districts to expand or establish preschool programs. 
The bill makes the program permanent with no end date. 
Under current law, the OEC commissioner must prioritize school 
boards (1) that demonstrate the greatest need to establish or expand a 
preschool program and (2) whose plan allocates (a) at least 60% of the 
spaces in the preschool program to children who are members of 
families at or below 75% of the state median income or (b) 50% of the 
spaces to children who are eligible for free and reduced price lunches 
(FRPL). The bill eliminates the option for the commissioner to give 
priority to boards that reserve spaces for FRPL-eligible children. 
§ 7 — PARENT ADVISORY CABI NET 
The bill expands OEC’s statutory duties to include establishing a 
parent advisory cabinet. The cabinet must advise OEC on ways to: 
1. strengthen partnership and communication with families,   2023HB-06686-R000404-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 4 	4/4/23 
 
2. bring awareness to gaps and barriers to services,  
3. increase access to services for families, and  
4. help improve the lives of young children and families in the state. 
§ 8 — EARLY CHILDHOOD COUN CILS 
The bill changes the name of early childhood “councils” to 
“collaboratives.” Under current law, these councils are local or regional. 
The bill eliminates references to regional councils, which in practice do 
not exist. OEC collaborates with the councils to implement early care 
and education and child development programs at the local level. 
§§ 9-11 — LICENSURE VIOLATION COMPLAINTS  
The bill requires OEC to share the complainant’s identity and certain 
records related to complaints about licensure violations with state and 
federal law enforcement officers, including a military law enforcement 
authority under the U.S. Department of Defense, upon a written request. 
It applies to licensing complaints against child care centers, group child 
care homes, family child care homes, and youth camps. 
Under current law, the name of the person making the report or 
complaint cannot be disclosed unless (1) the person consents or (2) a 
judicial or administrative proceeding or a license action results from the 
complaint. Also under current law, records OEC obtains in connection 
with an investigation are exempt from Freedom of Information Act 
disclosure (1) for 30 days after the date of the petition or other event 
causing the investigation; (2) until the investigation is terminated; or (3) 
a hearing is convened, whichever is earlier. The bill requires the records, 
whether obtained or generated by OEC, to be disclosed without 
redaction.    
§ 12 — BEST PRACTICES FOR O EC-ORDERED MEDICAL E XAMS 
The bill requires OEC, in consultation with the Department of Public 
Health, to develop best practices for a physician, physician’s assistant 
(PA), or advanced practice registered nurse (APRN) ordering a medical 
examination during an investigation over:  2023HB-06686-R000404-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 5 	4/4/23 
 
1. an application, reinstatement, or renewal of a license for a child 
care center, group child care home, or family child care home; 
2. a complaint about child care services, which includes child care 
centers, group child care homes, and family child care homes; or  
3. child care from an unlicensed provider. 
The best practices must at least include: 
1. who would be subject to an OEC-ordered medical examination;  
2. how the examination’s nature and scope would be determined;  
3. how the physician, PA, or APRN would be chosen to conduct the 
examination; and  
4. the possible consequences and enforcement mechanisms for any 
failure to submit to an examination. 
The bill requires OEC to submit a report on the best practices, 
including any legislative recommendations, to the Education 
Committee by February 1, 2024. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Education Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 41 Nay 0 (03/17/2023)