Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06698 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/23/2023

                     
Researcher: JSB 	Page 1 	3/23/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6698  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING DRUG POLICY, SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND 
PEER SUPPORT SERVICES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Mental Health and Addiction 
Services (DMHAS) commissioner to replace current law’s peer 
navigator pilot program for people with opioid use disorder with a 
statewide program. It opens the program to any community that opts to 
participate and requires the commissioner to use any available funds in 
the Opioid Settlement Fund (see BACKGROUND ) to pay for 
administering it.   
The bill also establishes an Office of the Chief Drug Policy Officer, 
overseen by the chief drug policy (CDP) officer. Under the bill, the office 
serves as the central point of contact for the statewide peer navigator 
program and a centralized location for collecting and analyzing 
information on services provided to people with substance use 
disorders and their families. The bill places the office within the Office 
of Governmental Accountability (OGA) and makes technical and 
conforming changes (see BACKGROUND).   
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2023 
STATEWIDE PEER NAVIG ATOR PROGRAM 
Current law requires the DMHAS commissioner to establish a pilot 
program in up to five urban, suburban, and rural communities to serve 
people with opioid use disorder. Among other things, each 
participating community must form a team of two peer navigators. 
The bill instead requires the commissioner, by January 1, 2024, to 
replace the pilot program with a statewide peer navigator program in 
all communities that choose to participate. In doing so, she must use  2023HB-06698-R000187-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 2 	3/23/23 
 
available funds from the Opioid Settlement Fund and consult with the 
CDP officer.  
As under current law, each participating community must form a 
team of at least two peer navigators who must, among other things, (1) 
travel throughout the community to address the health care and social 
needs of people with opioid use disorder and (2) complete regularly 
updated training on non-coercive and non-stigmatizing methods for 
engaging them. Under the bill, the DMHAS commissioner consults with 
the CDP officer to determine the training. 
As under existing law, a “peer navigator” is a person with experience 
working with people with substance use disorder who (1) provides 
nonmedical mental health care and substance use services and (2) has a 
collaborative relationship with health care professionals authorized to 
prescribe medications to treat opioid use disorder.   
Annual Report 
The bill requires the DMHAS commissioner and CDP officer to 
submit a report annually beginning by January 1, 2025, to the General 
Law and Public Health committees on the success of the statewide 
program serving people with opioid use disorder. 
CHIEF DRUG POLICY OFFICER 
The bill establishes an Office of the Chief Drug Policy Officer within 
OGA and overseen by the CDP officer. This officer is appointed by the 
governor subject to the legislature’s approval, serves a four-year term or 
until the next successor is appointed and has qualified, and may be 
reappointed.   
The bill requires that this officer be knowledgeable about substance 
use disorders and the services provided to people with substance use 
disorders and their families. The officer must act independently of other 
state agencies in doing his or her duties, regardless of conflicting laws.  
Duties 
Within available appropriations, the officer must: 
1. appoint and direct necessary staff to fulfill the office’s mission;   2023HB-06698-R000187-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 3 	3/23/23 
 
2. ensure that the office serves as (a) the central point of contact for 
the state-wide peer navigator program (see above) and (b) a 
centralized location for collecting information concerning 
services provided to people with substance use disorders and 
their families;  
3. advise the public concerning the office’s purpose, contact 
information, and services; 
4. evaluate the services that state agencies and other entities 
provide to people with substance use disorders and their families 
and how they are provided, as well as receive and investigate 
complaints as deemed prudent about their actions; 
5. encourage coordination between state agencies in providing 
services to people and families in order to prevent and eliminate 
duplicated efforts and save the state money;  
6. recommend changes to state policies on substance use disorders, 
including changes in systems used to provide services to people 
and families; and 
7. conduct public education programs, undertake legislative 
advocacy, and make proposals for systemic reform concerning 
substance use disorders and services provided to people and 
families.  
Annual Report  
The bill requires the CDP officer to submit a report annually by 
January 31 to the governor and General Law, Public Health, and 
Judiciary committees detailing and analyzing his or her work during the 
preceding calendar year.  
BACKGROUND 
Related Bills 
SB 1163, reported favorably by the Public Safety Committee, 
authorizes the Opioid Settlement Fund’s monies to be used to equip 
police officers with opioid antagonists.    2023HB-06698-R000187-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 4 	3/23/23 
 
sHB 6696, reported favorably by the General Law Committee, (1) 
requires Connecticut-licensed pharmacists, when dispensing an opioid 
drug, to provide patients a free personal opioid drug deactivation and 
disposal product and (2) authorizes pharmacists to seek reimbursement 
from the Opioid Settlement Fund for these costs.  
sHB 6718, reported favorably by the Children’s Committee, 
appropriates $400,000 from the Opioid Settlement Fund in FY 24 for 
costs of distributing pharmacy warning stickers and labels for opioid 
drugs. 
Office of Governmental Accountability 
By law, OGA consists of independent divisions for which it provides 
consolidated personnel, payroll, affirmative action, and administrative 
and business office functions, including information technology 
associated with these functions. (In practice, the Department of 
Administrative Services performs these functions for OGA.) These 
divisions have independent decision-making authority, including the 
ability to make decisions on budgetary issues and employing necessary 
staff.  
Opioid Settlement Fund (CGS § 17a-674b et seq.) 
PA 22-48 established the Opioid Settlement Fund as a separate non-
lapsing fund administered by a 37-member Opioid Settlement Advisory 
Committee with assistance from DMHAS. The fund must contain 
moneys the state receives from opioid-related judgements, consent 
decrees, and settlements and can only be used following their 
provisions, as confirmed by the attorney general and after the Opioid 
Settlement Advisory Committee’s and the Office of Policy and 
Management secretary’s approval.   
COMMITTEE ACTION 
General Law Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 22 Nay 0 (03/07/2023)