Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06757 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/13/2023

                     
Researcher: MGS 	Page 1 	4/13/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6757  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TEACHER PERFORMANCE EVALUATIONS.  
 
SUMMARY 
By law, each public school district’s superintendent must annually 
evaluate each teacher or have each teacher be evaluated. The evaluation 
process must follow the teacher evaluation and support program 
adopted by the district’s board of education and be aligned with the 
State Board of Education’s (SBE) guidelines and model program. The 
district must develop its program through mutual agreement between 
the school board and the district’s professional development and 
evaluation committee. 
This bill makes various changes in the teacher evaluation laws, 
requiring local and regional boards of education to adopt revised 
teacher evaluation programs and SBE to adopt revised program 
guidelines that use new (1) student indicators and assessment methods 
and (2) teacher feedback mechanisms. 
The bill also removes obsolete language, including references to a 
now obsolete teacher evaluation and support pilot program and a 
UConn study of the pilot program. It also makes technical and 
conforming changes.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2023, except the provisions on revised 
evaluation and support plans and models adopted by boards of 
education and SBE (§ 1) take effect on July 1, 2024. 
TEACHER EVALUATION A ND SUPPORT PROGRAM 
SBE Program 
The bill requires SBE to adopt, by July 1, 2025, revised guidelines for 
a teacher evaluation and support program, in consultation with the  2023HB-06757-R000585-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MGS 	Page 2 	4/13/23 
 
Performance Evaluation Advisory Council (PEAC; see below). It also 
requires SBE to adopt a revised model teacher evaluation and support 
program that aligns with these guidelines. The bill makes the following 
changes to revise the guidelines that current law required SBE to adopt 
for its model program in 2012: 
1. removes the requirement that the guidelines include four 
performance evaluation designators for teachers (i.e., exemplary, 
proficient, developing, and below standard); 
2. requires the guidelines to use student learning, growth, and 
achievement, rather than student academic growth and 
development, as indicators in teacher evaluations; 
3. requires the guidelines to include methods for assessing student 
learning, growth, and achievement rather than student academic 
growth and development; 
4. requires the guidelines to remove references to teacher “ratings”; 
5. requires the guidelines to use an evaluator-provided annual 
summary of teacher growth, rather than a scoring system with 
performance evaluation designators, for the minimum 
requirements for teacher evaluation instruments and procedures; 
6. requires the guidelines to address creating individual 
improvement and remediation plans for teachers who need 
additional support, rather than for teachers who have a rating of 
“developing” or “below standard”; 
7. removes the requirement that these individual improvement and 
remediation plans include a summative rating of proficient or 
better as indicators of success at the plan’s conclusion; and 
8. requires the guidelines to include a validation procedure for the 
State Department of Education (SDE) or a third party to audit all 
remediation plans, not just those plans with a rating of 
“exemplary” or “below standard.”  2023HB-06757-R000585-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MGS 	Page 3 	4/13/23 
 
District Program 
The bill requires each local and regional board of education, by 
September 1, 2024, to adopt and implement a revised teacher evaluation 
and support program that follows SBE’s revised guidelines. 
The bill allows the education commissioner to waive the requirement 
that a board adopt a program consistent with SBE’s model revised 
program for any board that has expressed an intent to adopt a program 
by July 1, 2024, that requires a waiver from these requirements. 
Additionally, beginning with the 2023-24 school year, each board of 
education must incorporate the revised elements of their evaluation and 
support program into the following training programs it must offer 
under current law: (1) training programs and orientation (conducted at 
least annually, rather than biennially, under the bill) for all evaluators 
and teachers it employs; (2) training programs for all new evaluators 
before they conduct any evaluations; and (3) orientation for all new 
teachers hired by the board before they receive an evaluation. 
OTHER EVALUATION PRO CESS CHANGES 
The bill also makes the following changes to the state’s teacher 
evaluation process: 
1. requires teachers who do not receive a summative evaluation 
during the school year to be recorded as “not evaluated” rather 
than “not rated” as current law requires and 
2. removes the requirement that superintendents report aggregate 
evaluation ratings to the education commissioner by September 
15 each year. 
PEAC 
Under existing law, PEAC is a council within SDE, led by the 
education commissioner with members from various education interest 
groups. The bill maintains PEAC’s tasks under current law to assist SBE 
with (1) developing guidelines for a teacher evaluation and support 
program and (2) the data collection and evaluation support system; 
however, it removes the requirement that PEAC assist SBE with  2023HB-06757-R000585-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MGS 	Page 4 	4/13/23 
 
developing a (1) model teacher evaluation and support program and (2) 
teacher evaluation and support program implementation plan.  
TEACHER PREPARATION PROGRAMS 
By law, teacher preparation programs leading to certification must 
require students to participate in a clinical, field, or student teaching 
experience over four semesters. The bill removes the requirement that 
any cooperating teacher who is part of this experience must have earned 
a performance evaluation designation of “exemplary” or “proficient” in 
the prior school year to serve as a mentor to student teachers.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Education Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 44 Nay 0 (03/24/2023)