Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06779 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/12/2023

                     
Researcher: SM 	Page 1 	5/12/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6779 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A TASK FORCE TO STUDY A HOUSING 
OPPORTUNITIES TAX CREDIT.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill establishes three separate task forces on (1) a housing 
opportunities tax credit, (2) homelessness, and (3) rental savings 
accounts. It requires the task forces to undertake studies that include 
certain components and specifies membership for each.  
The bill requires the legislative leaders to (1) make their initial 
appointments to the task forces no later than 30 days after the bill’s 
passage and (2) fill any vacancies. The House speaker and Senate 
president pro tempore jointly select the task forces’ chairpersons. The 
chairpersons must schedule the task forces’ first meeting and hold it 
within 60 days after the bill’s passage.  
The bill also requires each task force to report on its findings and 
recommendations to the Housing Committee by January 1, 2024. 
However, the homelessness task force must continue to report to the 
committee annually on January 1 until 2029; this task force terminates 
on January 1, 2029. The task forces on a housing opportunities tax credit 
and rental savings accounts terminate on January 1, 2024, or the date 
they submit their reports, whichever is later. 
Under the bill, the Housing Committee’s administrative staff serve as 
the administrative staff of each task force. 
*House Amendment “A” (1) reduces, from two to one, the 
appointments of the House speaker and Senate president pro tempore 
to the tax credit task force and (2) adds the provisions establishing the 
homelessness and rental savings accounts task forces.   2023HB-06779-R010776-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 2 	5/12/23 
 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage  
§ 1 — HOUSING OPPORT UNITIES TAX CREDIT TASK FORCE 
The bill establishes a nine-member task force to study the feasibility 
and potential benefits of a housing opportunities tax credit (1) provided 
to landlords who offer housing to formerly incarcerated people and (2) 
that would be (a) equal to 25% of the rental income landlords receive 
from these tenants and (b) applied against any state income taxes the 
landlords owe. The study must consider best practices for implementing 
the tax credit program and the credit’s potential:  
1. impact on housing availability for formerly incarcerated people,  
2. financial benefits for qualifying landlords,  
3. impact on recidivism rates and financial benefits to the state from 
a reduction in these rates, and  
4. administrative costs associated with implementation.  
Membership  
Under the bill, the task force consists of the housing, revenue services, 
and correction commissioners, or their designees, and six members 
whom the legislative leaders appoint. The legislative appointees may be 
General Assembly members and some must have certain qualifications, 
as shown in the table below. 
Table: Housing Opportunities Tax Credit Task Force — Legislative Appointees 
Appointing Authority 	Required Qualifications 
House speaker A formerly incarcerated person    
Senate president pro tempore Representative of a nonprofit housing services provider  
House majority leader None  
Senate majority leader None  
House minority leader A landlord   
Senate minority leader Representative of a nonprofit providing services to formerly 
incarcerated people  
 
§ 2 — HOMELESSNESS TASK FO RCE  
The bill establishes a seven-member task force to study homelessness  2023HB-06779-R010776-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 3 	5/12/23 
 
and policies to prevent it in the state and requires that the study 
examine, at a minimum, the following components:  
1. strategies to prevent and reduce homelessness;  
2. coordinating services and providing services and support for 
individuals and families experiencing homelessness (e.g., health 
care, education, and employment training);  
3. providing emergency shelter and long-term housing solutions 
for these individuals and families; and  
4. the availability and accessibility of affordable housing in 
Connecticut.  
Membership 
Under the bill, the task force consists of the Department of Housing 
(DOH) commissioner, or her designee, and six members whom the 
legislative leaders appoint. The legislative appointees may be General 
Assembly members and must have certain qualifications, as shown in 
the table below. 
Table: Homelessness Task Force — Legislative Appointees 
Appointing Authority 	Required Qualifications 
House speaker Experience in homelessness policies and programs  
Senate president pro tempore Expertise in fair housing protections  
House majority leader Represents a homeless service provider  
Senate majority leader Represents a low-income housing advocacy organization   
House minority leader Represents a landlord association  
Senate minority leader Represents a faith-based organization that provides 
services to households experiencing homelessness 
 
§ 3 — RENTAL SAVINGS ACCO UNTS TASK FORCE 
The bill establishes an eight-member task force to study the feasibility 
of, and methods for, implementing rental savings accounts in the state. 
It requires that the study include the design and operation of tax-
advantaged rental savings accounts for tenants to use for rental 
expenses and the potential impact of these accounts on (1) the banking 
industry, (2) tenants and landlords, (3) employers and the state  2023HB-06779-R010776-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 4 	5/12/23 
 
economy, and (4) state revenue.  
Membership  
Under the bill, the task force consists of the DOH commissioner and 
Connecticut Housing Finance Authority chief executive officer, or their 
designees, and six members whom the legislative leaders appoint. The 
legislative appointees may be General Assembly members and 
generally must have certain qualifications, as shown in the table below. 
Table: Rental Savings Accounts Task Force — Legislative Appointees 
Appointing Authority 	Required Qualifications 
House speaker Representative of the banking industry   
Senate president pro tempore Representative of a housing advocacy group  
House majority leader Representative of tenants  
Senate majority leader None  
House minority leader Representative of landlords  
Senate minority leader Representative of employers  
 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Housing Committee 
Joint Favorable Change of Reference - FIN 
Yea 15 Nay 0 (03/02/2023) 
 
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 51 Nay 0 (04/18/2023)