Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06838 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/03/2023

                     
Researcher: GM 	Page 1 	4/3/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6838  
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A DIVISION OF FIRE SERVICES 
ADMINISTRATION WITHIN THE DEPARTMENT OF EMERGENCY 
SERVICES AND PUBLIC PROTECTION, REVISING THE POWERS 
AND DUTIES OF THE COMMISSION ON FIRE PREVENTION AND 
CONTROL AND REQUIRING A STUDY OF THE FIRE SERVICE IN 
THE STATE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill eliminates the Office of State Fire Administration and creates 
a Division of Fire Services Administration within the Department of 
Emergency Services and Public Protection (DESPP) as a successor 
agency. It requires the DESPP commissioner to appoint a deputy 
commissioner to lead the division, transfers the State Fire 
Administrator’s current duties to the deputy commissioner, and 
expands these duties. 
The bill also appropriates $250,000 for DESPP to contract for a study 
of the issues facing the state’s fire service and develop a strategic master 
plan to address them. 
Additionally, the bill makes changes to the Commission on Fire 
Prevention and Control’s powers and duties, such as requiring it to 
distribute funding for fire school operations. 
The bill also makes conforming and technical changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023, except the DESPP fire service 
study and related appropriation are effective July 1, 2023.  
§§ 1 & 3-9 — DIVISION OF FIRE SERVICES ADMINISTRATION 
Under the bill, the DESPP commissioner must serve as the Division 
of Fire Services Administration’s administrative head, but delegate his 
jurisdiction of the division to a deputy commissioner. The deputy  2023HB-06838-R000367-BA.docx 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 2 	4/3/23 
 
commissioner must have professional training and knowledge with at 
least five years of managerial or strategic planning experience relating 
to the fire services. 
The bill requires that the functions, powers, duties, and personnel of 
the Office of State Fire Administrator be transferred to the division. 
Additionally, any order or regulation of the office that is in force on the 
effective date of the bill must continue in force and effect as an order or 
regulation of the division until it is amended, repealed, or superseded. 
The bill makes conforming changes to carry out this transfer, including 
requiring the division, rather than the Office of State Fire 
Administration, to administer the state’s responsibilities under federal 
laws relevant to fire services and to develop a master plan for fire 
prevention and control.  
The bill also transfers the State Fire Administrator’s current duties to 
the deputy commissioner. Whereas current law requires the State Fire 
Administrator to coordinate the training and education of fire service 
personnel at state institutions, facilities, and properties, the bill instead 
requires the deputy commissioner to do the following: 
1. advise and assist the Commission on Fire Prevention and Control 
on legislative proposals; 
2. encourage the expansion and improvement of existing local 
firefighter training facilities in cooperation with the commission; 
3. administer the state fire school and certification examinations, 
testing procedures, and reciprocity recognition for credentials in 
the fire service disciplines; and 
4. make recommendations to the commission on the operational 
funding of the state fire school and regional fire schools. 
The bill also requires the deputy commissioner to prepare, 
recommend, and give reports on revisions, consolidations, or 
compilations of statutes relating to firefighter training and fire 
prevention and control. (The bill does not specify to whom these  2023HB-06838-R000367-BA.docx 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 3 	4/3/23 
 
recommendations and reports must be sent.) 
§§ 2 & 3 — COMMISSION ON FIRE PREVENTION AND CONTRO L 
Under current law, the Commission on Fire Prevention and Control 
may set standards for a fire service training and education program on 
a voluntary basis. The bill eliminates this discretion and requires it to do 
so. 
The bill further requires the commission do the following: 
1. distribute any state, federal, or private funds or contributions for 
the daily operation of the state fire school and regional fire 
schools; 
2. coordinate activities with the Division of State Fire Services 
Administration’s deputy commissioner; 
3. annually submit proposals for legislation to promote firefighter 
training to the DESPP commissioner and give testimony to the 
General Assembly; and 
4. add recommendations on the funding needed for operating, 
maintaining, and making capital improvements to the state fire 
school and regional fire schools as part of the existing annual 
reporting it must submit to the governor, legislature, and DESPP 
commissioner. 
The bill requires the commission to submit this annual report to the 
Public Safety and Security Committee, rather than the Joint Committee 
on Legislative Management as current law requires. 
The bill eliminates the commission’s authority to appoint clerical and 
other assistants it deems necessary to carry out functions it devised for 
the Office of State Fire Administration. 
§§ 10 & 11 — FIRE SERVICE ISSUES STUDY 
The bill requires the DESPP commissioner to choose, by October 1, 
2023, a contractor to study issues facing the state’s fire service, develop 
a strategic master plan to address them, and prepare the state for the  2023HB-06838-R000367-BA.docx 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 4 	4/3/23 
 
future. By January 1, 2025, the commissioner must report the study’s 
results to the governor and the Public Safety and Security Committee. 
The bill appropriates $250,000 to DESPP from the General Fund for 
FY 24 to fund the study. 
BACKGROUND 
Related Bill 
sHB 6841, § 3, favorably reported by the Public Safety and Security 
Committee, among other things, expands the State Fire Administrator’s 
duties to include developing facilities across the state where people can 
train for and take the firefighter physical ability test. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 25 Nay 0 (03/16/2023)