Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06839 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/28/2023

                       
 
LCO No. 5011  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6839  
January Session, 2023 
LCO No. 5011 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC SAFETY AND SECURITY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PS)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TEMPORARY STATE PERMITS TO CARRY A 
PISTOL OR REVOLVER ISSUED BY TRIBAL POLICE DEPARTMENTS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (b) of section 29-28 of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 
2023): 3 
(b) Upon the application of any person having a bona fide permanent 4 
residence within the jurisdiction of any such authority, such chief of 5 
police or, where there is no chief of police, such chief executive officer 6 
or designated resident state trooper or state police officer, as applicable, 7 
may issue a temporary state permit to such person to carry a pistol or 8 
revolver within the state, provided such authority shall find that such 9 
applicant intends to make no use of any pistol or revolver which such 10 
applicant may be permitted to carry under such permit other than a 11 
lawful use and that such person is a suitable person to receive such 12 
permit. If the applicant has a bona fide permanent residence within the 13 
jurisdiction of any federally recognized Native American tribe within 14 
the borders of the state, and such tribe has a law enforcement unit, as 15  Raised Bill No.  6839 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5011   	2 of 4 
 
defined in section 7-294a, that accepts applications for temporary state 16 
permits, the chief of police of such law enforcement unit may issue a 17 
temporary state permit to such person pursuant to the provisions of this 18 
subsection, and [any] no chief of police of any other law enforcement 19 
unit, [having jurisdiction over an area containing such person's bona 20 
fide permanent residence shall not] and no other chief executive officer 21 
or designated resident state trooper or state police officer, having 22 
jurisdiction over such area shall issue such temporary state permit [if 23 
such tribal law enforcement unit accepts applications for temporary 24 
state permits] to such person. No state or temporary state permit to carry 25 
a pistol or revolver shall be issued under this subsection if the applicant 26 
(1) has failed to successfully complete a course approved by the 27 
Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection in the 28 
safety and use of pistols and revolvers including, but not limited to, a 29 
safety or training course in the use of pistols and revolvers available to 30 
the public offered by a law enforcement agency, a private or public 31 
educational institution or a firearms training school, utilizing instructors 32 
certified by the National Rifle Association or the Department of Energy 33 
and Environmental Protection and a safety or training course in the use 34 
of pistols or revolvers conducted by an instructor certified by the state 35 
or the National Rifle Association, (2) has been convicted of (A) a felony, 36 
or (B) a misdemeanor violation of section 21a-279 on or after October 1, 37 
2015, or (C) a misdemeanor violation of section 53a-58, 53a-61, 53a-61a, 38 
53a-62, 53a-63, 53a-96, 53a-175, 53a-176, 53a-178 or 53a-181d during the 39 
preceding twenty years, (3) has been convicted as delinquent for the 40 
commission of a serious juvenile offense, as defined in section 46b-120, 41 
(4) has been discharged from custody within the preceding twenty years 42 
after having been found not guilty of a crime by reason of mental disease 43 
or defect pursuant to section 53a-13, (5) (A) has been confined in a 44 
hospital for persons with psychiatric disabilities, as defined in section 45 
17a-495, within the preceding sixty months by order of a probate court, 46 
or (B) has been voluntarily admitted on or after October 1, 2013, to a 47 
hospital for persons with psychiatric disabilities, as defined in section 48 
17a-495, within the preceding six months for care and treatment of a 49 
psychiatric disability and not solely for being an alcohol-dependent 50  Raised Bill No.  6839 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5011   	3 of 4 
 
person or a drug-dependent person, as those terms are defined in 51 
section 17a-680, (6) is subject to a restraining or protective order issued 52 
by a court in a case involving the use, attempted use or threatened use 53 
of physical force against another person, including an ex parte order 54 
issued pursuant to section 46b-15 or 46b-16a, (7) is subject to a firearms 55 
seizure order issued prior to June 1, 2022, pursuant to section 29-38c 56 
after notice and hearing, or a risk protection order or risk protection 57 
investigation order issued on or after June 1, 2022, pursuant to section 58 
29-38c, (8) is prohibited from shipping, transporting, possessing or 59 
receiving a firearm pursuant to 18 USC 922(g)(4), (9) is an alien illegally 60 
or unlawfully in the United States, or (10) is less than twenty-one years 61 
of age. Nothing in this section shall require any person who holds a 62 
valid permit to carry a pistol or revolver on October 1, 1994, to 63 
participate in any additional training in the safety and use of pistols and 64 
revolvers. No person may apply for a temporary state permit to carry a 65 
pistol or revolver more than once within any twelve-month period, and 66 
no temporary state permit to carry a pistol or revolver shall be issued to 67 
any person who has applied for such permit more than once within the 68 
preceding twelve months. Any person who applies for a temporary state 69 
permit to carry a pistol or revolver shall indicate in writing on the 70 
application, under penalty of false statement in such manner as the 71 
issuing authority prescribes, that such person has not applied for a 72 
temporary state permit to carry a pistol or revolver within the past 73 
twelve months. Upon issuance of a temporary state permit to carry a 74 
pistol or revolver to the applicant, the local authority shall forward the 75 
original application to the commissioner. Not later than sixty days after 76 
receiving a temporary state permit, an applicant shall appear at a 77 
location designated by the commissioner to receive the state permit. The 78 
commissioner may then issue, to any holder of any temporary state 79 
permit, a state permit to carry a pistol or revolver within the state. Upon 80 
issuance of the state permit, the commissioner shall make available to 81 
the permit holder a copy of the law regarding the permit holder's 82 
responsibility to report the loss or theft of a firearm and the penalties 83 
associated with the failure to comply with such law. Upon issuance of 84 
the state permit, the commissioner shall forward a record of such permit 85  Raised Bill No.  6839 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5011   	4 of 4 
 
to the local authority issuing the temporary state permit. The 86 
commissioner shall retain records of all applications, whether approved 87 
or denied. The copy of the state permit delivered to the permittee shall 88 
be laminated and shall contain a full-face photograph of such permittee. 89 
A person holding a state permit issued pursuant to this subsection shall 90 
notify the issuing authority within two business days of any change of 91 
such person's address. The notification shall include the old address and 92 
the new address of such person. 93 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2023 29-28(b) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To clarify a provision related to the ability of tribal police departments 
to issue temporary state permits to carry a pistol or revolver. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]