Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06840 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/03/2023

                     
Researcher: GM 	Page 1 	4/3/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6840  
 
AN ACT EXPANDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE POLICE OFFICER 
STANDARDS AND TRAINING COUNCIL, REQUIRING GUIDELINES 
REGARDING BODY -WORN RECORDING EQUIPMENT AND 
REQUIRING A REPORT REGARDING CONDUCT THAT 
UNDERMINES PUBLIC CONFIDENCE IN LAW ENFORCEMENT.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill adds an exception to state law’s general requirement that 
police officers use body-worn recording equipment (i.e., body cameras) 
while interacting with the public. Specifically, it creates an exception for 
exigent circumstances based on guidelines that the Department of 
Emergency Services and Public Protection (DESPP) commissioner and 
the Police Officer Standards and Training Council (POST) must jointly 
adopt under the bill.  
The bill also increases POST’s membership from 21 members to 23 by 
adding two members who must be sworn police officers who are not in 
command positions within their law enforcement units. Lastly, it 
requires DESPP and POST to submit a report to the Public Safety and 
Security Committee on police officer conduct that undermines public 
confidence in law enforcement. By law, POST may cancel or revoke an 
officer’s certification if he or she engages in this conduct. 
The bill also makes technical changes, including repealing obsolete 
language. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2023, except that the POST membership 
changes are effective January 1, 2024, and the reporting requirement is 
effective upon passage. 
BODY CAMERA EXCEPTIO N 
The law generally requires all sworn members of law enforcement  2023HB-06840-R000369-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 2 	4/3/23 
 
units and members of those units who perform police duties to use body 
cameras when they interact with the public in their law enforcement 
capacities. Existing law provides exceptions for circumstances identified 
in (1) state statute (e.g., encounters with undercover officers or 
informants) and (2) a municipal police department’s policy based on 
POST guidelines (see BACKGROUND).  
The bill adds a new exception. Specifically, by October 1, 2023, it 
requires the DESPP commissioner and POST to jointly adopt guidelines 
on the exigent circumstances under which a police officer may interact 
with the public without using a body camera. (The bill gives examples 
of an officer responding to an incident while off duty or when a body 
camera is unavailable.) Under the bill, the council and commissioner (1) 
may update and reissue the guidelines as necessary and (2) must submit 
the guidelines and any updates to the Judiciary and Public Safety and 
Security committees. Officers subject to the body camera use 
requirement must follow these guidelines. 
By law, a “law enforcement unit” is any state or municipal agency or 
department (or tribal agency or department created and governed 
under a memorandum of agreement) whose primary functions include 
enforcing criminal or traffic laws; preserving public order; protecting 
life and property; or preventing, detecting, or investigating crime (CGS 
§ 7-294a(8)).  
POST MEMBERSHIP 
Beginning January 1, 2024, the bill increases POST’s membership 
from 21 members to 23 by adding two new members, one appointed by 
each chairperson of the Public Safety and Security Committee. The 
appointees must be sworn police officers who are not in command 
positions within their law enforcement units. Under current law, the 
council consists of 21 members: 11 appointed by the governor, six 
legislative appointments, and four serving ex-officio (the DESPP 
commissioner and FBI special agent-in-charge for Connecticut, or their 
designees, and the chief state’s attorney and Connecticut State Police 
Academy’s commanding officer).  2023HB-06840-R000369-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 3 	4/3/23 
 
As under existing law, appointed members serve at the pleasure of 
their appointing authority for a term coterminous with their appointing 
authority (CGS § 4-1a). The law additionally deems a member to have 
resigned from POST if he or she misses three consecutive meetings or 
50% of the meetings held during any calendar year. 
REPORT ON CONDUCT UN DERMINING PUBLIC CON FIDENCE IN 
LAW ENFORCEMENT 
The bill requires DESPP and POST to report to the Public Safety and 
Security Committee by January 1, 2024, on the following: 
1. (a) whether POST has cancelled or revoked a police officer’s 
certification for conduct that undermines public confidence in 
law enforcement and (b) an explanation of the circumstances 
related to each cancellation or revocation; 
2. whether POST has considered but declined to cancel or revoke a 
police officer’s certification for this conduct and the 
circumstances related to these instances; 
3. whether existing law on this subject, including POST guidance 
(i.e., POST General Notice 20-09, see below), provides sufficient 
guidance to police officers and law enforcement units on the 
types of conduct that undermine public confidence in law 
enforcement, and the disciplinary actions that should be taken in 
response to different types of this conduct; and 
4. any recommendations for revising the existing law or POST’s 
guidelines on this subject. 
Under existing law, POST may cancel or revoke a police officer’s 
certification if, among other things, the officer is found by a law 
enforcement unit to have engaged in conduct that undermines public 
confidence in law enforcement. Examples of this conduct include 
discriminatory conduct, falsifying reports, issuing unlawful orders, 
failing to report or timely report a death, and violating the Alvin W. 
Penn Racial Profiling Prohibition Act (CGS § 7-294d(c)(2)(I)).  2023HB-06840-R000369-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 4 	4/3/23 
 
BACKGROUND 
Statutory Prohibition on Intentional Recordings 
The law prohibits police officers from using body cameras to 
intentionally record the following occurrences or situations, unless an 
agreement between the officer’s agency and the federal government 
provides otherwise: 
1. communications with State Police, municipal police department, 
or public university or college special police force personnel 
unless recorded within the performance of the officers’ duties; 
2. encounters with undercover officers or informants, or an officer 
performing detective work; 
3. officers on break or engaged in personal activities; 
4. people undergoing medical or psychological evaluations, 
procedures, or treatments; 
5. people, other than criminal suspects, in a hospital or medical 
facility; or 
6. people in a mental health facility, unless responding to a call 
involving a criminal suspect in the facility. 
DESPP-POST Use Guidelines 
The DESPP commissioner and POST must jointly issue guidelines on 
using body cameras, retaining their data, and storing the data safely and 
securely. The guidelines were most recently updated in 2022 and, 
among other things, establish beginning and end of shift procedures and 
directions on when officers may or must deactivate their cameras. They 
incorporate the above intentional recording prohibitions and also 
prohibit recording the following: 
1. private conversations to which the officer is not a party;  
2. telephonic conversations unless specifically authorized by law 
while in the performance of their official duties;  2023HB-06840-R000369-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 5 	4/3/23 
 
3. strip searches; and  
4. while in a locker room, changing room or restroom, unless 
confronting a violent or assaultive suspect or in an incident 
involving the anticipated use of force. 
The guidelines also allow deactivation of body cameras if officers 
determine that, based on the circumstances, an investigation could be 
significantly hampered if the recording were to continue. However, they 
direct officers, whenever possible, to (1) record on the camera the reason 
for interrupting or ending the recording before deactivating the camera 
and (2) document the event in the officer’s report. Additionally, they 
require officers to reactivate their cameras as soon as practical (POST 
General Notice 22-05). 
Related Bill 
sSB 1222, reported favorably by the Government Administration and 
Elections Committee, (1) sets additional requirements for redacting and 
disclosing body and dashboard camera recordings and (2) establishes a 
fee schedule for redacting the recordings. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 23 Nay 2 (03/16/2023)