Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06871 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/18/2023

                     
Researcher: MHF 	Page 1 	5/18/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6871 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ELECTION RECANVASS PROCEDURES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill modifies several procedures for election recanvasses (i.e., 
recounts). Specifically, the bill requires that recanvass officials meet by 
5:00 p.m. on recanvass day (no time is currently set in law). It also 
authorizes party representatives to view each ballot to discern its 
markings as it is being recanvassed (§ 3).  
However, if disorder interferes with the recanvass, the bill also 
authorizes moderators to remove offending individuals who do not 
submit to the moderator’s lawful authority. The bill specifies disorderly 
behaviors includes improperly attempting to take part in a recanvass or 
communicating with recanvass officials. The removal may be (1) 
temporary, if the individual becomes orderly, or (2) if needed, until the 
recanvass is completed (§ 3). 
Additionally, the bill requires SOTS to develop an instructional 
training video on recanvass procedures based on its most recently 
published Recanvass Procedure Manual. Under the bill, SOTS must 
distribute it to recanvass officials when a recanvass is required, and the 
officials must view the video immediately before starting a recanvass (§ 
2). 
By law, SOTS must approve the number of voting tabulators 
provided for elections by each town’s board of selectmen, city’s 
common council, or borough’s warden and burgesses. The bill 
eliminates a provision giving registrars of voters the discretion to 
determine the number of voting tabulators that will be available at a 
special election but requiring at least one for the municipality or one for 
each voting district. Instead, for all elections, registrars must ensure each  2023HB-06871-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MHF 	Page 2 	5/18/23 
 
voting district uses at least one dedicated voting tabulator that only 
registers and counts votes for that district. These provisions do not 
apply to tabulators at central counting locations or those used in 
recanvassing (§ 1). 
The bill also makes technical changes. 
*House Amendment “A” (1) changes the effective date for provisions 
about voting tabulators from upon passage to July 1, 2025; (2) changes 
the effective date for provisions about instructional training videos for 
recanvass procedures from upon passage to July 1, 2024; (3) modifies the 
underlying bill’s requirement for dedicated tabulators for voting 
districts; (4) requires that the instructional video be viewed immediately 
before conducting a recanvass; (5) modifies the provision changing the 
deadline for completing a recanvass; (6) authorizes the moderator to 
remove individuals causing disorder during a recanvass; and (7) makes 
technical and conforming changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage, except that the provisions about 
voting tabulators take effect on July 1, 2025, and provisions on the 
instructional training video take effect on July 1, 2024. 
BACKGROUND 
Recanvass Procedures 
After a primary or election, a recanvass of the vote generally takes 
place when there is a discrepancy, close vote, or tie. The recanvass 
procedures differ depending on the circumstances under which the 
recanvass was triggered. A recanvass must be open to the public and 
convene no later than five business days after the applicable primary or 
election.  
Generally, when a recanvass is triggered, the town clerk and 
registrars of voters must impound the relevant election materials and 
tools. The recanvass officials must then meet and recount the votes to 
determine if the original canvass was correct or if a discrepancy remains. 
If the recanvass reveals the original canvass was incorrect, then the 
recanvass return is substituted for the original return and has the same  2023HB-06871-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MHF 	Page 3 	5/18/23 
 
force and effect as an original return (CGS §§ 9-311 through 9-311b & 
Conn. Agencies Regs., § 9-242a-28). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Government Administration and Elections Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 19 Nay 0 (03/15/2023) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 53 Nay 0 (05/01/2023)