Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06873 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/18/2023

                     
Researcher: DC 	Page 1 	4/18/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6873  
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE POLICE OFFICER STANDARDS AND 
TRAINING COUNCIL TO DEVELOP AND PROMULGATE A MODEL 
POLICY REQUIRING THE USE OF A SEAT SAFETY BELT FOR ANY 
PERSON WHO IS BEING TRANSPORTED IN A MUNICIPAL POLICE 
VEHICLE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Police Officer Standards and Training Council 
(POST), by December 31, 2023, to develop and promulgate a model 
policy that provides guidelines on required seat belt use in municipal 
police vehicles and standardized procedures for municipal police 
officers to ensure that anyone being transported in their vehicles is 
secured by a seat belt. 
Under the bill, starting January 1, 2024, if a municipal law 
enforcement unit’s chief law enforcement officer finds, through existing 
POST-developed procedures, that a municipal police officer’s actions 
constitute a violation of the policy the bill establishes and the violation 
undermines public confidence in the municipal law enforcement unit, 
the chief law enforcement officer must report the violation to POST, 
which must then do a de novo review (a new, independent review) of 
the matter.  
Whenever POST believes there is a reasonable basis for suspending, 
canceling, or revoking a municipal officer’s certification because of the 
reported violation, the council must give the officer notice and an 
adequate opportunity for a hearing before he or she is disciplined. The 
hearing must be done following the Uniform Administrative Procedure 
Act. If POST finds by clear and convincing evidence that a violation of 
the bill has occurred, it may suspend, revoke, or cancel the officer’s 
certificate.  2023HB-06873-R000652-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 2 	4/18/23 
 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2023 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Judiciary Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 37 Nay 0 (03/31/2023)