Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06900 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/25/2023

                    Analyst: ME  	Page 1 	5/24/23 
 
 
 
 
OFA Bill Analysis 
sHB 6900 (as amended by House "A")* 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE TRANSFORMING CHILDREN'S 
BEHAVIORAL HEALTH POLICY AND PLANNING COMMITTEE. 
 
SUMMARY: 
The bill makes various changes regarding the Behavioral and Mental 
Health Policy and Oversight Committee, including 1) changing the 
name 2) changing the number of committee members and 3) changing 
reporting dates. 
*House Amendment "A" (1) changes the effective date to effective 
from passage and (2) changes the deadline for when the committee must 
hold its first meeting from July 1, 2023 to September 1, 2023. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Effective from passage 
Committee Changes 
The bill changes the name of the committee to Transforming 
Children's Behavioral Health Policy and Planning Committee and 
defines behavioral health as mental health and substance use disorders, 
as well as overall psychological well-being. 
The bill requires the speaker of the House and the president pro 
tempore of the Senate to each select one chairperson and increases the 
number of committee members by four:  
1. Two appointed by the chairperson of the committee selected by the 
speaker of the House of Representatives, with one who is a child or 
youth advocate.  
2. Two appointed by the chairperson of the committee selected by the 
president pro tempore of the Senate, with one who is a child or youth 
advocate.  2023HB-06900-R000830-BA.DOCX 
Analyst: ME 	Page 2 	5/24/23 
The bill specifies that the committee will hold its first meeting by 
September 1, 2023, and changes its initial reporting deadline to 
December 1, 2023, and its final reporting deadline to December 1, 2024.  
The bill makes various changes to the reporting requirements of the 
committee: 
1. Includes urban, rural, and other areas of the state in the 
governance structure for the children's behavioral health 
system.  
2. Allows instead of requiring the committee to consult with 
certain children's behavioral health organizations, to include 
two or more subcommittees chaired by a member of the 
committee to inform its recommendations, and collaborate 
with certain state agencies. 
3. Removes the requirement that the committee shall work with 
a results-first initiative. 
4. Allows instead of requiring the committee to include two or 
more subcommittees chaired by a member of the committee to 
inform its recommendations. 
5. Requires the committee to annually establish a work plan. 
The bill also makes various minor and technical changes.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 52 Nay 0 Absent/Not Voting 1