Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00952 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 09/22/2023

                    O F F I C E O F L E G I S L A T I V E R E S E A R C H 
P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 
  	Page 1 
PA 23-169—SB 952 
Judiciary Committee 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING PA ROLE ELIGIBILITY FOR AN INDIVIDUAL 
SERVING A LENGTHY SE NTENCE FOR A CRIME C OMMITTED 
BEFORE THE INDIVIDUAL REACHED T HE AGE OF TWENTY -ONE 
AND CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORDS ERASURE 
 
SUMMARY: This act makes unrelated changes to laws on eligibility for (1) parole 
and (2) criminal record erasure for driving under the influence (DUI). It also 
broadens parole eligibility for certain offenders who were under age 21 when they 
committed the crime.   
Under existing law and certain circumstances, an offender sentenced on or after 
October 1, 2015, and serving a definite or total effective sentence of more than 10 
years for crimes committed before, on, or after October 1, 2015, when the person 
was under age 18 is eligible for parole. The act extends parole eligibility to 
offenders who (1) were under age 21 when the crime was committed; (2) are 
serving a definite or total effective sentence of more than 10 years for crimes 
committed on or before October 1, 2005; and (3) were sentenced on or before 
October 1, 2005. It correspondingly applies existing law’s parole eligibility rules 
and requirements on parole hearing and release decisions to this new age group. 
The act also specifies that DUI is not eligible for automatic criminal record 
erasure until 10 years after the person’s most recent conviction. Additionally, it 
makes DUI convictions ineligible for erasure if the person has a second DUI 
conviction within 10 years. 
It also makes technical and conforming changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023, except the DUI record erasure provisions 
are effective July 1, 2023. 
 
PAROLE ELIGIBILITY 
 
Alternate Parole Rules  
 
Existing law sets parole eligibility rules specifically for someone who commits 
a crime while under age 18 and is sentenced to more than 10 years in prison. The 
act extends parole eligibility to offenders who (1) were under age 21 when the crime 
was committed; (2) are serving a definite or total effective sentence of more than 
10 years for crimes committed on or before October 1, 2005; and (3) were sentenced 
on or before October 1, 2005.  
As under existing law, the act applies these rules if they make someone eligible 
for parole sooner than under existing law, including someone who would otherwise 
be ineligible for parole. Under these rules, someone sentenced to (1) 10 to 50 years 
in prison is eligible for parole after serving the greater of 12 years or 60% of his or  O L R P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 	Page 2 of 3  
her sentence or (2) more than 50 years in prison is eligible for parole after serving 
30 years. 
Under existing law, the rules apply to offenders incarcerated on and after 
October 1, 2015, regardless of when the crime was committed or the offender was 
sentenced. Under prior law, the alternate parole eligibility rules did not apply to any 
portion of a sentence imposed for a crime committed when the person was age 18 
or older. The act extends the applicability of the alternate parole eligibility rules to 
any portion of a sentence imposed for a crime committed when the person was age 
18, 19, or 20 if the crimes were committed on or before October 1, 2005, as 
described above. 
 
Required Hearing 
 
As is the case under existing law for offenders who were under age 18, in cases 
involving offenders under age 21 the act requires (1) a parole hearing when 
someone becomes parole-eligible and (2) the Board of Pardons and Paroles to 
notify, at least 12 months before the hearing, the Chief Public Defender’s Office, 
appropriate state’s attorney, Department of Correction’s (DOC) Victim Services 
Unit, Office of the Victim Advocate, and Judicial Branch’s Office of Victim 
Services. The Chief Public Defender’s Office must provide counsel for an indigent 
inmate. 
At the hearing, the law requires the board to allow (1) the inmate to make a 
statement; (2) the inmate’s counsel and state’s attorney to submit reports and 
documents; and (3) any victim of the crime to make a statement as with other parole 
hearings. 
The board may also request (1) testimony from mental health professionals and 
relevant witnesses and (2) reports from DOC or others. The board must use 
validated risk and needs assessment tools and risk-based structured decision 
making and release criteria.  
 
Release Decisions 
 
After the hearing, the law allows the board to release the inmate on parole if the 
following conditions are met: 
1. the release (a) holds the offender accountable to the community without 
compromising public safety; (b) reflects the offense’s seriousness and 
makes the sentence proportional to the harm to victims and the 
community; (c) uses the most appropriate sanctions available, including 
prison, community punishment, and supervision; (d) could reduce criminal 
activity, impose just punishment, and provide the offender with meaningful 
and effective rehabilitation and reintegration; and (e) is fair and promotes 
respect for the law; 
2. it appears from all available information, including DOC reports, that (a) 
there is a reasonable probability the offender will not violate the law again 
and (b) the benefits of release to the offender and society substantially 
outweigh the benefits from continued confinement; and  O L R P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 	Page 3 of 3  
3. it appears from all available information, including DOC reports, that the 
offender is substantially rehabilitated, considering his or her character, 
background, and history, including (a) the offender’s prison record, age, and 
circumstances at the time of committing the crime; (b) whether he or she 
has shown remorse and increased maturity since committing the crime; (c) 
his or her contributions to others’ welfare through service; (d) rehabilitation 
opportunities he or she took in prison; (e) the overall degree of his or her 
rehabilitation considering the nature and circumstances of the crime; and (f) 
his or her efforts to overcome substance abuse, addiction, trauma, lack of 
education, or obstacles he or she faced. 
The act specifies that the board must consider whether an offender applied for 
or received a sentence modification when considering whether the person 
demonstrates rehabilitation. This requirement applies to release decisions for 
offenders under age 18 under existing law and under age 21 under the act. 
Under the act, as under existing law for offenders who were under age 18, for 
offenders who were under age 21 the board (1) must articulate reasons for its 
decision on the record and (2) at its discretion, may reassess the person’s suitability 
for a hearing at least two years after a denial. By law, the board’s decisions under 
these provisions are not appealable. 
 
DUI AND CRIMINAL RECORD ERASURE 
 
Existing law provides a process, not yet fully operational, to erase records of 
most misdemeanor convictions and certain felony convictions after a specified 
period following the person’s most recent conviction. Among other things, PA 23-
134 specifies that motor vehicle violations are generally covered by the erasure law 
in the same way as misdemeanors or felonies (i.e., either seven or 10 years after the 
person’s most recent conviction).  
Under PA 23-134, a first DUI conviction (which has criminal penalties 
equivalent to a misdemeanor) was eligible for erasure seven years after the person’s 
most recent conviction. This act instead makes DUI ineligible for erasure until 10 
years after the person’s most recent conviction in all cases.  
This act also makes a DUI conviction ineligible for erasure if the defendant has 
a second DUI within the following 10 years. It replaces a provision in PA 23-134 
that instead made a DUI conviction ineligible for erasure if it occurred within 10 
years before any additional DUI arrest. 
 
BACKGROUND 
 
Related Act 
 
PA 23-204 (§ 119) contains the same provisions on DUI record erasure.