Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00979 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/28/2023

                     
Researcher: KLM 	Page 1 	3/28/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 979  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE 
CONNECTICUT HOME ENERGY LABEL AND THE TREE CANOPY 
OF CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires landlords, when listing or offering certain dwelling 
units for rent, to provide a “Connecticut home energy label” for the 
units, which the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection 
(DEEP) commissioner must develop. The label must be provided before 
a prospective tenant signs a lease for the unit or at their request. 
 With certain exceptions, the requirement is phased-in based on the 
average percentage of gross household income spent on home heating 
and electricity costs (i.e., average energy burden) in the municipality 
where the unit is located. Under the bill’s schedule, the requirement 
generally applies to certain municipalities beginning July 1, 2024, and 
then, eventually, to all municipalities by July 1, 2027. The bill exempts 
units with rent that includes a fixed amount for all electricity, natural 
gas, or heating fuel costs. It also exempts units in a building (1) built 
since January 1, 2000, or (2) in which the building’s landlord resides, but 
only through July 1, 2027. 
The bill allows municipalities to establish, by ordinance, a civil 
penalty of up to $500 for a first violation and $1,000 for subsequent 
violations. It explicitly provides that it does not limit or restrict a state 
or local housing or health code enforcement agency’s authority. 
Lastly, the bill makes it a state goal to increase the percentage of 
environmental justice communities (see BACKGROUND) and 
municipalities with a population of at least 100,000 that are covered by 
tree canopy to at least 5% of their total area by January 1, 2024. It does 
so to ensure all state residents equitably enjoy open space and tree cover  2023SB-00979-R000244-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 2 	3/28/23 
 
benefits. Based on 2020 U.S. census data, Bridgeport, Hartford, New 
Haven, Stamford, and Waterbury have populations of at least 100,000. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: January 1, 2024, except the tree canopy provision 
takes effect October 1, 2023. 
HOME ENERGY LABEL 
Label Development 
Under the bill, the home energy label shows an energy efficiency 
score for a residence. It must be consistent with all nationally recognized 
ratings, including the U.S. Department of Energy (DOE) Home Energy 
score, the Home Energy Rating System Index score, and the Energy Star 
score. 
The bill requires the DEEP commissioner to consider the following 
factors when developing the label: 
1. cost effectiveness of the labeling process; 
2. ability to conduct the labeling process and generate a label 
without outside or professional help; 
3. clarity of the label’s information on the unit’s estimated energy 
efficiency; 
4. label standardization, accuracy, and reliability; and 
5. the label’s ability to integrate information from existing 
nationally recognized ratings. 
Under the bill, the commissioner must allow an opportunity for 
public comment during the label’s development. 
Municipal Phase-In Schedule 
The table below shows the bill’s schedule through which the home 
energy label requirement applies to a unit if a census tract within the 
municipality where it is located has the requisite average energy 
burden.   
 
 
  2023SB-00979-R000244-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 3 	3/28/23 
 
Table: Home Energy Label Municipal Phase-In Schedule 
Effective Date 
Municipalities Subject to Home Energy 
 Label Requirements 
The later of (1) on and after 
July 1, 2024, or (2) 30 days 
after DEEP’s public release of 
the label 
Those with a census tract in which the average 
energy burden is at least 10% 
On or after July 1, 2025 Those with a census tract in which the average 
energy burden is at least 6% 
On or after July 1, 2026 Those with a census tract in which the average 
energy burden is at least 4% 
On or after July 1, 2027 All municipalities  
 
The bill requires the Department of Housing and DEEP 
commissioners, annually by March 1, to publish on their agencies’ 
websites a list of municipalities that meet the above schedule criteria 
based on DOE’s Low-Income Energy Affordability Data Tool, or a 
successor tool. 
Providing the Label 
Under the bill, if a landlord is subject to the home energy label 
requirement and lists or offers a unit for rent by using a service, 
organization, or facility involved in the business of selling or renting 
dwelling units (e.g., a multiple listing service or real estate brokers’ 
organization), then the landlord must provide the label to a prospective 
tenant at his or her request or before signing a lease for the unit through 
the listing business used.  
Enforcement and Penalty 
The bill allows a municipality containing a census tract with the 
requisite average energy burden under the bill’s phase-in schedule to 
establish a civil penalty for violations by ordinance. The penalty, 
payable to the municipality, is up to $500 for the first violation and 
$1,000 for subsequent violations.  
The bill allows landlords, within 30 days after the violation notice’s 
mailing date, to appeal in Superior Court and receive a hearing. To do 
so, a landlord must file a petition to reopen the assessment and pay an 
entry fee to the court that equals the entry fee for a small claims case  2023SB-00979-R000244-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 4 	3/28/23 
 
(currently, $95). Under the bill, these remedies are in addition to any 
other remedies available at law or in equity. 
BACKGROUND 
Environmental Justice Communities 
By law, an “environmental justice community” is (a) any U.S. census 
block group, as determined by the most recent census, for which at least 
30% of the population consists of low-income people who are not 
institutionalized and have an income below 200% of the federal poverty 
level or (b) a distressed municipality (CGS § 22a-20a).  
The Department of Economic and Community Development 
annually designates distressed municipalities based on high 
unemployment and poverty, aging housing stock, and low or declining 
rates of job, population, and per capita income growth (CGS § 32-9p). 
The current (2022) distressed municipalities are Ansonia, Bridgeport, 
Bristol, Chaplin, Derby, East Hartford, East Haven, Griswold, Groton, 
Hartford, Meriden, Montville, New Britain, New London, North 
Stonington, Norwich, Plainfield, Putnam, Sprague, Sterling, Torrington, 
Waterbury, West Haven, Winchester, and Windham. 
Towns with current designated census blocks (that are not also 
distressed municipalities) are Bethel, Bloomfield, Branford, Brooklyn, 
Canaan, Clinton, Columbia, Coventry, Cromwell, Danbury, East 
Haddam, East Lyme, East Windsor, Ellington, Enfield, Essex, Fairfield, 
Farmington, Glastonbury, Greenwich, Haddam, Hamden, Killingly, 
Ledyard, Lisbon, Manchester, Mansfield, Middletown, Milford, 
Naugatuck, New Fairfield, New Haven, New Milford, Newington, 
North Canaan, Norwalk, Plainville, Portland, Preston, Ridgefield, 
Rocky Hill, Sharon, Shelton, Simsbury, Southington, Stafford, Stamford, 
Stonington, Stratford, Thomaston, Thompson, Vernon, Wallingford, 
Waterford, Watertown, West Hartford, Wethersfield, Willington, 
Windsor Locks, and Windsor. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 22 Nay 11 (03/10/2023)