Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00996 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/24/2023

                     
Researcher: SM 	Page 1 	5/24/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 996 (File 174, as amended by Senate "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING HOUSING DEVELOPMENT IN THE STATE, 
ESTABLISHING A HOUSING AUTHORITY RESIDENT QUALITY OF 
LIFE IMPROVEMENT GRANT PROGRAM AND A HOUSING CHOICE 
VOUCHER TASK FORCE AND REQUIRING THE DISCLOSURE OF 
CERTAIN NATURAL PERSON OWNERSHIP INTERESTS IN REAL 
PROPERTY.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill establishes a grant program, administered by the 
Department of Housing (DOH), to provide housing authorities with 
funding for improvements to their residential buildings. It also creates 
related requirements for the application process, funding limits, and use 
of the grants.  
The bill also establishes a task force to study the federal Housing 
Choice Voucher (HCV) program and its implementation in the state. It 
requires the task force to report its findings and recommendations to the 
Housing Committee and the state’s congressional delegation by January 
16, 2024.  
Current law allows municipalities to require that landlords renting to 
HCV program participants provide identifying information for certain 
individuals that exercise control of these properties (i.e., controlling 
participants). The bill extends this provision to also cover nonresident 
owners of rental property and makes it applicable only to business 
entities. It also provides additional specificity as to what individuals and 
entities qualify as controlling participants (generally those that exercise 
financial or operational control on behalf of a natural person who 
exercises substantial control of these business entities).  
Finally, the bill makes minor and technical changes. 
*Senate Amendment “A” modifies the “controlling participant”  2023SB-00996-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 2 	5/24/23 
 
definition by (1) amending which individuals and entities are 
considered a controlling participant, (2) eliminating the requirement 
under current law that a controlling participant’s financial or 
operational control be exercised on a day-to-day basis, (3) specifying 
that a controlling participant exercises control on behalf of a natural 
person who exercises substantial control of the business entity, and (4) 
eliminating the option of satisfying the natural person’s control 
requirement in the underlying bill through a certain ownership stake. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage, except the provisions on 
municipal landlord identification requirements, which take effect 
October 1, 2023. 
§ 1 — GRANT PROGRAM F OR HOUSING AUTHORITI ES  
The bill establishes a new grant program to provide housing 
authorities with funding for improvements to their residential 
buildings, as may be recommended by their resident advisory boards 
(see BACKGROUND). It requires DOH to award program grants within 
available appropriations and begin accepting applications by October 1, 
2023.  
Under the bill, housing authorities can apply for a grant by 
submitting applications to DOH as the commissioner prescribes. The 
department must evaluate applications and can award up to $250,000 in 
total grants under the program per fiscal year. These grants must 
provide an ongoing benefit to residents of the housing authority-
managed building or buildings subject to the proposed improvements, 
as determined by the commissioner.  
Additionally, the commissioner may adopt regulations to carry out 
the program. 
§ 2 — HOUSING CHOICE VOUCHER PROGRAM TASK FORCE  
The bill establishes a 12-member task force to study the federal HCV 
program (see BACKGROUND ) and its implementation in the state, 
including any disparate impacts the program has on the development 
of at-risk children and youth or families.   2023SB-00996-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 3 	5/24/23 
 
Membership, Initial Appointments, and Vacancies 
Task force members may be General Assembly members and must 
include (1) the Housing Committee chairpersons and ranking members, 
or their designees, (2) two each appointed by the minority leaders of the 
House and Senate, and (3) one each appointed by the four other 
legislative leaders. The legislative leaders must make the initial task 
force appointments no later than 30 days after the bill’s passage and 
appointing authorities fill vacancies.  
Chairpersons, Meetings, and Reporting Requirement 
The bill requires the House speaker and Senate minority leader to 
each select a task force member to serve as a chairperson. The 
chairpersons must schedule the task force’s first meeting and hold it no 
later than 60 days after the bill’s passage.  
The bill requires the task force, by January 16, 2024, to report on its 
findings and recommendations to the Housing Committee and the 
state’s congressional delegation. The task force terminates when it 
submits this report or January 16, 2024, whichever is later. The Housing 
Committee’s administrative staff serves as the task force’s 
administrative staff.  
§ 3 — MUNICIPAL LANDLORD IDENTIFICATION REQUIREMENTS   
Under existing law, generally unchanged by the bill, municipalities 
can require nonresident owners and landlords renting to HCV program 
participants (also known as project-based housing providers or PBHPs) 
to provide (1) their current residential addresses or (2) the current 
residential address of the agent in charge of the building if the owners 
are a business entity that owns rental property (i.e., a corporation, 
partnership, trust, or other legally recognized entity).  
Current law includes an additional “controlling participant” 
requirement for PBHPs. It requires that they provide identifying 
information and the current residential address of each controlling 
participant associated with the property, meaning an individual or 
entity that exercises day-to-day financial or operational control. If a 
controlling participant is a business entity, the PBHP must identify and  2023SB-00996-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 4 	5/24/23 
 
provide the residential address for a natural person who exercises 
control over that entity. 
The bill makes changes to this “controlling participant” requirement. 
It only requires a PBHP to disclose the identifying information and 
current residential addresses of its controlling participants if the PBHP 
is a business entity. It also redefines controlling participant to mean an 
individual, entity, or agent that exercises financial or operational control 
on behalf of a natural person who (1) is not a minor and (2) directly or 
indirectly and through any contract, arrangement, understanding, or 
relationship, exercises substantial control of a business entity that owns 
rental property. Finally, the bill extends this requirement to nonresident 
owners in addition to PBHPs.   
BACKGROUND 
Resident Advisory Boards  
Federal law generally requires public housing agencies (PHAs) to 
establish at least one resident advisory board to assist and make 
recommendations on the development of a PHA’s public housing 
agency plan (42 U.S.C. § 1437c-1(e)). A housing authority located in 
Connecticut that does not administer any Housing and Urban 
Development (HUD) programs or receive HUD funding is not 
considered a PHA and so is not subject to this requirement.  
HCV Program and PBHPs 
The HCV program is the federal government’s main program for 
helping very low-income families afford private market housing (42 
U.S.C. § 1437f(o)). Eligible households that are issued a housing voucher 
must find housing that meets the program’s requirements. HUD funds 
the program and it is administered locally by PHAs and statewide by 
DOH.   
State law defines PBHPs as property owners who contract with HUD 
to provide housing to tenants under the HCV program.   
Related Bills 
sSB 4 (File 203), § 6, reported favorably by the Housing and  2023SB-00996-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 5 	5/24/23 
 
Appropriations committees, and sHB 6781 (File 208), § 9, reported 
favorably by the Housing Committee, both contain similar provisions 
on municipal landlord identification requirements.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Housing Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 15 Nay 0 (02/28/2023) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 53 Nay 0 (05/01/2023)