Researcher: MF Page 1 4/3/23 OLR Bill Analysis sSB 1063 AN ACT CONCERNING UTILITY COMMISSIONERS OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES REGULATORY AUTHORITY. SUMMARY This bill reduces, from five to three, the number of utility commissioners the governor must appoint to the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority (PURA). It also establishes term limits for commissioners appointed on or after February 1, 2023, by prohibiting any utility commissioner appointed on or after that date from serving more than three four-year terms. Current law requires PURA to consist of five commissioners and establishes a schedule for the governor to appoint three of the five commissioners between July 1, 2019, and May 1, 2020. In practice, there are currently only three PURA commissioners; additional appointments have not been made. The bill instead requires PURA to be under the direction of three commissioners appointed by the governor (i.e., the existing number of commissioners) and eliminates the schedule for appointing new commissioners. It also makes conforming changes to: 1. prohibit more than two, rather than three, commissioners from the same political party from holding office concurrently and 2. allow the PURA chairperson to assign any matter before the authority to one or more utility commissioners, rather than to a panel of three or more utility commissioners. Lastly, the bill makes technical changes to replace references to PURA “members” with “utility commissioners.” EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023 COMMITTEE ACTION 2023SB-01063-R000387-BA.DOCX Researcher: MF Page 2 4/3/23 Energy and Technology Committee Joint Favorable Substitute Yea 20 Nay 0 (03/14/2023)