Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01063 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/03/2023

                     
Researcher: MF 	Page 1 	4/3/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 1063  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING UTILITY COMMISSIONERS OF THE PUBLIC 
UTILITIES REGULATORY AUTHORITY.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill reduces, from five to three, the number of utility 
commissioners the governor must appoint to the Public Utilities 
Regulatory Authority (PURA). It also establishes term limits for 
commissioners appointed on or after February 1, 2023, by prohibiting 
any utility commissioner appointed on or after that date from serving 
more than three four-year terms. 
Current law requires PURA to consist of five commissioners and 
establishes a schedule for the governor to appoint three of the five 
commissioners between July 1, 2019, and May 1, 2020. In practice, there 
are currently only three PURA commissioners; additional appointments 
have not been made. The bill instead requires PURA to be under the 
direction of three commissioners appointed by the governor (i.e., the 
existing number of commissioners) and eliminates the schedule for 
appointing new commissioners. It also makes conforming changes to: 
1. prohibit more than two, rather than three, commissioners from 
the same political party from holding office concurrently and 
2. allow the PURA chairperson to assign any matter before the 
authority to one or more utility commissioners, rather than to a 
panel of three or more utility commissioners.  
Lastly, the bill makes technical changes to replace references to PURA 
“members” with “utility commissioners.” 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023 
COMMITTEE ACTION  2023SB-01063-R000387-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 2 	4/3/23 
 
Energy and Technology Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 20 Nay 0 (03/14/2023)