Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01083 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/21/2023

                       
 
LCO No. 4724  	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1083  
January Session, 2023 
LCO No. 4724 
 
 
Referred to Committee on TRANSPORTATION  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(TRA)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A TRANSPORTATION CARBON BUDGET 
FOR THE STATE. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2023) (a) Not later than July 1, 1 
2030, and annually thereafter, the Commissioner of Transportation, in 2 
consultation with the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 3 
Protection, shall establish a transportation carbon budget for the state 4 
that sets the maximum amount of greenhouse gas emissions permitted 5 
from the transportation sector. The commissioners shall consider the 6 
long-term emission reductions required by section 22a-200a of the 7 
general statutes when establishing the transportation carbon budget. 8 
(b) The Commissioner of Transportation shall adopt regulations, in 9 
accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 of the general statutes, to 10 
ensure transportation projects undertaken by the Department of 11 
Transportation, metropolitan planning organizations, as defined in 23 12 
USC 134, as amended from time to time, or municipalities adhere to the 13 
transportation carbon budget for the state. The regulations shall include, 14 
but need not be limited to, (1) a definition of "transportation project" that 15  Raised Bill No.  1083 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4724   	2 of 3 
 
excludes transportation projects that are necessary for safety reasons or 16 
maintenance, (2) the methodology to calculate the greenhouse gas 17 
emissions expected from future transportation projects, (3) where such 18 
projects are estimated to increase net greenhouse gas emissions, the 19 
ways to offset such emissions by undertaking greenhouse gas mitigation 20 
transportation projects that will reduce such emission, and (4) a 21 
description of such greenhouse gas mitigation transportation projects, 22 
including, but not limited to, improving public transportation, 23 
constructing bikeways, pedestrian walkways or other multiuse trails or 24 
paths and installing electric vehicle charging infrastructure. Not later 25 
than July 1, 2028, the commissioner shall submit the regulations to the 26 
standing legislative regulation review committee for consideration 27 
under section 4-170 of the general statutes. 28 
(c) The Commissioner of Transportation, in consultation with the 29 
Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection, shall 30 
implement a public outreach plan to ensure sufficient public and 31 
stakeholder engagement in the development of the transportation 32 
carbon budget and the regulations required under subsection (b) of this 33 
section. 34 
(d) On or before January 1, 2024, and annually thereafter until 35 
January 1, 2030, the Commissioner of Transportation shall submit, in 36 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 37 
a report to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly 38 
having cognizance of matters relating to transportation and the 39 
environment. Such report shall include, but need not be limited to, the 40 
status of the development of the transportation carbon budget for the 41 
state and the regulations required under subsection (b) of this section, 42 
the level of collaboration among various stakeholders, and a description 43 
of and the results of any public outreach conducted pursuant to 44 
subsection (c) of this section. 45 
(e) On or before July 1, 2030, and annually thereafter, the 46 
Commissioner of Transportation shall submit, in accordance with the 47 
provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing 48  Raised Bill No.  1083 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4724   	3 of 3 
 
committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 49 
relating to transportation and the environment a copy of the 50 
transportation carbon budget for the state and any recommendations for 51 
legislation to implement such budget. 52 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2023 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To establish a transportation carbon budget for the state. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]