Researcher: HP Page 1 3/28/23 OLR Bill Analysis sSB 1083 AN ACT ESTABLISHING A TRANSPORTATION CARBON BUDGET FOR THE STATE. SUMMARY Starting by July 1, 2030, this bill requires the Department of Transportation (DOT), in consultation with the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection (DEEP), to annually establish a transportation carbon budget for the state that sets the maximum amount of greenhouse gas (GHG) emissions allowed from the transportation sector. When setting the budget, the agencies must consider the state’s long-term emissions reductions requirements (see BACKGROUND) . Under the bill, DOT must adopt regulations to ensure that transportation projects the state, metropolitan planning organizations, and municipalities undertake do not exceed the carbon budget’s GHG emissions limit. The regulations must include, at a minimum: 1. a definition of “transportation project” that excludes projects necessary for maintenance or safety; 2. a methodology to calculate the GHG emissions expected from future transportation projects; 3. ways to offset the emissions for projects estimated to increase net emissions by undertaking GHG mitigation transportation projects that will reduce emissions; and 4. a description of the GHG mitigation transportation projects, such as public transportation improvements; bikeway, walkway, or other multiuse trail or path construction; and electric vehicle charging installation. 2023SB-01083-R000251-BA.DOCX Researcher: HP Page 2 3/28/23 Under the bill, DOT, in consultation with DEEP, must implement a public outreach plan to sufficiently engage the public and stakeholders in developing the transportation carbon budget and associated regulations. The DOT commissioner must submit the regulations to the Regulation Review Committee by July 1, 2028. From 2025 through 2030, DOT must, annually by January 1, submit a report to the Transportation and Environment committees that includes (1) a status update on development of the carbon budget and regulations and (2) a description of the level of stakeholder collaboration and a description of the public outreach done and its results. The bill also requires DOT to annually submit, starting by July 1, 2030, a copy of the transportation carbon budget and any related legislative recommendations to the Transportation and Environment committees. EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023 BACKGROUND GHG Emissions Reductions Requirements By law, the state must reduce its GHG emissions to a level that is at least (1) 10% below 1990’s emission level by January 1, 2020; (2) 45% below 2001’s emissions level by January 1, 2030; and (3) 80% below 2001’s emissions level by January 1, 2050 (CGS § 22a-200). COMMITTEE ACTION Transportation Committee Joint Favorable Substitute Yea 27 Nay 8 (03/10/2023)