Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01174 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/01/2023

                       
 
LCO No. 5014  	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1174  
January Session, 2023 
LCO No. 5014 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HS)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING MINIMUM EMPLOYEE WAGES, HEALTH 
CARE COVERAGE AND RETIREMENT BENEFITS FOR NONPROFIT 
PROVIDERS OF STATE -ADMINISTERED SERVICES FOR PERSONS 
WITH INTELLECTUAL OR DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section and 1 
sections 2 to 4, inclusive, of this act, "nonprofit employer" means a 2 
private provider that provides services to individuals with intellectual 3 
or developmental disabilities authorized to receive support and services 4 
through the Department of Developmental Services and the 5 
Department of Social Services. 6 
(b) Not later than December 1, 2023, a nonprofit employer shall 7 
implement a schedule of wage increases to employees who provide 8 
services to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities to 9 
ensure that all such employees shall attain a minimum wage of twenty-10 
five dollars per hour not later than January 1, 2026. Not later than 11 
January 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until January 1, 2027, a 12 
nonprofit employer receiving funds pursuant to section 2 of this act shall 13 
provide documentation of the schedule of wage increases to the 14  Raised Bill No.  1174 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5014   	2 of 3 
 
Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management. Such documentation 15 
shall demonstrate to the satisfaction of the secretary that funds received 16 
pursuant to section 2 of this act were used for: (1) Increasing employee 17 
salaries to ensure such minimum wage is attained by January 1, 2026, 18 
and (2) increasing the salaries of employees who earn over such 19 
minimum wage but not more than thirty dollars per hour by five per 20 
cent in the 2024 and 2025 calendar years. 21 
Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2023) The sums of one hundred six million 22 
dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, and one hundred ninety-23 
six million dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, are 24 
appropriated from the General Fund to the Office of Policy and 25 
Management for the purpose of increasing wages of employees of 26 
nonprofit employers who provide services to individuals with 27 
intellectual or developmental disabilities authorized to receive support 28 
and services through the Department of Developmental Services and 29 
the Department of Social Services. The Secretary of the Office of Policy 30 
and Management shall transfer sufficient funds in each fiscal year to the 31 
behavioral services program and the employment opportunities and 32 
day services accounts of the Department of Developmental Services and 33 
the community residential services account of the Department of Social 34 
Services in order to raise the minimum wage of such employees to 35 
twenty-five dollars per hour by January 1, 2026, and increase the salaries 36 
of such employees who earn over such minimum wage but not more 37 
than thirty dollars per hour by five per cent in the 2024 and 2025 38 
calendar years. 39 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2023) The Comptroller shall offer to 40 
nonprofit employers and their employees health care coverage under a 41 
partnership plan, as defined in section 3-123aaa of the general statutes. 42 
The Comptroller shall provide such coverage in accordance with 43 
sections 3-123bbb and 3-123ccc of the general statutes. 44 
Sec. 4. (Effective from passage) The sum of ninety million dollars is 45 
appropriated from the General Fund to the Office of Policy and 46 
Management for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, for the 47  Raised Bill No.  1174 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5014   	3 of 3 
 
establishment of a pool of funding to be allocated by the Secretary of the 48 
Office of Policy and Management to nonprofit employers for the 49 
purpose of enhancing retirement benefits for their employees. The 50 
Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall prescribe (1) a 51 
process by which nonprofit employers can submit applications to 52 
receive funding from the pool, and (2) documentation requirements for 53 
such employers to demonstrate such funding was used to enhance 54 
retirement benefits for such employees. 55 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2023 New section 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2023 New section 
Sec. 4 from passage New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To raise minimum wages for employees of nonprofit providers that 
contract with the state to provide services for persons with intellectual 
and developmental disabilities, authorize health care coverage of such 
employees under a state partnership health plan and provide state 
funding to enhance employee retirement benefits. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]