Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01177 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/01/2023

                       
 
LCO No. 5164  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1177  
January Session, 2023 
LCO No. 5164 
 
 
Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(LAB)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ONE FAIR WAGE. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 31-60 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2023): 2 
(a) Except as provided in subdivision (5) of subsection (i) of section 3 
31-58, any employer who pays or agrees to pay to an employee less than 4 
the minimum fair wage or overtime wage shall be deemed in violation 5 
of the provisions of this part. 6 
(b) The Labor Commissioner shall adopt such regulations, in 7 
accordance with the provisions of chapter 54, as may be appropriate to 8 
carry out the purposes of this part. Such regulations may include, but 9 
are not limited to, regulations defining and governing an executive, 10 
administrative or professional employee and outside salesperson; 11 
[learners and apprentices, their number, proportion and length of 12 
service;] and piece rates in relation to time rates; and shall recognize, as 13 
part of the minimum fair wage, [gratuities in an amount (1) equal to 14 
twenty-nine and three-tenths per cent, and effective January 1, 2009, 15  Raised Bill No.  1177 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5164   	2 of 4 
 
equal to thirty-one per cent of the minimum fair wage per hour, and 16 
effective January 1, 2014, equal to thirty-four and six-tenths per cent of 17 
the minimum fair wage per hour, and effective January 1, 2015, and 18 
ending on June 30, 2019, equal to thirty-six and eight-tenths per cent of 19 
the minimum fair wage per hour for persons, other than bartenders, 20 
who are employed in the hotel and restaurant industry, including a 21 
hotel restaurant, who customarily and regularly receive gratuities, (2) 22 
equal to eight and two-tenths per cent, and effective January 1, 2009, 23 
equal to eleven per cent of the minimum fair wage per hour, and 24 
effective January 1, 2014, equal to fifteen and six-tenths per cent of the 25 
minimum fair wage per hour, and effective January 1, 2015, and ending 26 
on June 30, 2019, equal to eighteen and one-half per cent of the minimum 27 
fair wage per hour for persons employed as bartenders who customarily 28 
and regularly receive gratuities, and (3) not to exceed thirty-five cents 29 
per hour in any other industry, and shall also recognize] deductions and 30 
allowances for the value of board, in the amount of eighty-five cents for 31 
a full meal and forty-five cents for a light meal, lodging, apparel or other 32 
items or services supplied by the employer; and other special conditions 33 
or circumstances which may be usual in a particular employer-34 
employee relationship. The commissioner may provide, in such 35 
regulations, modifications of the minimum fair wage herein established 36 
[for learners and apprentices; persons under the age of eighteen years; 37 
and] for such special cases or classes of cases as the commissioner finds 38 
appropriate to prevent curtailment of employment opportunities, avoid 39 
undue hardship and safeguard the minimum fair wage herein 40 
established. Regulations in effect on July 1, 1973, providing for a board 41 
deduction and allowance in an amount differing from that provided in 42 
this section shall be construed to be amended consistent with this 43 
section. 44 
(c) Regulations adopted by the commissioner pursuant to subsection 45 
(b) of this section which define executive, administrative and 46 
professional employees shall be updated not later than October 1, 2000, 47 
and every four years thereafter, to specify that such persons shall be 48 
compensated on a salary basis at a rate determined by the Labor 49  Raised Bill No.  1177 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5164   	3 of 4 
 
Commissioner. 50 
[(d) (1) Effective July 1, 2019, the Labor Commissioner shall 51 
recognize, as part of the minimum fair wage, gratuities in an amount 52 
equal to the difference between the minimum fair wage and the 53 
employer's share per hour for persons, other than bartenders, who are 54 
employed in the hotel and restaurant industry, including a hotel 55 
restaurant, who customarily and regularly receive gratuities. The Labor 56 
Commissioner shall also recognize, as part of the subminimum wage 57 
established in subdivision (5) of subsection (i) of section 31-58, gratuities 58 
in an amount equal to the difference between such subminimum wage 59 
and the employer's share per hour for persons, other than bartenders, 60 
who are employed in the hotel and restaurant industry, including a 61 
hotel restaurant, who customarily and regularly receive gratuities. 62 
(2) Effective July 1, 2019, the Labor Commissioner shall recognize, as 63 
part of the minimum fair wage, gratuities in an amount equal to the 64 
difference between the minimum fair wage and the employer's share 65 
per hour for persons employed as bartenders who customarily and 66 
regularly receive gratuities. 67 
(3) As used in this subsection "employer's share" means (A) six dollars 68 
and thirty-eight cents per hour for persons, other than bartenders, who 69 
are employed in the hotel and restaurant industry, including a hotel 70 
restaurant, who customarily and regularly receive gratuities, and (B) 71 
eight dollars and twenty-three cents per hour for persons employed as 72 
bartenders who customarily and regularly receive gratuities. 73 
(4) Notwithstanding any other law or regulation, any claim brought 74 
under this subsection, section 31-68 as it relates to gratuities as part of 75 
the minimum wage or section 31-62-E3 of the regulations of Connecticut 76 
state agencies filed after September 24, 2022, shall be adjudicated, solely, 77 
under section 31-60-2 of the regulations of Connecticut state agencies 78 
effective on September 24, 2020, and any amendments thereto. 79 
(e) On and after October 1, 2020, no employer may take any action to 80 
displace an employee, including, but not limited to, a partial 81  Raised Bill No.  1177 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5164   	4 of 4 
 
displacement of an employee, such as reducing the employee's hours, 82 
wages or employment benefits, for purposes of hiring persons under the 83 
age of eighteen years at a rate below the minimum fair wage. If the Labor 84 
Commissioner determines that an employer has violated this 85 
subsection, the commissioner shall suspend the employer's right to pay 86 
the reduced rate for employees for a period of time specified in 87 
regulations adopted pursuant to subsection (b) of this section.] 88 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2023 31-60 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To eliminate the subminimum wage in the state and create one 
minimum fair wage. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]