Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01177 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/05/2023

                     
Researcher: LRH 	Page 1 	4/5/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 1177  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ONE FAIR WAGE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill removes the law’s “tip credit” provision, which currently 
allows employers to pay hotel and restaurant staff and bartenders who 
customarily receive tips less than the minimum wage, as long as their 
tips make up the difference. Under current law, the tip credit allows 
employers to pay hotel and restaurant staff $6.38 per hour and 
bartenders $8.23 per hour, as long as their tips make up the rest of the 
minimum wage requirement (currently $14.00 per hour). Removing the 
tip credit requires employers to pay these employees at least the full 
minimum wage. By law, the minimum wage increases to $15.00 per 
hour on June 1, 2023, and then beginning January 1, 2024, it will be 
annually adjusted based on changes to the federal employment cost 
index (CGS § 31-58). 
The bill also removes provisions that allow employers, under certain 
conditions, to pay less than the minimum wage to learners, apprentices, 
and people under age 18 (minors) unless they are emancipated minors. 
In doing so, the bill similarly requires that learners, apprentices, and 
unemancipated minors be paid at least the full minimum wage. Under 
current law, unemancipated minors may generally be paid as low as 
85% of the minimum wage for their first 90 days of employment.  
Lastly, the bill makes conforming changes to remove provisions that 
(1) specify how certain tip-credit-related lawsuits must be adjudicated 
and (2) prohibit employers from displacing employees to hire minors at 
a sub-minimum wage.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023 
BACKGROUND  2023SB-01177-R000448-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 2 	4/5/23 
 
Learners 
Under current regulations, “learners” are students in an established 
vocational training program for an occupation that is not apprenticeable 
but has a long training period. They may be paid a sub-minimum wage 
for up to 200 hours in an approved training program with written 
permission from the labor commissioner (Conn. Agencies Regs., § 31-
60-7). 
Apprentices 
Under current regulations, an “apprentice” is someone at least age 16 
who is employed to learn a skilled trade in a bona fide apprentice 
program approved by the Connecticut State Apprenticeship Council. 
An employer must have permission from the labor commissioner for 
each apprentice paid less than the minimum wage (Conn. Agencies 
Regs., § 31-60-8). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Labor and Public Employees Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 8 Nay 4 (03/21/2023)