Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01229 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/13/2023

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	4/13/23 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 1229  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes changes affecting emergency medical services (EMS) 
data collection and the Department of Public Health’s (DPH) EMS 
Advisory Board.  
Current law requires EMS organizations to report to DPH quarterly 
on specified EMS call data, including the number of 9-1-1 calls received. 
The bill requires organizations to also report the reasons for the calls. 
Under existing law, unchanged by the bill, EMS organizations must also 
report the (1) level of EMS required for each call; (2) response time; (3) 
number of passed, cancelled, and mutual aid calls made and received; 
and (4) prehospital data for unscheduled patient transport.  
By law, DPH must annually report on the data it collects to the EMS 
Advisory Board. Starting June 1, 2024, the bill requires the commissioner 
to also annually submit the report to the Public Health Committee. 
For the EMS Advisory Board, the bill requires one of the legislative 
leaders’ 18 existing appointments to be a person from a Connecticut 
association representing paramedics and emergency medical 
technicians.  
Additionally, the bill expands the advisory board’s responsibilities to 
include an annual study of the state’s EMS services, including (1) 
analyzing DPH’s annual report on the EMS data, (2) evaluating risk 
trends and patterns affecting EMS, and (3) identifying areas of the state 
at risk of receiving EMS delays. Starting by January 1, 2024, the advisory 
board must annually report on the study to the Public Health 
Committee.   2023SB-01229-R000573-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	4/13/23 
 
The bill also requires the advisory board to study and make 
recommendations to address the shortage of EMS personnel in the state. 
It must report to the Public Health Committee on the study by January 
1, 2024.   
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2023, except that the provision 
requiring the advisory board to study the EMS personnel shortage takes 
effect upon passage.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 37 Nay 0 (03/27/2023)