Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05291 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/21/2024

                       
 
LCO No. 1303  	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 5291  
February Session, 2024 
LCO No. 1303 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PH)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH'S 
RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING IMPROVED OPIOID 
MONITORING. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 19a-127q of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2024): 2 
(a) On and after January 1, 2019, any hospital licensed pursuant to 3 
chapter 368v or emergency medical services personnel, as defined in 4 
section 20-206jj, that treats a patient for an overdose of an opioid drug, 5 
as defined in section 20-14o, shall report such overdose to the 6 
Department of Public Health in a form and manner prescribed by the 7 
Commissioner of Public Health. 8 
(b) On and after January 1, 2020, any hospital licensed pursuant to 9 
chapter 368v that treats a patient for a nonfatal overdose of an opioid 10 
drug, as defined in section 20-14o, shall administer a mental health 11 
screening or assessment of the patient if medically appropriate, and 12 
provide the results of such screening or assessment to the patient if 13 
medically appropriate, or to the patient's parent, guardian or legal 14  Raised Bill No.  5291 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1303   	2 of 3 
 
representative, as applicable, if medically appropriate. 15 
(c) On or before January 1, 2020, the Department of Public Health 16 
shall provide the data reported pursuant to subsection (a) of this section 17 
to the municipal health department or district department of health that 18 
has jurisdiction over the location in which such overdose occurred, or, 19 
if such location is unknown, the location in which the hospital or 20 
emergency medical services personnel treated the patient, as the 21 
department, in its discretion, deems necessary to develop preventive 22 
initiatives. 23 
(d) On and after January 1, 2025, any hospital licensed pursuant to 24 
chapter 368v that treats a patient for a nonfatal overdose of an opioid 25 
drug, as defined in section 20-14o, shall administer, with the patient's 26 
consent, a toxicology screening of the patient, if medically appropriate. 27 
Such screening shall include, but need not be limited to, screening for 28 
opiates, opioids, benzodiazepines, cannabinoids, methadone, cocaine, 29 
gabapentin, xylazine and any other substance deemed appropriate by 30 
the commissioner. Any hospital that administers a toxicology screening 31 
pursuant to the provisions of this subsection shall report the screening 32 
results to the Department of Public Health in a form and manner 33 
prescribed by the commissioner. 34 
[(d)] (e) Data reported to the Department of Public Health by a 35 
hospital or emergency medical services personnel pursuant to the 36 
provisions of this section shall at all times remain confidential pursuant 37 
to section 19a-25. 38 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2024 19a-127q 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To require each hospital that treats a patient for a nonfatal overdose of 
an opioid drug to administer a toxicology screening of such patient if 
medically appropriate.  Raised Bill No.  5291 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1303   	3 of 3 
 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]