Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05291 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/21/2024

                     
 
 
Substitute House Bill No. 5291 
 
Public Act No. 24-120 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH'S 
RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING IMPROVED OPIOID 
MONITORING. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 19a-127q of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2024): 
(a) On and after January 1, 2019, any hospital licensed pursuant to 
chapter 368v or emergency medical services personnel, as defined in 
section 20-206jj, that treats a patient for an overdose of an opioid drug, 
as defined in section 20-14o, shall report such overdose to the 
Department of Public Health in a form and manner prescribed by the 
Commissioner of Public Health. 
(b) On and after January 1, 2020, any hospital licensed pursuant to 
chapter 368v that treats a patient for a nonfatal overdose of an opioid 
drug, as defined in section 20-14o, shall administer a mental health 
screening or assessment of the patient if medically appropriate, and 
provide the results of such screening or assessment to the patient if 
medically appropriate, or to the patient's parent, guardian or legal 
representative, as applicable, if medically appropriate. 
(c) On or before January 1, 2020, the Department of Public Health  Substitute House Bill No. 5291 
 
Public Act No. 24-120 	2 of 3 
 
shall provide the data reported pursuant to subsection (a) of this section 
to the municipal health department or district department of health that 
has jurisdiction over the location in which such overdose occurred, or, 
if such location is unknown, the location in which the hospital or 
emergency medical services personnel treated the patient, as the 
department, in its discretion, deems necessary to develop preventive 
initiatives. 
(d) (1) From January 1, 2025, until August 31, 2028, any hospital 
licensed pursuant to chapter 368v that treats a patient for a nonfatal 
overdose of an opioid drug, as defined in section 20-14o, shall 
administer, with the patient's consent, a toxicology screening of the 
patient, if medically appropriate. Such screening shall include, but need 
not be limited to, screening for opiates, opioids, benzodiazepines, 
cannabinoids, methadone, cocaine, gabapentin, xylazine and any other 
substance deemed appropriate by the commissioner. Any hospital that 
administers a toxicology screening pursuant to the provisions of this 
subsection shall report the screening results to the Department of Public 
Health in a form and manner prescribed by the commissioner. 
(2) On or before January 1, 2026, and annually thereafter, until 
January 1, 2029, the commissioner shall report, in accordance with the 
provisions of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committee of the 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public 
health regarding toxicology screening results obtained pursuant to the 
provisions of this subsection. Such report shall include, but need not be 
limited to, (A) the identification and analysis of any trends identified as 
a result of toxicology screening results obtained pursuant to the 
provisions of this subsection, (B) the identification of any benefits 
experienced by patients seeking emergency department care for 
nonfatal overdoses as a result of the toxicology screening results 
obtained pursuant to this subsection, and (C) a recommendation 
regarding whether toxicology screening reporting performed pursuant  Substitute House Bill No. 5291 
 
Public Act No. 24-120 	3 of 3 
 
to this subsection should continue after August 31, 2028. 
[(d)] (e) Data reported to the Department of Public Health by a 
hospital or emergency medical services personnel pursuant to the 
provisions of this section shall at all times remain confidential pursuant 
to section 19a-25.